Shelton v. City of West Palm Beach Florida
Plaintiff: Warren Shelton
Defendant: City of West Palm Beach Florida
Case Number: 9:2010cv80314
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 40 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/21/2010. (awe)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss; case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/6/2010. (awe)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Refer. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 4/20/2010. (egr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. City of West Palm Beach Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Palm Beach Florida
Represented By: Claudia Modder McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?