ABRAMS-JACKSON v. Avossa et al
Plaintiff: RAQUEL ABRAMS-JACKSON
Defendant: Robert Avossa, Palm Beach County School District and Cheryl McKeever
Case Number: 9:2016cv81624
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach (Office: West Palm Beach)
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A. Marra
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING THAT PORTION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AT DOCKET ENTRY 104 WHICH SEEKS TO RECUSE THE UNDERSIGNED UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 12/15/2017. (kza)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES TO THE DEFENDANTS AND AGSINST MR. MALIK LEIGH, ESQ., AND DANIELLE RENEE WATSON, ESQ.: granting 97 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees. Mr. Leigh and Ms. Watson shall reimburse Defendants for their Attorney's fees in the amount of $932.75 and make payment to the Office of General Counsel for the School Board of Palm Beach County on or before December 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 11/6/2017. (kza)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 OPINION AND ORDER granting 72 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/19/2017. (ir)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/13/2017. (kza)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES TO THE DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST MR. MALIK LEIGH, ESQ.: granting 56 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs: ordered that Mr. Leigh shall reimburse the Defendants for attorneys fees in the amount of $3,637.50 and co sts in the amount of $109.10, for a total award of $3,746.60. Mr. Leigh is ordered to make such payment to the Office of General Counsel for the School Board of Palm Beach County on or before Friday, September 22, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/24/2017. (kza)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 58 Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Under Rule 59(e). Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/21/2017. (kza)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SUPPLEMENTING THE COURT'S PRIOR DISCOVERY ORDERS AND ADDRESSING SOCIAL MEDIA POSTS OF ATTORNEY MALIK LEIGH, ESQ.: re 48 Order on Motion to Compel, for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Discovery and 51 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 6/28/2017. (kza)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER granting 11 Motion to Strike ; granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 11 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 3/28/2017. (ir)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABRAMS-JACKSON v. Avossa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAQUEL ABRAMS-JACKSON
Represented By: Malik Leigh
Represented By: Danielle Renee Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Avossa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm Beach County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl McKeever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?