M et al v. Palm Beach County School Board et al
Plaintiff: C M, J P M and R G M
Defendant: Palm Beach County School Board, Arthur Johnson, Laura Pincus and Joanne Thornton
Case Number: 9:2010cv80473
Filed: April 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A. Marra
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying as moot 130 Motion for Bill of Costs. The hearing set for Wednesday, April 10, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/10/2013. (nbt)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 AMENDED ORDER re 113 Order and Opinion on Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 42 Official Capacity Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 43 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on State Law Tort Claims. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/30/2013. (ir)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER and Opinion on Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. Status Conference set for 7/27/2012 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/6/2012. (ral)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M et al v. Palm Beach County School Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C M
Represented By: Paul Bennett Sopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J P M
Represented By: Paul Bennett Sopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R G M
Represented By: Paul Bennett Sopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm Beach County School Board
Represented By: Robert Alan Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?