PARISH-CARTER v. Avossa et al

Plaintiff: LORETTA PARISH-CARTER
Defendant: Robert Avossa, Palm Beach County School District and Cheryl McKeever
Case Number: 9:2016cv81623
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach (Office: West Palm Beach)
Referring Judge: James M. Hopkins
Presiding Judge: Robin L. Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:0451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2017 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Defendants' Renewed Motion to Strike; denying 81 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Strike. The Clerk of the Court shall STRIKE docket entries 73-1, 75, and 81. The Clerk of the Court shall REMOVE FROM PUBLIC VIEW docket entries 73-1, 75, 81, 89, and 91. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/2/2017. (wc)
September 15, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/15/2017. (bkd) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
June 23, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/23/2017. (bkd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARISH-CARTER v. Avossa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORETTA PARISH-CARTER
Represented By: Malik Leigh
Represented By: Danielle Renee Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Avossa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm Beach County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl McKeever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?