Kleiman v. Wright
Plaintiff: Ira Kleiman and W&K Info Defense Research, LLC
Defendant: Craig Wright
Case Number: 9:2018cv80176
Filed: February 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach (Office: West Palm Beach)
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 892 Notice of Appeal as to #887 Order,, Terminate Motions, #889 Judgment by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15543372. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Freedman, Devin)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order/Judgment under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #892 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 891 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting Report and Recommendations re #890 Report and Recommendations on #871 Motion for Bill of Costs, filed by Craig Wright, #872 Motion for Bill of Costs, filed by W&K Info Defense Research, LLC,; granting in part and denying in part #871 Motion for Bill of Costs; granting in part and denying in part #872 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 890 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #872 Plaintiff's MOTION for Bill of Costs and Motion for Entry of Taxable Costs of Litigation and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by W&K Info Defense Research, LLC, #871 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Craig Wright. Recommending Motions be Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Objections to R&R due by 3/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 889 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of W&K Info Defense Research, LLC against Craig Wright. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 888 ORDER granting #860 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 887 ORDER ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL, Denying #861 MOTION for New Trial on the Estate's claims based on violations of the Court's Motions in Limine orders filed by Ira Kleiman. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (mno)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 886 Fourth CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): Exhibits admitted at trial by Andres Rivero on behalf of Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 885 NOTICE by Craig Wright re #815 Exhibit List Dr. Craig Wright's Supplemental Notice of Filing Admitted Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P074 Redacted, #2 Exhibit P097 Redacted, #3 Exhibit P101 Redacted, #4 Exhibit P135 Redacted, #5 Exhibit P140 Redacted, #6 Exhibit P169 Redacted, #7 Exhibit P214 Redacted, #8 Exhibit P320 Redacted, #9 Exhibit P464 Redacted, #10 Exhibit P554 Redacted, #11 Exhibit P604 Redacted, #12 Exhibit P607 Redacted, #13 Exhibit P613 Redacted, #14 Exhibit P633 Redacted, #15 Exhibit P637 Redacted, #16 Exhibit P795 Redacted) (Rivero, Andres)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 884 REPLY to Response to Motion re #872 Plaintiff's MOTION for Bill of Costs and Motion for Entry of Taxable Costs of Litigation and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 883 REPLY to #871 MOTION for Bill of Costs DR. CRAIG WRIGHTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS BILL OF COSTS by Craig Wright. (Fernandez, Amanda)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 882 ORDER on #877 Joint Notice and Request for Judicial Ruling. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 881 RESPONSE in Opposition re #872 Plaintiff's MOTION for Bill of Costs and Motion for Entry of Taxable Costs of Litigation and Supporting Memorandum of Law DR. CRAIG WRIGHTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO W&K INFO DEFENSE LLCS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF TAXABLE COSTS OF LITIGATION AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 2/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B)(Fernandez, Amanda)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 880 RESPONSE in Opposition re #871 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Ira Kleiman. Replies due by 2/10/2022. (Freedman, Devin)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 879 Third CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): Exhibits admitted at trial by Amanda Marie McGovern on behalf of Craig Wright (McGovern, Amanda)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 878 NOTICE by Craig Wright re #815 Exhibit List Second Supplemental Joint Notice of Filing Admitted Exhibits (Attachments: #1 J101, #2 P078, P094, P096, P127, P137 and P143, #3 P172 and P173, #4 P175, P191, P209, P215, P219, P219 excel, P223, P229 and P230, #5 P296 (pages 1-110), #6 P296 (pages 111-220), #7 P308, P315, P337 and P457, #8 P310 Redacted, #9 P350 Redacted, #10 P469 (pages 1-75), #11 P469 (pages 76-137), #12 P565, P598, P685, P742 and P871) (McGovern, Amanda)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 877 NOTICE by Craig Wright Joint Notice and Request for Judicial Ruling on Proposed Redactions to Admitted Trial Exhibits (McGovern, Amanda)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER REFERRING #872 Plaintiff's MOTION for Bill of Costs and Motion for Entry of Taxable Costs of Litigation and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by W&K Info Defense Research, LLC, #871 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Craig Wright. Motions referred to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 875 REPLY to Response to Motion re #861 MOTION for New Trial on the Estate's claims based on violations of the Court's Motions in Limine orders filed by Ira Kleiman. (Freedman, Devin)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 874 REPLY to Response to Motion re #860 MOTION to Alter Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest filed by W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 873 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #818 Report and Recommendations; adopting Report and Recommendations re #818 Report and Recommendations; Overruling #856 Objections to Report and Recommendations filed by Andrew O'Hagan; denying #768 Motion to Compel, filed by Andrew O'Hagan. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 872 Plaintiff's MOTION for Bill of Costs and Motion for Entry of Taxable Costs of Litigation and Supporting Memorandum of Law by W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 2/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-4, #6 Errata Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Brenner, Andrew)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 871 MOTION for Bill of Costs by Craig Wright. Responses due by 2/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Dr. Craig Wright's Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(McGovern, Amanda)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 870 RESPONSE in Opposition re #860 MOTION to Alter Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest Dr. CraigWright's Opposition to W&K Info Defense Research, LLC's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 1/25/2022. (Rivero, Andres)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 869 RESPONSE in Opposition re #861 MOTION for New Trial on the Estate's claims based on violations of the Court's Motions in Limine orders Dr. Craig S. Wright's Opposition to the Estate of David Kleiman's Motion for New Trial filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 1/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rivero, Andres)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 868 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document: #867 Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to O'Hagans's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation by Andrew O'Hagan. (Rasco, Guy) Modified text and terminated "motion" on 1/11/2022 (wc).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 867 REPLY to #859 Response/Reply (Other) Non-Party Andrew OHagan's Reply To Plaintiffs Opposition To OHagans Objection To Magistrate Judges Report And Recommendation by Andrew O'Hagan. (Rasco, Guy)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER On Motion to Seal. Order granting in part and denying in part #823 Motion to File Select Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 865 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #863 Motion for Extension of Time. All parties shall file a Motion for Bill of Costs by January 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 864 RESPONSE in Support re #863 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Bill of Costs Dr. Craig Wright's Motion for 14-day Enlargement of Time to File Bill of Costs filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 863 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Bill of Costs Dr. Craig Wright's Motion for 14-day Enlargement of Time to File Bill of Costs by Craig Wright. Responses due by 1/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Dr Wright's Motion for 14-day Enlargement of Time to File Bill of Costs)(Rolnick, Alan)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 862 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held on December 6, 2021, before Judge Beth Bloom, 1-19 pages, Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards, 305-439-7168 / reporterlisaedwards@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2022. (le)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 861 MOTION for New Trial on the Estate's claims based on violations of the Court's Motions in Limine orders by Ira Kleiman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Freedman, Devin)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 860 MOTION to Alter Judgment to Add Prejudgment Interest by W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 1/18/2022 (Brenner, Andrew)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 859 RESPONSE to #856 Objections to Report and Recommendations by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Brenner, Andrew)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 858 REPLY to Response to Motion re #823 MOTION to Seal Dr. Craig Wright's Motion to File Select Exhibits Under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 Reply in Support of Dr Craig Wright's Motion to File Select Exhibits Under Seal filed by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 857 RESPONSE in Opposition re #823 MOTION to Seal Dr. Craig Wright's Motion to File Select Exhibits Under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 1/3/2022. (Brenner, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 856 OBJECTIONS to #818 Report and Recommendations Non-Party Andrew OHagan Objection to Magistrate Judge Report and Recommendation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Andrew O'Hagan. (Rasco, Guy)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 855 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 19 held on 12/02/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 19 of 19, 1 - 5 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 854 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 18 held on 12/01/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 18 of 19, 14 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 853 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 17 held on 11/30/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 17 of 19, 1 - 4 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 852 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 16 held on 11/29/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 16 of 19, 1 - 33 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 851 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 15 held on 11/23/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 15 of 19, 1 - 192, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 850 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 14, AM Session held on 11/22/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 14 of 19, 1 - 129, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 849 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 13, AM Session held on 11/19/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 13 of 19, 1 - 119, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 848 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 12, AM Session, held on 11/18/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 12 of 19, 1 - 124, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 847 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 11 held on 11/17/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 11 of 19, 1 - 148, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 846 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 10 held on 11/16/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 10 of 19, 1 - 244, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 845 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 9 held on 11/15/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 9 of 19, 1 - 224, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 844 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 8 held on 11/10/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 8 of 19, 1 - 122, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 843 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 7 held on 11/09/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 7 of 19, 1 - 247, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 842 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 6 held on 11/08/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 6 of 19, 1 - 255, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 841 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 5, plus index held on 11/05/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 5 of 19, 1 - 182 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 840 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 4 held on 11/04/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 4 of 19, 1 - 293, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 839 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 3 held on 11/03/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 3 of 19, 1 - 193, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 838 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 2 held on 11/02/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 2 of 19, 1 - 197, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 837 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 1 held on 11/01/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, Volume Number 1 of 19, 1 - 273, plus index pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (yhz)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 836 Corrected CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): Exhibits admitted at trial Second Corrected Certificate of Compliance re Admitted Evidence by Andres Rivero on behalf of Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 835 Supplemental Joint Notice of Filing Exhibits re #815 Corrected Admitted Trial Exhibits by Andrew Scott Brenner on behalf of Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D489, #2 J024, #3 P853.1, #4 P853.2, #5 P853.3, #6 P853.4, #7 P856, #8 P856.1, #9 P856.2, #10 P862, #11 P863, #12 P864, #13 P865, #14 P867, #15 P869) (Brenner, Andrew) Text Modified on 12/17/2021 (amb).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 834 CLERK'S Notice of Maintaining Audio-Visual Exhibit(s) received from Plaintiff Re D.E. #824 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Trial Exhibits per Local Rule 5.4. Exhibit Numbers: Sealed (D091-D102,D1020,D1021( 1 Flash Drive) (rrs)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 833 Plaintiff's CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): DE 828, 829 by Andrew Scott Brenner on behalf of Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Brenner, Andrew)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 832 CLERK'S Notice of Maintaining Audio-Visual Exhibit(s) received from Plaintiff Re D.E. #829 Notice (Other),,,,,,,,,. Exhibit Numbers: P434,P511,P512,D173( 1 Flash Drive ) (rrs)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 831 Corrected CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): Exhibits admitted at trial by Andres Rivero on behalf of Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 830 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): Exhibits admitted at trial by Andres Rivero on behalf of Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 829 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re #815 Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P002, #2 P033, #3 P034, #4 P035, #5 P036, #6 P037, #7 P042, #8 P043, #9 P045, #10 P048, #11 P051, #12 P052, #13 P053, #14 P055, #15 P055.1, #16 P055.3, #17 P057, #18 P059, #19 P075, #20 P076, #21 P091, #22 P092, #23 P102, #24 P105, #25 P112, #26 P113, #27 P117, #28 P119, #29 P120, #30 P122, #31 P124, #32 P129, #33 P133, #34 P134, #35 P135.1, #36 P138, #37 P139, #38 P142, #39 P146, #40 P147, #41 P149, #42 P156, #43 P156.1, #44 P157, #45 P157.1, #46 P160, #47 P160.1, #48 P161, #49 P164, #50 P166, #51 P167, #52 P181, #53 P183, #54 P187, #55 P189, #56 P200, #57 P210, #58 P211, #59 P212, #60 P213, #61 P216, #62 P217, #63 P221, #64 P224, #65 P240, #66 P241, #67 P248, #68 P256, #69 P257, #70 P261, #71 P274, #72 P290, #73 P291, #74 P299, #75 P301, #76 P305, #77 P313, #78 P326, #79 P332, #80 P333, #81 P349, #82 P356, #83 P361, #84 P381, #85 P392, #86 P398, #87 P403, #88 P405, #89 P406, #90 P407, #91 P408, #92 P410, #93 P420, #94 P424, #95 P434, #96 P439, #97 P446, #98 P452, #99 P459, #100 P509, #101 P514, #102 P514.1, #103 P518, #104 P518.1, #105 P518.2, #106 P518.3, #107 P518.4, #108 P518.7, #109 P521.1, #110 P521.7, #111 P522, #112 P523, #113 P538, #114 P538.1, #115 P538.2, #116 P540, #117 P540.1, #118 P540.2, #119 P546, #120 P546.1, #121 P546.2, #122 P564, #123 P578, #124 P591, #125 P630, #126 P636, #127 P638, #128 P664, #129 P695, #130 P696, #131 P709, #132 P710, #133 P717, #134 P720, #135 P727, #136 P727.1, #137 P731, #138 P733, #139 P733.1, #140 P744, #141 P748, #142 P758, #143 P767, #144 P799, #145 P799.1, #146 P807, #147 P807.1, #148 P807.2, #149 P807.3, #150 P808, #151 P808.1, #152 P808.2, #153 P822, #154 P823, #155 P823.1, #156 P823.2, #157 P823.3, #158 P824) (Brenner, Andrew)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 828 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re #815 Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D003, #2 D005, #3 D008, #4 D010, #5 D011, #6 D015, #7 D018, #8 D019, #9 D020, #10 D030, #11 D040, #12 D041, #13 D042, #14 D045, #15 D046, #16 D056, #17 D057, #18 D058, #19 D059, #20 D067, #21 D072, #22 D073, #23 D075, #24 D078, #25 D080, #26 D082, #27 D083, #28 D084, #29 D085, #30 D088, #31 D158, #32 D159, #33 D161, #34 D164, #35 D171, #36 D173, #37 D174, #38 D175, #39 D176, #40 D177, #41 D179, #42 D180, #43 D181, #44 D245, #45 D246, #46 D247, #47 D248, #48 D249, #49 D250, #50 D251, #51 D252, #52 D256, #53 D257, #54 D284, #55 D285, #56 D289, #57 D301, #58 D302, #59 D303, #60 D319, #61 D326, #62 D329, #63 D330, #64 D331, #65 D335, #66 D336, #67 D337, #68 D338, #69 D339, #70 D340, #71 D341, #72 D342, #73 D343, #74 D344, #75 D345, #76 D346, #77 D348, #78 D349, #79 D350, #80 D351, #81 D352, #82 D353, #83 D354, #84 D356, #85 D357, #86 D359, #87 D360, #88 D361, #89 D362, #90 D363, #91 D380, #92 D389, #93 D396, #94 D398, #95 D408, #96 D412, #97 D425, #98 D480, #99 D481, #100 D488, #101 D389, #102 J001, #103 J003, #104 J009, #105 J010, #106 J011, #107 J012, #108 J013, #109 J014, #110 J021, #111 J022, #112 J031, #113 J032, #114 J034, #115 J035, #116 J045, #117 J048, #118 J049, #119 J052, #120 J053, #121 J054, #122 J055, #123 J057, #124 J058, #125 J060, #126 J061, #127 J062, #128 J096, #129 J097, #130 J098, #131 J099, #132 J103, #133 J114, #134 J120, #135 J124) (Brenner, Andrew)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 827 NOTICE by Craig Wright NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED ORDER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rivero, Andres)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 825 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #824 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 824 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Trial Exhibits per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brenner, Andrew)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 823 MOTION to Seal Dr. Craig Wright's Motion to File Select Exhibits Under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 826 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (514773)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 822 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day 14 (Afternoon Session) held on 11/22/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 119 pages, Court Reporter: James Pence-Aviles, 305-523-5633 / James_PenceAviles@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2022. (jps)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 821 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day 13 (Afternoon Session) held on 11/19/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 88 pages, Court Reporter: James Pence-Aviles, 305-523-5633 / James_PenceAviles@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2022. (jps)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 820 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Day 12 (Afternoon Session) held on 11/18/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 140 pages, Court Reporter: James Pence-Aviles, 305-523-5633 / James_PenceAviles@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2022. (jps)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER granting #817 Motion to Seal Transcript. The deposition of John Doe filed confidentially under seal pursuant to ECF Nos. 603 , #608 , #691 , 744 , 761 , and 765 , shall remain filed under seal until further Order of this Court, and only after prior notice to the Deponent. Deponent's Expedited Motion, ECF No. #759 , and Court's Order, ECF No. 764 , are MOOT. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes) Modified text per Chambers on 12/9/2021 (mc).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 818 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #768 Motion to Compel filed by Andrew O'Hagan. Recommending that the District Court Deny the Motion. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 817 Agreed MOTION to Seal Transcript and Supporting Memorandum of Law per Local Rule 5.4 by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Payne, Darrell)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 816 REPLY to #806 Response in Opposition to Motion, #768 Motion to Compel by Andrew O'Hagan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Freedman First Witness Statement (First Witness Statement of Freedman), #2 Exhibit B - 19.11.14 Order (002), #3 Exhibit C - O'Hagan First Witness Statement (O'Hangan's first witness statement), #4 Exhibit D - Freedman Second Witness Statement 12.6.19, #5 Exhibit E - Transfer Order 191211 Approved, #6 Exhibit F - O'Hagan Second Witness Statement (Second Witness Statement of Andrew O'Hagan 2), #7 Exhibit G - 12.18.19 Consent Order w-seal (Queen's Bench Associate's-Blank Order), #8 Exhibit H - DE 771 - 11.8.21 Videotaped O'Hagan Trial Witness)(Rasco, Guy)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 815 Corrected Admitted Trial Exhibit List in re: Kleiman v. Wright. (ego)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 814 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of W&K Info Defense Research, LLC against Craig Wright; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 811 [trial] restricted/sealed until further notice. (jcy)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 813 Jury Notes as to Kleiman v. Wright. (ego) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2021: #1 Restricted Unredacted Jury Note/Verdict jury notes) (ego).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 812 JURY VERDICT as to Kleiman v. Wright. (ego) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2021: #1 Restricted Unredacted Jury Note/Verdict jury verdict) (ego).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 810 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial Completed on 12/6/2021. Day 21. Deliberations continue. Jury verdict reached. Jury verdict published. Jury polled. Verdict in favor of W&K Info Defense Research, LLC in the amount of $100,000,000.00 from intellectual property for compensatory damages regarding conversion. Total time in court: 2 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Zaharah R. Markoe, Amanda Marie McGovern, NOTICE OF POLICY RE ELECTRONIC SUBMISSION OF EXHIBITS. All exhibits returned to counsel of record and counsel shall follow Local Rule 5.3 which provides that within ten (10) days of the conclusion of a hearing or trial, a party must file in CM/ECF an electronic version of most exhibits offered or introduced into evidence. Before electronically filing, the filer must redact any sensitive, confidential, or private information in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1, and CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Section 6, or seek an order from the Court either to seal the exhibit or to exempt the exhibit from electronic filing under subsection (b)(3)(C) of the rule. Failure to electronically file exhibits and the The Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence within ten (10) days may result in the imposition of sanctions. The Local Rule, The Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence, and the Quick Reference Guide to Electronically Filing Trial Exhibits can be found on the Courts website: http://www.flsd.uscourts.gov (ego)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 809 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 12/3/2021. Day 20. Deliberations continue. This case is in recess until 12/6/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 5 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Alexander J. Holtzman, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, and Schneur Zalman Kass. Court Reporter: James Pence Aviles, 305-523-5633 / James_PenceAviles@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ta00)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 808 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 12/2/2021. Day 19. Deliberations continue. This case is in recess until 12/3/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Alexander J. Holtzman, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Zaharah R. Markoe, Amanda Marie McGovern, and Schneur Zalman Kass. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ta00)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 807 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 12/1/2021. Day 18. Deliberations continue. Jury note passed to the Court: unable to reach a unanimous decision; Allen Charge given. Jury continues deliberations. This case is in recess until 12/2/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Zaharah R. Markoe, Amanda Marie McGovern, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 806 RESPONSE in Opposition re #768 Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Pay Fees and Costs Related to Document and Deposition Discovery in England and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 12/8/2021. (Brenner, Andrew)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 805 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/30/2021. Day 17. Deliberations continue. This case is in recess until 12/1/21 at 10:00 am Total time in court: 7 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Joseph M. Delich, Andres Rivero, Amanda Lara Fernandez, Zaharah R. Markoe, Amanda Marie McGovern, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 804 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/29/2021. Day 16. Deliberations continue. Jury asks questions in written form. Court addresses questions in open court. Jury sent back to deliberate. This case is in recess until 11/30/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s) : 45 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 803 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/23/2021. Day 15. Jury instructions given by the Court. Closing statements made. Jury deliberates. This case is in recess until Monday 11/29/21 at 9:30 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Maxwell V. Pritt, Michael A. Fernandez, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Amanda Lara Fernandez, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 802 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Regarding Partnership Jury Instructions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brenner, Andrew)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 801 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Lara Fernandez on behalf of Craig Wright. Attorney Amanda Lara Fernandez added to party Craig Wright(pty:dft). (Fernandez, Amanda)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 800 Court's Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Jury Instructions, #2 Verdict Form) (ego)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 799 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/22/2021. Day 14. Defense continues with the presentation of their case. Witness Dr. Ami Klim continues to testify. Craig Wright is sworn and testified. Exhibits presented, Evidence entered. Defense rests. Charging conference was had. This case is in recess until 11/23/21 at 9:30 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Maxwell V. Pritt, Michael A. Fernandez, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 798 Clerks Notice to Filer re #797 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (scn)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 797 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres Rivero on behalf of Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER denying #780 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
November 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 795 Proposed Jury Instructions by Craig Wright. (McGovern, Amanda)
November 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 794 Proposed Jury Instructions by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Freedman, Devin)
November 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 793 Proposed Jury Instructions by Craig Wright. (McGovern, Amanda)
November 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 792 Proposed Jury Instructions by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Freedman, Devin)
November 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 791 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC Re: Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Freedman, Devin)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 790 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/19/2021. Day 13. Defense continues with the presentation of their case. Witness Mr. Kuharcik continues testifying. Dr. Ami Klin is sworn and testified. Exhibits presented, Evidence entered. This case is in recess until Monday, 11/22/21 at 9:30 am. Total time in court: 5 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Alexander J. Holtzman, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Michael A. Fernandez, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 789 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re #786 Response in Opposition to Motion Errata to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law) (Brenner, Andrew)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 788 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #787 Motion PERMITTING MR. KUHARCIK TO FULLY TESTIFY AT TRIAL for reasons stated on the record. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 787 MOTION DR. WRIGHT'S MOTION IN SUPPORT OF PERMITTING MR. KUHARCIK TO FULLY TESTIFY AT TRIAL by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 786 RESPONSE in Opposition re #780 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Brenner, Andrew)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 785 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Regarding David Kuharcik Privilege Assertions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Brenner, Andrew)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 784 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/18/2021. Day 12. Defense continues with the presentation of their case. Witnesses Dr. D. Stewart MacIntyre, Jr., Kimon Andreou, Carter Conrad, and David Kuharcik testified. Exhibits presented, evidence entered. This case is in recess until 11/19/21 at 9:30 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Stephen Lagos, Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Alexander J. Holtzman, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ta00)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 783 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/17/2021. Day 11. Defense continues with the presentation of their case. Kevin Madura continues to testify with Direct and Cross examination. Witnesses Nicolas Chambers and Dr. D. Stewart MacIntyre are sworn and testify. Exhibits presented, Evidence entered. Donald Lynam and Lynn Wright testify via video deposition. This case is in recess until 11/18/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Michael A. Fernandez, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 782 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #780 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Craig Wright (McGovern, Amanda)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 781 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/16/2021. Day 10. Defendant's Ore Tenus motion is denied for the reasons stated on the record. Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice ECF No. #776 is granted for the reasons stated on the record. Plaintiffs continue with the presentation of their case. Dr. Matthew J. Edman continues to testify on direct examination, cross, and redirect. Plaintiffs rest. Defense begins presentation of their case. Kevin Madura is sworn and testifies. Exhibits presented, evidence entered. This case is in recess until 11/17/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Stephen Lagos, Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Michael A. Fernandez, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego) Modified on 11/17/2021 to note end of Plf's case start of Def. (ego).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 780 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #768 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 12/1/2021 (ls)(per DE #777)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 779 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/15/2021. Day 9. Witness Caig Wright, Dr. Matthew J. Edman testified. Plaintiffs continue with the presentation of their case. Witness Dr. Craig Wright continues to testify. Exhibits presented, evidence entered. Dr. Matthew J. Edman testified. This case is in recess until 11/16/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Darrell Winston Payne, Stephen Lagos, Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Michael A. Fernandez, Jorge Alejandro Mestre, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 778 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jorge Alejandro Mestre on behalf of Craig Wright. Attorney Jorge Alejandro Mestre added to party Craig Wright(pty:dft). (Mestre, Jorge)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 777 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #775 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to respond to the non-party's motion for fees (DE 768). Plaintiff's response to the motion is due on 12/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/15/2021. (hk02)
November 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 776 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice (Brenner, Andrew)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 775 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Non-Party Andrew O'Hagan's re #768 Motion to Compel by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 11/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brenner, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 774 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/10/2021. Day 8. Witness Dr. Craig Wright testified. Exhibits presented, evidence entered. This case is in recess until 11/15/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 4 hour(s) : 0 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Stephen Lagos, Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, and Schneur Zalman Kass. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ta00)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 773 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samantha Marie Licata on behalf of Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Attorney Samantha Marie Licata added to party Ira Kleiman(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha Marie Licata added to party W&K Info Defense Research, LLC(pty:pla). (Licata, Samantha)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 772 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/9/2021. Day 7. Witness Dr. Craig Wright testifies. Exhibits presented, evidence entered. This case is in recess until 11/10/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Stephen Lagos, Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, and Schneur Zalman Kass. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ta00)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 771 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/8/2021. Day 6. Plaintiff continues with the presentation of their case. Witness Ramona Watts' deposition is read to the jury. Andrew O'Hagan testifies as a witness via video. Dr. Craig Wright is sworn and testifies. Exhibits presented, evidence entered. This case is in recess until 11/8/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 8 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Andres Rivero, Zaharah R. Markoe, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 770 ORDER REFERRING #768 Motion to Compel filed by Andrew O'Hagan. Motion referred to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 769 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/5/2021. Day 5. Plaintiff continues with the presentation of their case. Witness Ira Klieman continues testifying on Cross Examination and Redirect. Exhibits presented, evidence entered. Jonathan Warren and Debrah Kobza testify as witnesses via video deposition. This case is in recess until 11/8/21 at 9:30 am. Total time in court: 6 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 768 MOTION Non-Party Andrew OHagans Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiffs To Pay Fees And Costs Related To Document And Deposition Discovery In England And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Andrew O'Hagan. Attorney Guy Austin Rasco added to party Andrew O'Hagan(pty:ip). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Order Nicklin J, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Recording of Foreign Judgment)(Rasco, Guy) Event type Modified on 11/5/2021 (scn).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 767 MEMORANDUM of Law REQUESTING RECONSIDERATION OF TRIAL RULINGS CONCERNING THE WORK PRODUCT PRIVILEGE AND THE ADMISSIBILITY OF PLAINTIFFS PRIVILEGE LOG by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rivero, Andres)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 766 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/4/2021. Day 4. Plaintiff continues with the presentation of their case. Witness Ira Klieman continues testifying on cross examination. Exhibits presented, evidence entered. This case is in recess until 11/4/21 at 10:00 am. Total time in court: 7 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 765 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/3/2021. Day 3. MOTION to Seal Limited Portions of Trial, Including Portions Of Deposition Transcript was denied in part and granted in part for the reasons stated on the record. Plaintiff continues with the presentation of their case. Jaime Wilson and Jimmy Nguyen testify as witnesses via video deposition. Ira Klieman was sworn and testified. Exhibits presented, evidence entered. This case is in recess until 11/4/21 at 10:00 am.Total time in court: 7 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Darrell Winston Payne, Patricia L. Glaser, Kyle Roche, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 764 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #759 Motion to Seal for reasons stated on the record at the hearing. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 763 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial held on 11/2/2021. Day 2. Plaintiff continues presenting their case. Witness Andreas Antonopoulos continues testifying on the stand with Direct, Cross, and Redirect examination. Witness Patrick Paige is sworn and testifies. Exhibits presented, Evidence entered. Witnesses Robert Radonovsky and Gavin Andresen testify as witnesses via video deposition. This case is in recess until 11/3 at 10:00. Total time in court: 7 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Jorge Mestre, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 762 PAPERLESS ORDER setting hearing on ECF No. #759 Motion to Seal Limited Portions of Trial, Including Portions of Deposition Transcript. Motion hearing set for 11/3/2021 at 09:45 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. The link to join is: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1610487900?pwd=VXpEblhyM3hRTXVPQVpnd0JDdHpqZz09. Alternatively, the Meeting ID is: 161 048 7900, and the Passcode is: 336865. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 761 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (518561)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 760 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Jury Trial begun on 11/1/2021. 30 jurors sworn in voir dire. Jury panel of 10 sworn and selected. Preliminary Instructions given. Opening Statements heard. Plaintiffs present their case, witness Andreas Antonopoulos sworn and testified. This case is in recess until 11/2/21 at 10:00 am in the Miami Division, 400 North Miami Avenue, Courtroom 10-2. Total time in court: 8 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Michael A. Fernandez, Andres Rivero, Zaharah R. Markoe, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 759 MOTION to Seal LIMITED PORTIONS OF TRIAL, INCLUDING PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT per Local Rule 5.4 by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Payne, Darrell)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reopened as per ECF No. #651 . (ego)
October 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 758 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Amended Trial Exhibit List, #2 Objection Key) (Freedman, Devin)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 757 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #755 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 756 NOTICE by Craig Wright Dr. Craig Wright's Notice of Filing Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Craig Wright's Amended Trial Exhibit List) (Rivero, Andres)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 755 MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 754 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Devin Freedman (Freedman, Devin)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 753 Corrected Transcript and Notice of Correction of Corrected Transcript as to date on title page, held on 10/14/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 58 pages, re: #723 Transcript,, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (yhz)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER granting #726 Expedited Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order on Deposition Objections. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 751 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #747 Motion for Order of Witness Presentation. Plaintiffs have not requested that the Defendant testify exclusively during Plaintiffs' case-in-chief so no ruling is necessary. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 750 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #726 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION for Partial Reconsideration of Order on Deposition Objections re #720 Order filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brenner, Andrew)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 749 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #748 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Tibor L. Nagy. Noncompliance with LR 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys as follows: (1) PHV Attorney did not include the language in their Certification that they have not filed three or more motions for pro hac vice admission in this District within the last 365 days. (sample motion can be found on the Courts website); (2) PHV attorney did not include contact information in their motion, pursuant to AO 2005-38; and (3) Local counsel/Movant must sign/file documents under the name listed on the SDFL Roll of Attorneys, Devin Freedman. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 748 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Tibor L. Nagy, Jr.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15128843 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 11/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 747 MOTION on Order of Witness Presentation by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres) Modified Text on 10/28/2021 (ls).
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 746 NOTICE of Striking #745 MOTION on Order of Witness Presentation by Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 745 MOTION on Order of Witness Presentation by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 744 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #743 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 743 MOTION to Seal Redlined, Redacted Transcript per Local Rule 5.4 by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Payne, Darrell)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 742 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #741 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Alexander J. Holtzman. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 741 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alexander J. Holtzman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15126244 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 11/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brenner, Andrew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 740 RESPONSE in Opposition re #726 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION for Partial Reconsideration of Order on Deposition Objections re #720 Order filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 11/2/2021. (McGovern, Amanda)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 739 CLERK'S Notice of Maintaining Audio-Visual Exhibit(s) received from Plaintiff 1 USB-drive containing the defendant's exhibits that plaintiffs have objected to. (rrs)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 738 ORDER on Motion to Withdraw granting #736 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Bryan Lee Paschal representing Wright, Craig (Defendant) terminated per DE #736 . (lbc)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE by Craig Wright Dr. Craig Wright's Notice of Filing Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Craig Wright's Amended Trial Exhibit List) (Rivero, Andres)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 736 NOTICE by Craig Wright Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Paschal, Bryan)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 735 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF Nos. #733 & #734 Motions to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 734 MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by Craig Wright. Responses due by 11/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivero, Andres)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 733 MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by Craig Wright. Responses due by 11/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivero, Andres)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 732 Exhibit List Notice by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List)(Freedman, Devin)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #726 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION for Partial Reconsideration of Order on Deposition Objections re #720 Order. Responses due by 10/26/2021 (ls)(per DE #727)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 731 NOTICE by Craig Wright Dr. Craig Wright's Notice of Filing Corrected Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Craig Wright's Corrected Amended Trial Exhibit List) (Rivero, Andres)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 730 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #729 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 729 MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 11/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 728 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of a thumb-drive with copies of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (scn)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 727 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Defendant's expedited response by October 26, 2021, to Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order on Deposition Objections, ECF No. #726 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 726 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION for Partial Reconsideration of Order on Deposition Objections re #720 Order by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Brenner, Andrew)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 725 NOTICE by Craig Wright Dr. Craig Wright's Notice of Filing Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Craig Wright's Amended Trial Exhibit List) (Rivero, Andres)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 724 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Amended Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Amended Trial Exhibit List) (Freedman, Devin)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 723 TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearings held on 10/14/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 58 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2022. (yhz)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 722 PAPERLESS ORDER VACATING ECF No. 719 Order granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Daniela Tenjido Sierra, ECF No. #718 . Pursuant to Rule 4(a) of the Local Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys, "[a]ttorneys residing within this district and practicing before this Court are expected to be members of the bar of this Court." Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 721 PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2021 re ECF Nos. #693 , #697 , #698 , #699 , & #700 . Attorney Appearance(s): Darrell Winston Payne, Patricia L. Glaser, Richard W. Buckner, Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Maxwell V. Pritt, Michael A. Fernandez, Daniela Tenjido Sierra, Amanda Marie McGovern, and Schneur Zalman Kass. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. For the reasons stated on the record, Motion to Seal Limited Portions of Trial per Local Rule 5.4, ECF No. #693 , is granted in part and denied in part. The Court will not seal the courtroom during the use of the witness' testimony but will accommodate the safety concerns of the witness. The witness' counsel shall confer with counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant to determine which items may be sealed and/or modified. As further stated on the record, the Motion to Exclude the Australian Taxation Office's Tax Audit Documents, ECF No. #697 , is denied; the Court defers ruling on the Motion to Exclude Improper Character Evidence at Trial, ECF No. #698 ; the Motion to Introduce Dave Kleiman's Electronic Data Storage Devices at Trial, ECF No. #699 is denied; and the Brief in Support of the Admissibility of the Demonstrative They Intend to Use in Opening, ECF No. #700 , is granted in part and denied in part. During the hearing, Plaintiff made an ore tenus motion to amend their exhibit list to include additional exhibits, which the Court granted. The parties shall confer regarding Defendant's request to amend his exhibit list. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER ON DEPOSITION OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Daniela Tenjido Sierra representing Wright, Craig (Defendant) terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Daniela Tenjido Sierra. (ls)(per DE #722)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 719 "VACATED" PAPERLESS ORDER granting #718 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Daniela Tenjido Sierra. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) Modified on 10/14/2021 (ls). (per DE #722)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 718 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniela Tenjido Sierra. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15089573 by Craig Wright. Responses due by 10/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivero, Andres)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 717 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #697 MOTION Dr. Craig Wright's Motion to Exclude the Australian Taxation Office's Tax Audit Documents DR. CRAIG WRIGHTS REPLY IN SUPOPRT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE AUSTRALIAN TAXATION OFFICES TAX AUDIT DOCUMENTS filed by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 716 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #700 MOTION PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMISSIBILITY OF THE DEMONSTRATIVE THEY INTEND TO USE IN OPENING filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 715 RESPONSE in Support re #698 MOTION Dr. Craig Wright's Motion to Exclude Improper Character Evidence at Trial filed by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 714 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #699 MOTION DR. CRAIG WRIGHTS MOTION TO INTRODUCE DAVE KLEIMANS ELECTRONIC DATA STORAGE DEVICES AT TRIAL DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO INTRODUCE DAVE KLEIMANS ELECTRONIC DATA STORAGE DEVICES AT TRIAL filed by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 713 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #712 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 712 MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom for Use at the October 14, 2021 Hearing by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brenner, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 711 Clerks Notice to Filer re 707 Sealed Document. Document Not Captioned. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must have the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (mc)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 710 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re #700 MOTION PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMISSIBILITY OF THE DEMONSTRATIVE THEY INTEND TO USE IN OPENING OF FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Demonstrative Exhibit) (Freedman, Devin)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 709 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #706 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 708 RESPONSE in Opposition re #697 MOTION Dr. Craig Wright's Motion to Exclude the Australian Taxation Office's Tax Audit Documents filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 10/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brenner, Andrew)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 706 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude the Australian Taxation Offices Tax Audit Documents per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Brenner, Andrew)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 705 RESPONSE to Motion re #699 MOTION DR. CRAIG WRIGHTS MOTION TO INTRODUCE DAVE KLEIMANS ELECTRONIC DATA STORAGE DEVICES AT TRIAL filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 10/13/2021. (Freedman, Devin)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 704 RESPONSE in Opposition re #698 MOTION Dr. Craig Wright's Motion to Exclude Improper Character Evidence at Trial filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 10/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brenner, Andrew)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 703 RESPONSE in Opposition re #700 MOTION PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMISSIBILITY OF THE DEMONSTRATIVE THEY INTEND TO USE IN OPENING filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 10/13/2021. (McGovern, Amanda)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 707 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (761827)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 702 Corrected Transcript and Notice of Correction of Corrected Transcript held on 09/14/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 95 pages, re: #690 Transcript,, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (yhz)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 701 Clerks Notice to Filer re #700 MOTION PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMISSIBILITY OF THE DEMONSTRATIVE THEY INTEND TO USE IN OPENING . Wrong Event Selected - Document is NOT a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (scn)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 700 PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMISSIBILITY OF THE DEMONSTRATIVE THEY INTEND TO USE IN OPENING by Ira Kleiman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Freedman, Devin) Text Modified on 10/1/2021 (scn). Modified to pending motion per chambers on 10/7/2021 (wc).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 699 MOTION DR. CRAIG WRIGHTS MOTION TO INTRODUCE DAVE KLEIMANS ELECTRONIC DATA STORAGE DEVICES AT TRIAL by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rivero, Andres)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 698 MOTION Dr. Craig Wright's Motion to Exclude Improper Character Evidence at Trial by Craig Wright. (McGovern, Amanda)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 697 MOTION Dr. Craig Wright's Motion to Exclude the Australian Taxation Office's Tax Audit Documents by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 696 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #693 MOTION to Seal Limited Portions of Trial per Local Rule 5.4 : Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. (dj)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 695 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (dj)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 694 REPORT REGARDING (JOINT REPORT) REGARDING VACCINATION STATUS by Craig Wright (McGovern, Amanda)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 693 MOTION to Seal Limited Portions of Trial per Local Rule 5.4 by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Payne, Darrell)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 692 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #691 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 691 MOTION to Seal Deponents Deposition Transcript per Local Rule 5.4 by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Payne, Darrell)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 690 TRANSCRIPT of Calendar Call held on 09/14/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 95 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2021. (yhz)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 689 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Calendar Call held on 9/14/2021. Total time in court: 2 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Stephen N. Zack, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Michael A. Fernandez, Andres Rivero, Zaharah R. Markoe, Amanda Marie McGovern, and Schneur Zalman Kass. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. The Court made certain evidentiary rulings as reflected on the record. With respect to the remaining evidentiary issues discussed at Calendar Call, the parties are to file their briefings as follows: Motion due by 9/30/2021; Response due by 10/6/2021; Reply due by 10/12/2021. A special set hearing on the evidentiary issues will be held on 10/14/2021 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file a joint report no later than 9/24/2021 regarding the vaccination status of the parties, witnesses, and remaining members of the litigation team. (ta00)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 688 NOTICE of Receipt by Chambers. (ego)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 687 PAPERLESS ORDER regarding Calendar Call. The Calendar Call set for September 14, 2021 is RESET to 3:00 p.m. in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Consistent with the Court's Pre-trial Order, ECF No. #476 , the parties are instructed to have each demonstrative exhibit objected to with them at Calendar Call for review and ruling. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 686 REPORT REGARDING Corrected Joint Submission in Advance of Calendar Call by Craig Wright (McGovern, Amanda)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 685 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #684 Motion to Strike Joint Submission, ECF No. #680 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Joint MOTION to Strike #680 Report Regarding, 683 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney,, Amanda McGovern by Craig Wright. Responses due by 9/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McGovern, Amanda)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Clerks Notice to Filer re #680 Report Regarding. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (scn)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 682 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #681 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 681 MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom FOR USE AT THE SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 HEARING by Craig Wright. Responses due by 9/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Rivero, Andres)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 680 (STRICKEN PER DE#685) REPORT REGARDING JOINT SUBMISSION IN ADVANCE OF CALENDAR CALL by Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres) Text Modified on 9/10/2021 (scn).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER denying #675 Wright's request for assistance. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 678 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #676 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael A. Fernandez. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 677 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Thumb Drive with copies of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits re 658 Order. (scn)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 676 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael A. Fernndez. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14983550 by Craig Wright. Responses due by 9/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Rivero, Andres)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 675 Motion for Judge Bloom to Assist in Efforts to Obtain a Waiver of Travel Ban by Craig Wright Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed letter to U.S. Embassy) (Rivero, Andres) Event type Modified on 9/2/2021 (scn).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 674 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference via the Zoom platform held on 08/27/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 41 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2021. (yhz)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 673 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference held on 04/29/2020 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 16 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2021. (yhz)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 672 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Corrected Updated Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Updated Trial Exhibit List, #2 Objections Key) (Freedman, Devin)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 671 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Updated Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Updated Trial Exhibit List, #2 Objections Key) (Freedman, Devin)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 670 NOTICE by Craig Wright OF FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT. 1 PROPOSED QUESTION TO INCLUDE IN COURTS VOIR DIRE) (Rivero, Andres)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 669 NOTICE by Craig Wright OF FILING UPDATED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DR. CRAIG WRIGHTS UPDATED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST, #2 Exhibit OBJECTIONS KEY) (Rivero, Andres)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 668 Exhibit List JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST by Craig Wright.. (Rivero, Andres)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 667 Witness List JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL WITNESS LIST by Ira Kleiman.. (Freedman, Devin)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 666 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Status Conference held on 8/27/2021. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 0 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Maxwell V. Pritt, Andres Rivero, Zaharah R. Markoe, and Amanda Marie McGovern. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. As stated on the record, the parties are to confer and file a joint report by September 9, 2021. The calendar call set for September 14, 2021 at 1:45 p.m. will be held in person, unless the parties otherwise advise. (ta00)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 665 NOTICE of Hearing: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Status Conference set for 8/27/2021 AT 11:00 AM via video conference. The link to join the Zoom video conference is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1617699909?pwd=K2N0UGtGNnJZVUlMSWh2Q3g3SllOUT09. Alternatively, the Meeting ID is:161 769 9909 and the Passcode is:970343 (ego)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 664 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 09:00 AM via video conference. The link to join the Zoom video conference is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1617699909?pwd=K2N0UGtGNnJZVUlMSWh2Q3g3SllOUT09. Alternatively, the Meeting ID is:161 769 9909 and the Passcode is:970343. (ego)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 663 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #661 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Richard W. Buckner. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 662 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #660 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Patricia L. Glaser. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard W. Buckner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14868124 by John Doe. Responses due by 8/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Payne, Darrell)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 660 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patricia L. Glaser. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14868091 by John Doe. Responses due by 8/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Payne, Darrell)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 659 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Winston Payne on behalf of John Doe. Attorney Darrell Winston Payne added to party John Doe(pty:ip). (Payne, Darrell)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 658 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #657 Motion. The parties shall submit the objected to proposed trial exhibits on a thumb drive or external drive, with copies delivered to chambers and opposing counsel by August 31, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 657 Joint MOTION to Provide Objected to Proposed Trial Exhibits to The Court on Thumb Drive or External Hard Drive by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGovern, Amanda)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 656 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference via the Zoom platform held on 05/11/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 22 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (yhz)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 655 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Status Conference held on 5/11/2021. As stated on the record, on or before August 31, 2021, the parties shall file their revised exhibit lists and a joint exhibit list. Any remaining objections shall be reflected on the exhibit list identifying the legal basis for the objection. Additionally, on or before August 31, 2021, the parties shall supplement their joint witness list with a narrative of each witness for the Court to read to the jurors. Total time in court: 0 hour(s): 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Devin Freedman, Maxwell V. Pritt, Andres Rivero, and Amanda Marie McGovern. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ta00)
May 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 654 PAPERLESS ORDER regarding Status Conference on Tuesday, May 11, 2021, at 1:45 p.m. via video conference. The link to join the Zoom video conference is: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1618249771?pwd=dzZlLzd4WVY2WUl0eWRFRy9qK1RZUT09. Alternatively, the Meeting ID is: 161 824 9771, and the Passcode is: 326681. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 653 NOTICE by Craig Wright Corrected Joint Notice of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McGovern, Amanda)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 652 Clerks Notice to Filer re #650 Notice (Other). Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ls)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO RE-SET TRIAL DATE, RE-SET CALENDAR CALL, EXTEND THE DUE DATE FOR DEMONSTRATIVE AND SUMMARY EXHIBITS, AND REQUEST STATUS CONFERENCE: The Motion, ECF No. #649 , is GRANTED. Jury Trial reset for 11/1/2021 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Calendar Call reset for 9/14/2021 1:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Status Conference set for 5/11/2021 1:45 PM before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 650 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rivero, Andres)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 649 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time tore-set trial date, re-set calendar call, extend the due date for demonstrative and summary exhibits, and request status conference by Craig Wright. Responses due by 5/7/2021 (Rivero, Andres)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 648 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #644 Motion for Extension of Time to extend the demonstrative/summary exhibit deadline. The March 22, 2021 deadline is extended until April 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 647 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing of Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Objection Key) (Freedman, Devin)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 646 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Proposed Voir Dire (Attachments: #1 Proposed Voir Dire) (Brenner, Andrew)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 645 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Proposed Verdict Form (Attachments: #1 Proposed Verdict Form) (Brenner, Andrew)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 644 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend the demonstrative/summary exhibit deadline by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 3/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 643 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Proposed Verdict Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Verdict Form) (Rivero, Andres)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 642 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Proposed Voir Dire (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Voir Dire) (Rivero, Andres)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 641 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Objections Key to Exhibit List) (Rivero, Andres)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 640 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Thomas Scott. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Scott, Thomas)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 2/11/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 638 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #631 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Court's Civil Juror Questionnaire. At the scheduled calendar call, the Court will discuss its oral voir dire process, including its procedure regarding the disclosure of jurors' private or sensitive information. Moreover, the Court will permit the parties to inquire into relevant areas, including the Defendant's claimed developmental disability, pretrial publicity, and jurors' knowledge of witnesses to be called to trial. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 637 Clerks Notice to Filer re #635 Response in Support of Motion. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#636]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 636 REPLY to Response to Motion re #631 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File/Supplement the Court's Civil Juror Questionnaire filed by Craig Wright. (ls)(See Image at DE #635)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 635 RESPONSE in Support re #631 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File/Supplement the Court's Civil Juror Questionnaire Reply in Support filed by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rivero, Andres)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 634 RESPONSE in Opposition re #631 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File/Supplement the Court's Civil Juror Questionnaire filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 2/3/2021. (Brenner, Andrew)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 633 NOTICE of FILING Letter From Peter Silk. (Attachments: #1 pic 1, #2 pic 2) (ego)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 632 Clerks Notice to Filer re #631 Defendant's MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE COURTS CIVIL JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 631 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File/Supplement the Court's Civil Juror Questionnaire by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rivero, Andres) Modified Relief on 1/13/2021 (ls).
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 630 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #627 Notice (Other) into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Thomas E. Scott. (Rivero, Andres)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 629 Clerks Notice to Filer re #627 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The correct event is Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. AND Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator. (ls)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Thomas E Scott. Mediation Hearing set for 2/3/2021 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 627 NOTICE by Craig Wright JOINT NOTICE OF SCHEDULING MEDIATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation) (Rivero, Andres)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER - Granting in part #624 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines re #614 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. Calendar Call set for 5/11/2021 1:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Jury Trial set for 6/1/2021 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Status Conference set for 5/11/2021 1:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 625 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Status Conference held on 11/19/2020. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 18 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Devin Freedman, Andrew Scott Brenner, Maxwell V. Pritt, Andres Rivero, Zaharah R. Markoe, Amanda Marie McGovern, Schneur Zalman Kass, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. The Court will enter a separate Order addressing the matters discussed at the status conference. (cb00)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 624 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines re #614 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 12/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 623 OMNIBUS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #490 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 497 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (dj)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 622 OMNIBUS ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motion, ECF No. 492 , and granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion, ECF No. #500 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Letter from Chadwick Austin (ego)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference Re: Scheduling/Deadlines/Procedural Matters set for 11/19/2020 9:30 AM before Judge Beth Bloom via Zoom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 619 NOTICE by Craig Wright re #617 Pretrial Stipulation (McGovern, Amanda)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 618 Proposed Jury Instructions by Craig Wright. (McGovern, Amanda)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 617 PRETRIAL STIPULATION Joint Pretrial Stipulation by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Brenner, Andrew)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 616 PRETRIAL STIPULATION Joint Stipulated Facts by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Brenner, Andrew)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 615 OMNIBUS ORDER denying #487 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 498 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses; denying as moot #612 Motion for Leave to Supplement Record on Defendant's Pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER granting in part #613 Joint Motion to Extend Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines and Reset the Trial. Calendar Call reset for 12/15/2020 1:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Jury Trial reset for 1/4/2021 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 613 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines and Reset the Trial by Craig Wright. Responses due by 9/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rivero, Andres)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 612 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Record on Defendant's Pending Motion for Summary Judgment by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brenner, Andrew)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 611 NOTICE by Craig Wright Joint Notice of Filing Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20) (Rivero, Andres)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 609 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #608 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 608 Joint MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 610 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (514773)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #606 Joint Motion for Extension of Certain Pretrial Deadlines. Exhibit List due by 9/29/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 606 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Craig Wright. Responses due by 7/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGovern, Amanda)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 10/13/2020 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Calendar Call reset for 10/6/2020 1:45 PM before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 603 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #598 Motion to Seal ]per Court's Order and the Parties' Stipulation at ECF No. 467 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 604 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (514773)
June 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 602 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #596 Motion to Seal based upon ECF No. #597 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 601 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #597 Motion to Strike ECF No. #596 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 600 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18) (Rivero, Andres)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 599 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC Notice of Filing Counter-Designations & Objections (Attachments: #1 Deposition L. Wright, #2 Deposition D. Lynam, #3 Deposition G. Andresen, #4 Deposition I. Kleiman, #5 Deposition W&K) (Brenner, Andrew)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 598 MOTION to Seal Third-party deponent's deposition per Court's Order D.E. 475 by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 597 MOTION to Strike #596 MOTION to Seal Third-party deponent's deposition per Court's Order D.E. 475 by Craig Wright. Responses due by 7/10/2020 (Rivero, Andres)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 596 MOTION to Seal per Court's Order D.E. 475 by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER denying 507 Plaintiffs' Omnibus Sanctions Motion. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 594 Clerks Notice to Filer re #592 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#593]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 593 Joint Neutral Statement of: Case by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC, Craig Wright (ls)(See Image at DE #592)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 592 NOTICE by Craig Wright Joint Neutral Statement of Case (Rivero, Andres)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 591 Witness List (Joint) by Craig Wright.. (Rivero, Andres)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 590 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Redacted Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Freedman, Devin) Modified Text on 6/22/2020 (ls).
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 589 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Rivero, Andres)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 588 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #581 Motion to Seal. The Defendant shall file redacted copies of the depositions for the public view by June 19, 2020, after conferring with the Plaintiffs and the third parties that have designated their transcripts confidential. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 587 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #585 Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs shallfile redacted copies of the depositions for the public view by June 19, 2020, after conferring with the Defendant and the third parties that have designated their transcripts confidential. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 584 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Deposition Errata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Rivero, Andres)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 582 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1) (Rivero, Andres)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 581 MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 580 Clerk's Notice of Compliance re #579 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (cbr)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 583 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (514773)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 586 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #575 Motion in Support of Redactions. Directing Clerk of Court to Unseal #558 Reply in Support of Omnibus Motion in Limine, #560 Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER granting #542 Motion in Support of Redactions. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 577 REPLY to Response to Motion re #575 Defendant's MOTION in Support of Redactions filed by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 576 RESPONSE in Opposition re #575 Defendant's MOTION in Support of Redactions filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 6/17/2020. (Freedman, Devin)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Defendant's MOTION in Support of Redactions by Craig Wright. (Lohr, Whitney)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 574 REDACTION of PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Freedman, Devin)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 573 REDACTION of PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' DAUBERT MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENSE EXPERTS by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Freedman, Devin)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 572 REPLY to #551 Response/Reply (Other), in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion for Sanctions by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Freedman, Devin)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER granting #567 Joint Motion for Extension of Certain Pretrial Deadlines. Exhibit List due by 8/17/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/17/2020. Calendar Call set for 8/25/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 570 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #569 Motion for Leave to File Five (5) Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 569 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 568 Clerks Notice to Filer re #567 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Joint Motion for Extension of Time/Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivero, Andres) Modified Text on 6/5/2020 (ls).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER granting #553 Motion in Support of Redactions. The redacted items contained in ECF No. #550 shall remain redacted. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 565 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #564 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. As the parties are mindful of the deadlines imposed, the Court is equally aware of its obligations to decide matters in a timely manner. The Reply shall be filed by June 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 564 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 563 OMINIBUS ORDER denying #555 Motion to Seal ; denying #557 Motion to Seal ; denying #559 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (cbr) Modified to correct document type on 6/4/2020 (cbr).
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 562 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Whitney Lohr on behalf of Craig Wright. Attorney Whitney Lohr added to party Craig Wright(pty:dft). (Lohr, Whitney)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 561 REPLY to Response to Motion re #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Sealed Document PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin) Modified to unseal per DE #579 on 6/15/2020 (cbr).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Opposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 558 Sealed Document PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Freedman, Devin) Modified to unseal per DE #579 on 6/15/2020 (cbr).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Opposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Opposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 Defendant's REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINION TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESSES by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rivero, Andres)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Defendant's MOTION in support of Redactions by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rivero, Andres)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Defendant's REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION IN LIMINE [D.E. 490] by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 556 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Defendant's OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Rivero, Andres)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 550 REDACTION to PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSING STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47)(Freedman, Devin)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 549 REDACTION to PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Freedman, Devin)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 548 REDACTION to PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DR. WRIGHTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINION TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESSES by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Freedman, Devin)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 547 RESPONSE in Opposition re #490 Defendant's MOTION in Limine filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Freedman, Devin)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 546 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #545 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant may file a response to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Sanctions Motion, ECF No. 507 , with up to ten excess pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Respond to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Sanction Motions by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rivero, Andres)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 544 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. #543 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file a reply in support of their Omnibus Daubert Motion to Strike with up to 10 excess pages and a reply in support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with up to 5 excess pages. The request for a page count extension for the reply in support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine is denied. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 543 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brenner, Andrew)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 542 Defendant's Motion in Support of Redactions by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rivero, Andres) Modified to convert document to a motion on 6/12/2020 (ls).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Supplemental Evidence Supporting Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion for Sanctions ECF No. 507 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Freedman, Devin)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE of Compliance re #539 Order on Motion in Support of Redactions. D.E #495 Un-Sealed. (ra)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER granting #522 Motion in Support of Redactions. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (ra)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 538 OMNIBUS ORDER denying #524 Motion to Seal ; denying #527 Motion to Seal ; denying #530 Motion to Seal ; denying #532 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (ra)
May 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 537 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #536 Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies in support of the parties' summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, and motions in limine by June 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 536 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
May 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 535 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Index of Exhibits to Opposing Statement of Material Facts (Freedman, Devin) Modified Text on 5/26/2020 (ls).
May 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 534 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Opposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 531 NOTICE by Craig Wright Dr. Wright's Response To Plaintiffs' Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts (Rivero, Andres)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 530 Opposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 529 Defendant's RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS DAUBERT MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENSE EXPERTS by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Rivero, Andres)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Opposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Brenner, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 526 RESPONSE in Opposition re #494 Plaintiff's Opposed MOTION to Seal per Order authorizing the submission of this document und Dr. Craig Wright's Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 5/29/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Opposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Brenner, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 523 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Rivero, Andres)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 522 Defendant's MOTION in Support of Redactions by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rivero, Andres)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 521 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. #517 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. #487 , shall not exceed 40 pages. The response to Defendant's Statement of Material Facts, ECF No. 488], shall not exceed 25 pages. The response to Defendant's Motion in Limine, ECF No. #490 , shall not exceed 25 pages. The response to Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses, ECF No. #500 , shall not exceed 30 pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 520 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #519 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall file a response to ECF No. 507 by June 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 519 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 518 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Sealing [512-7] pursuant to 514 Paperless Order (nc)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 525 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (761827)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 533 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 528 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (761827)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Laselve)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 516 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #515 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant may file a response to Plaintiffs' omnibus motion, ECF No. #509 , by up to 20 excess pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 515 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 514 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #513 Motion to Seal.The Clerk of Court is directed to Seal ECF No. [512-7] and it will remain under seal until further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 7 re ECF No. #512 per Order authorizing the submission of this document under seal by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Freedman, Devin)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 512 REDACTION TO PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS SANCTIONS MOTION by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Freedman, Devin) Modified by Sealing [512-7] per 514 Paperless Order on 5/22/2020 (nc).
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 511 REDACTION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 1-4, #5 Exhibit 1-5, #6 Exhibit 1-6, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 8-1, #15 Exhibit 8-2, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit 14)(Freedman, Devin)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 510 REDACTION TO PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Freedman, Devin)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 509 REDACTION TO PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS DAUBERT MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENSE EXPERTS by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Freedman, Devin)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER denying #506 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (ra)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 506 MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 505 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #503 Motion for Leave to File 5 Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 504 RESPONSE in Opposition re #503 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 5/22/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 503 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brenner, Andrew)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 507 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER re #491 Motion to Seal, #493 Motion to Seal, #494 Motion to Seal, and #496 Motion to Seal are DENIED. However, the Seale Motions ECF Nos. 492 , #495 , 497 ,and 498 , shall REMAIN UNDER SEAL until further Court order. Defendant shall respond to the sealed motions by May 22, 2020. To the extent Defendant believes that certain portions of the sealed motions are exempt from the public's right of access, the parties shall confer in good faith, By no later than May 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (nc)
May 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 501 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Index of Exhibits (Harrison, Laselve) Modified Text on 5/11/2020 (ls).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MOTION to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Rivero, Andres)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 499 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Intent to Raise an Issue of Australian Law (Harrison, Laselve)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Plaintiff's Opposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Harrison, Laselve) Modified Text on 5/11/2020 (ls).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Un-Sealed Document as per #539 Order Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Harrison, Laselve) Modified to Un-Seal on 5/26/2020 as per #539 Order (ra).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 494 Plaintiff's Opposed MOTION to Seal per Order authorizing the submission of this document under seal by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Harrison, Laselve) Modified Text on 5/11/2020 (ls).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Plaintiff's Opposed MOTION to Seal per Order authorizing the submission of this document under seal by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Brenner, Andrew) Modified Text on 5/11/2020 (ls).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 491 Opposed MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin) Modified Text on 5/11/2020 (ls).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Defendant's MOTION in Limine by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 489 NOTICE by Craig Wright re #488 Statement, Index of Exhibits (Rivero, Andres)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Statement of: Of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Craig Wright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Rivero, Andres)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 487 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Craig Wright. Responses due by 5/22/2020 (Rivero, Andres)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 492 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 497 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1485028)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 498 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (761827)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 486 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #485 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The parties are each permitted to file an omnibus motion in limine that exceeds the page limits by 15 pages, and an omnibus Daubert motion that exceeds the page limits by 20 pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brenner, Andrew)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 484 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #479 Motion for Extension of Time by one week, or no later than May 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 483 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #482 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Each party is permitted to file a motion for summary judgment with 10 excess pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 481 RESPONSE in Opposition re #479 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Sanctions filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 5/13/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 480 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Defendant's expedited response by May 7, 2020, to ECF No. #479 , Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Sanctions Motion. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #479 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Sanctions . Responses due by 5/7/2020 (ls)(per DE #480)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 479 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Sanctions by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 5/19/2020 (Freedman, Devin)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 478 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 04/29/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-29 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2020. (Franklin, Stephen)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 477 PAPERLESS MinuteEntry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Telephone Conference held on 4/29/2020. For the reasons stated on the record, ECF #466 was granted. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Devin Freedman, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Richard Buckner, Patricia Glaser, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego) for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Telephone Conference held on 4/29/2020. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ego)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS BEFORE CALENDAR CALL: Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 475 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #466 Motion to Seal. Matter shall remain sealed until further Court Order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 474 PROTECTIVE ORDER Motions terminated: 467 Joint SEALED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION filed by Craig Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (BER)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 473 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: re 467 Joint SEALED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF JOINT STIPULATION, #466 Joint MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/29/2020 03:30 PM 1- 877-336-1829 on said date and time. The access code is 4742152 and the security code is 5680. For clarity, please do not use a cell phone or a speaker phone before Judge Beth Bloom. (ego)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 472 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Telephone Status Conference re: DE 467 held on 4/29/2020. The conference was open to the public until the 28-minute mark. Thereafter the conference is SEALED. Total time in court: 34 minutes. (Digital BER_1_4.29.2020) (hk02)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 471 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 04/24/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-29 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2020. (Franklin, Stephen)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 470 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 4/29/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel, parties, or members of the public can attend by dialing: 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Counsel shall dial in from a landline whenever possible; cellphone attendees, after noting appearance, and members of the public must remain on mute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/28/2020. (hk02)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 469 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 4/9/20 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-24 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2020. (hh)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 468 PAPERLESS Order Cancelling the Evidentiary Hearing scheduled for 1:00 p.m. today based on the parties' joint stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/28/2020. (hk02)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Joint MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Craig Wright, Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Rivero, Andres) Modified Filers on 4/28/2020 (ls).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 465 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Telephone Conference with counsel held on 4/24/2020. This conference was closed to the public and is SEALED. Total time in court: 30 minutes. (Digital BER_3_4.24.2020) (hk02)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 464 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing held on 4/24/2020. The hearing was open to the public until the 29 minute-mark; the remainder of the hearing was closed to the public and is SEALED. Total time in court: 37 minutes. (Digital BER_2_4.24.2020) (hk02)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 467 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (514773)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 463 PAPERLESS ORDER re 461 Sealed Joint Discovery Memorandum. In accordance with the rulings made on the record during today's hearings, the Court is overruling Defendant's objection to the confidentiality designation in Plaintiffs' initial disclosures. The Court will revisit this ruling during the Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/28/2020 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Any briefing on this issue is due by 8:00 p.m. on 4/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/24/2020. (hk02)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 462 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #460 Motion to Seal Re: 461 Sealed Document filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/24/2020. (hk02)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 460 MOTION to Seal Joint Discovery Memorandum per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Freedman, Devin)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 PAPERLESS Order setting a Discovery Hearing for 4/24/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel, parties, or members of the public can attend by dialing: 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Counsel shall dial in from a landline whenever possible; cellphone attendees, after noting appearance, and members of the public must remain on mute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/23/2020. (hk02)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 461 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 458 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 04/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-55 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2020. (Franklin, Stephen)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER memorializing rulings during discovery hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 456 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing regarding Mr. Lynam's written statement and Defendant's expert disclosures held on 4/17/2020. Total time in court: 1 hour : 4 minutes. (Digital BER_1_4.17.2020) (hk02)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 455 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 4/1/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-37 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie Joy Lewis, 954-985-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2020. (apz)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER - It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Discovery Order, ECF No. #420 , is AFFIRMED and Defendants Objection to the Discovery Order, ECF No. #434 , is OVERRULED. Defendants shall produce the materials ordered to be produced by the Discovery Order, ECF No. #420 , by April 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) Document type modified on 4/13/2020. (scn)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 PAPERLESS Order setting Discovery Hearing for 4/17/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel, parties, or members of the public can attend by dialing: 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Counsel shall dial in from a landline whenever possible; cellphone attendees, after noting appearance, and members of the public must remain on mute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/13/2020. (hk02)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 452 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing on DE 449 held on 4/9/2020. Total time in court: 35 minutes. (Digital BER_1_4.9.2020) (hk02)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 451 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #449 the parties' Joint Motion for Discovery. Defendant's Requests for Admission regarding Mr. Kleiman's educational background are relevant and Plaintiffs' objections are overruled. Regarding Defendant's assertion of work product privilege over Mr. Lynam's statement, Defense counsel shall submit the statement for in camera review along with any supportive documentation by 4/17/20 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' request for Defendant's assistance in effecting service of process on Mr. Nguyen is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/9/2020. (hk02)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 REPLY to #445 Response in Opposition to Motion, #434 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #420 Order to District Court DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE ORDER ON DISCOVERY by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MOTION for Discovery JOINT DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM by Craig Wright. Responses due by 4/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rivero, Andres)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 PAPERLESS Order setting Telephonic Discovery Hearing for 4/9/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall use the conference call instructions previously provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/6/2020. (hk02)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearings per DE 448 Order. Discovery Hearing set for 4/9/2020 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (kpe)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER granting #443 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order limiting Plaintiffs' interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 446 PAPERLESS ORDER Cancelling the telephone hearing scheduled for today based on counsel's representation that they have resolved the dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/2/2020. (hk02)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 RESPONSE in Opposition re #434 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #420 Order to District Court DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE ORDER ON DISCOVERY filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 4/8/2020. (Freedman, Devin)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 4/1/2020. A continued Telephonic Discovery Hearing is hereby set for 4/2/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart using the same conference call instructions. Total time in court: 53 minutes. (Digital BER_2_4.1.2020) (hk02)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Discovery Memorandum by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 4/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Brenner, Andrew)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephone Discovery Hearing for 4/1/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall appear using the following conference call instructions: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/30/2020. (hk02)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER Amending Scheduling Order granting in part and denying in part #436 Expedited Motion for Enlargement of Time of Expert Related Deadlines and for Extension of Time to Complete Three Fact Witness Depositions. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Expert Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/8/2020. In Limine Motions due by 5/8/2020. Motions due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 REPLY to #436 EXPEDITED MOTION for Enlargement of Time of Expert Related Deadlines and for Extension of Time to Complete Three Fact Witness Depositions by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 RESPONSE in Opposition re #436 EXPEDITED MOTION for Enlargement of Time of Expert Related Deadlines and for Extension of Time to Complete Three Fact Witness Depositions filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 4/1/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring the Plaintiffs' expedited response by April 1, 2020 to ECF No. #434 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring the Defendant's expedited response by March 25, 2020 to ECF No. #436 Expedited Motion. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 EXPEDITED MOTION for Enlargement of Time of Expert Related Deadlines and for Extension of Time to Complete Three Fact Witness Depositions by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 2/25/20 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-12 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie J. Lewis, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2020. (hh)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #420 Order to District Court DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE ORDER ON DISCOVERY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J)(Rivero, Andres)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #431 Motion to Seal until further Court order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 433 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (514773)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #346 Corrected Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 3/5/20 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-116 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2020. (hh)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 PAPERLESS ORDER denying ECF No. #422 Motion. The Court is mindful of the concerns related to deposing Defendant in person in London because of the COVID-19 virus. In light of the potential health risks associated with international travel, the Court permits Plaintiffs the option to make arrangements to take Defendant's deposition by videoconferencing and providing all documents through a share file or physically sent to London via Federal Express or by another international overnight delivery servicer in preparation for the deposition. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Exhibits Introduced by Dr. Wright at the March 5, 2020 Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Rivero, Andres) Modified Text on 3/12/2020 (ls).
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 RESPONSE to Motion re #422 Expedited MOTION to Postpone Dr. Wright's Deposition filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 3/18/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #422 Plaintiff's MOTION to Postpone Dr. Wright's Deposition . Responses due by 3/13/2020 (ls)(per DE #423)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #409 Motion to Seal until further Court order. Re: ECF No. 417 Order on Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring the Defendant's expedited response by March 13, 2020, to ECF No. #422 , Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion To Postpone Dr. Wright's Deposition. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 Expedited MOTION to Postpone Dr. Wright's Deposition by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin) Modified Text on 3/11/2020 (ls).
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 REQUEST/ORDER FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE re 417 Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (tmn)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER re Plaintiffs' objections to Defendant's claims of privilege #394 , #389 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 PAPERLESS ORDER re #414 Order to Show Cause. At the discovery hearing on March 5, 2020, defense counsel made an ore tenus motion for the Court to reconsider its prior order directing that the trust document at DE 369-1 be filed in redacted form. Defendant's motion is granted. DE 369-1 shall remain under seal until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/6/2020. (hk02)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting 412 Plaintiffs' Sealed Motion for the issuance of letters rogatory. This ruling is without prejudice for Defendant to renew his relevance objections at a later date. The granting of this motion does not extend any other deadlines. Plaintiffs shall email a proposed order in Word format for Judge Reinhart's signature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/6/2020. (hk02)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 RESPONSE DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing re: DE 389, 394, 396, 404 held on 3/5/2020. Written order to follow. Total time in court: 2 hours : 16 minutes. (Digital 14:31:05) (hk02)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Clerk's Notice of Compliance re #414 Order (cbr)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Defendant and directing Clerk of Court to unseal the notice at DE 369. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 413 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (BB)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 412 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 STATUS REPORT JOINT DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT by Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MOTION to Seal by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Freedman, Devin)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 392 Plaintiffs' SEALED MOTION for reconsideration of certain discovery rulings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 410 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 REPLY to #395 Response/Reply (Other) In Support Of PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN DISCOVERY REQUESTS by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing on DE 404 held on 2/25/2020. The Court will resume the hearing to consider whether Defendant has satisfied his burden to establish privilege at the hearing already scheduled for 3/5/20 at 2:30 p.m. Total time in court: 11 minutes. (Digital 14:04:31) (hk02)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #403 Motion to Seal until further court order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (cb00)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Joint Status Report per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Brenner, Andrew)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 404 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (761827)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 PAPERLESS ORDER RESETTING the Discovery Hearing on 2/25/2020 to 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Counsel shall file a status report regarding the dispute on 2/24/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/21/2020. (hk02)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #400 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Stephen Lagos. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stephen Lagos. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12480272 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 3/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Stephen Lagos, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Constantine Philip Economides on behalf of Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Attorney Constantine Philip Economides added to party Ira Kleiman(pty:pla), Attorney Constantine Philip Economides added to party W&K Info Defense Research, LLC(pty:pla). (Economides, Constantine)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 PAPERLESS Order setting a Miscellaneous Hearing re: privilege issues for 3/5/2020 at 2:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel may appear telephonically using the conference call instructions previously provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/19/2020. (hk02)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 PAPERLESS Order setting a Telephonic Discovery Hearing for 2/25/2020 at 5:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall use the following conference call instructions: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/19/2020. (hk02)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Plaintiff's REPLY to #394 Response/Reply (Other) in re Defendant's privilege designations by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 RESPONSE DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN DISCOVERY REQUESTS by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rivero, Andres)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 394 RESPONSE to #389 Memorandum DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' CHALLENGE TO HIS PRIVILEGE DESIGNATIONS by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rivero, Andres)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #391 Motion to Seal until further court order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Freedman, Devin)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 PAPERLESS ORDER directing Defendant to file a response to #389 Plaintiffs' Memorandum re: privilege designations by 2/11/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/4/2020. (hk02)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 392 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
February 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 389 MEMORANDUM of Law challenging Craig Wright's privilege designations by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laselve Elijah Harrison on behalf of Ira Kleiman. Attorney Laselve Elijah Harrison added to party Ira Kleiman(pty:pla). (Harrison, Laselve)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing regarding the filing at DE 369 which will remain under seal, any objections to the parties' confidentiality designations, and privilege log issues held on 1/29/2020. Counsel will contact the Court to set a date for a future hearing on privilege issues. Total time in court: 30 minutes. (Digital 14:06:38) (hk02)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 PAPERLESS ORDER directing Plaintiffs to submit for in camera review the portions of Defendant's privilege log where Plaintiffs claim that Defendant improperly asserts a privilege on behalf of a third party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/22/2020. (hk02)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 PAPERLESS ORDER allowing counsel to appear at the 1/29/20 discovery hearing by telephone using the conference call instructions previously provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/22/2020. (hk02)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 384 PAPERLESS Order setting a Discovery Hearing regarding Defendant's proposed redactions to the sealed exhibit for 1/29/2020 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall file a joint notice 48 hours in advance of the hearing setting forth the agreed-upon redactions and those still in dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/22/2020. (hk02)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 383 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 01/09/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-74 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2020. (sf)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #377 Motion to Continue Trial Date; granting in part and denying in part #377 Motion for Extension of Time of Pretrial Deadlines; (Discovery due by 4/17/2020., Expert Discovery due by 4/17/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 5/4/2020., In Limine Motions due by 5/4/2020., Motions due by 5/4/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/15/2020., Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 REPLY to Response to Motion re #377 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue pretrial deadlines and trial datePlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline for Plaintiffs filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Brenner, Andrew)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 380 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 1/2/20 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-44 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie J. Lewis, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2020. (hh)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 RESPONSE in Opposition re #377 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue pretrial deadlines and trial datePlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline for Plaintiffs filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 1/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rivero, Andres)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 NOTICE by Craig Wright re #377 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue pretrial deadlines and trial datePlaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline for Plaintiffs of Intent to Respond (Rivero, Andres)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue pretrial deadlines and trial date ( Responses due by 1/28/2020), Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline for Plaintiffs by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 376 NOTICE of Compliance WITH COURTS JANUARY 10, 2020 ORDER by Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #374 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Extend Discovery and to Postpone the Depositions of Craig Wright, Ramona Watts and Andrew O'Hagan. The depositions of Craig Wright, Ramona Watts and Andrew O'Hagan are postponed. Plaintiffs shall have until Tuesday, January 14, 2020 to file a motion seeking any additional relief requested as a result of this Court's January 10, 2020 Order, ECF No. #373 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION to Continue London Depositions by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER affirming in part and reversing in part ECF No. #277 , and sustaining in part and overruling in part ECF No. #311 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom See attached document for full details. (ak03)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER Regarding Defendant's Non-Disclosure Agreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 371 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #303 Motion for Attorney Fees based upon the filing of Plaintiffs' Corrected Verified Motion for Attorneys' Fees, ECF No. #346 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 370 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing held on 1/9/2020. Total time in court: 1 hour : 18 minutes. (Digital 14:32:31) (hk02)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Sealed Document Notice of Filing of Tulip Trust III by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Tulip Trust III) (Freedman, Devin) Modified to unseal main document per DE #414 on 3/5/2020 (cbr).
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Motion to Seal, ECF No. #367 , until further Court order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal a Third Tulip Trust document per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Freedman, Devin)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 PAPERLESS Order setting a Telephonic Discovery Hearing for 1/9/2020 at 2:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall use the conference call information previously provided. Counsel are ordered to meet and confer by speaking with each other prior to the hearing, and not via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/8/2020. (hk02)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Responses to their Second Request for Admissions as raised in #362 the parties' Joint Discovery Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing on DE 362 held on 1/2/2020. With the exception of one issue, the Court ruled from the bench on the parties' disputes. A written order at that issue will be filed separately. Total time in court: 55 minutes. (Digital 15:02:33) (hk02)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 363 PAPERLESS ORDER denying 327 Defendant's Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/2/2020. (hk02)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Discovery Memorandum by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 1/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Freedman, Devin)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER denying without prejudice #344 Motion to Require Defendant to Make His Wife Ramona Watts Available for Deposition or, in the Alternative, Preclude Her From Testifying at Trial. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 PAPERLESS Order setting a Discovery Hearing for 1/2/2020 at 3:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel may appear telephonically using the conference call instructions previously provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/30/2019. (hk02)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 REPLY to Response to Motion re #344 Plaintiff's MOTION to Require Defendant to Make His Wife Ramona Watts Available for Deposition or, in the Alternative, Preclude Her From Testifying at Trial filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #355 . The deadline to consent to a trial and final disposition by the Magistrate Judge is extended through and including January 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #354 . See Updated Amended Motion filed at ECF No. #355 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #353 . See Updated Amended Motion filed at ECF No. #355 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MOTION for Extension of Time TO CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION UPDATED AMENDED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION by Craig Wright. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (Rivero, Andres)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time TO CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION by Craig Wright. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (Rivero, Andres)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MOTION for Extension of Time TO CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION by Craig Wright. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (Rivero, Andres)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 RESPONSE to Motion re #344 Plaintiff's MOTION to Require Defendant to Make His Wife Ramona Watts Available for Deposition or, in the Alternative, Preclude Her From Testifying at Trial filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rivero, Andres)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 REPLY to Response to Motion re #311 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #277 Order, to District Court DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE ORDER DEEMING CERTAIN FACTS ESTABLISHED AND STRIKING CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, ECF No. #349 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines Per DE#345. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (cqs)
December 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 12/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-68 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2020. (sf)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 REPLY to Response to Motion re #303 MOTION for Attorney Fees , 327 MOTION for Hearing filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Verified Motion for Attorneys' Fees, #2 Exhibit 2 - Invoice Portions)(Brenner, Andrew)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 1/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Invoices, #3 Exhibit 3 - Invoice)(Brenner, Andrew)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Defendant's expedited response to Plaintiff's MOTION, ECF No. #344 , no later than December 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Plaintiff's MOTION to Require Defendant to Make His Wife Ramona Watts Available for Deposition or, in the Alternative, Preclude Her From Testifying at Trial by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Brenner, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 11/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-70 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2020. (sf)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing on disputes raised in DE 339 held on 12/18/2019. Total time in court: 1 hour : 3 minutes. (Digital 15:15:03) (hk02)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #336 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #335 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MEMORANDUM of Law re 331 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Freedman, Devin)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 RESPONSE to Motion re #336 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #311 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #277 Order, to District Court DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE ORDER DEEMING CERTAIN FACTS ESTABLISHED AND STRIKING CERTA filed by Ira Kleiman. Replies due by 12/24/2019. (Brenner, Andrew)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 RESPONSE to Motion re #335 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Ira Kleiman. Replies due by 12/24/2019. (Brenner, Andrew)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #311 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #277 Order, to District Court DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE ORDER DEEMING CERTAIN FACTS ESTABLISHED AND STRIKING CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Clerks Notice to Filer re #332 Reply to Response to Motion,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#333]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 RESPONSE to #311 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #277 Order, to District Court DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE ORDER DEEMING CERTAIN FACTS ESTABLISHED AND STRIKING CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (ls)(See Image at DE #332)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 REPLY to Response to Motion re #311 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #277 Order, to District Court DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE ORDER DEEMING CERTAIN FACTS ESTABLISHED AND STRIKING CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Freedman, Devin)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 PAPERLESS Order cancelling the Discovery Hearing/Status Conference previously set for 12/16/19 and RESETTING it for 12/18/2019 at 3:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall file an updated joint status report outlining the issues to be discussed at the hearing by 12/17/19. Counsel may appear by telephone using the conference call instructions previously provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/13/2019. (hk02)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #329 Motion for Leave to File a Response not to exceed 30 pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #303 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Replies due by 12/20/2019. (ls)(per DE #326)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Clerks Notice to Filer re #324 Response in Opposition to Motion,. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (ls)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #325 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply by December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #303 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Craig Wright. (ls)(See Image at DE #324)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 RESPONSE in Opposition re #303 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rivero, Andres) Modified to add missing event 327 request for evidentiary hearing on 12/10/2019 (ls).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING the Discovery Status Conference scheduled for today at 3:00 p.m. and RESETTING it for 12/16/2019 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel may appear telephonically by using the following conference call instructions: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/4/2019. (hk02)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #303 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Responses due by 12/9/2019; as to #311 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #277 Order, to District Court , Responses due by 12/16/2019. (ls)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #321 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses. The Defendant's response to the Fee Motion is due on December 9, 2019; The Plaintiffs' response to the Objection is due on December 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #303 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #311 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #277 Order, to District Court DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE ORDER DEEMING CERTAIN FACTS ESTABLISHED AND STRIKING CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 OMNIBUS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #307 Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part and denying in part #307 Motion to Appoint Special Master, The Honorable Bruce E. Reinhart is APPOINTED as Special Master in this Case. ( Discovery due by 1/17/2020., Expert Discovery due by 1/17/2020., Fact Discovery due by 1/17/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2020., In Limine Motions due by 1/21/2020., Motions due by 1/21/2020.). Vacating 317 Order. Amending #286 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE of Compliance by Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE of Compliance (attempted) by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re 317 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, (Freedman, Devin)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #316 Motion for Extension of Time for certain pretrial deadlines. The parties are to confer this morning and select 2 consecutive dates to take the deposition during the weeks of December 2 or December 9. The parties are to advise the Court of those dates by 1:00 pm today. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for certain pretrial deadlines (and notice of attempted compliance) re 310 Order,, by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 12/10/2019 (Freedman, Devin)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 REPLY to Response to Motion re #307 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant's Deposition MOTION to Appoint Counsel/Special Master filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Freedman, Devin)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 RESPONSE to Motion re #307 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant's Deposition MOTION to Appoint Counsel/Special Master filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rivero, Andres)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Errata (Attachments: #1 Errata) (Rivero, Andres) Modified Text on 11/27/2019 (ls).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing Redacted Deposition Transcript (Attachments: #1 Transcripts Redacted April 4, 2019 Deposition of Craig Wright) (Freedman, Devin)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #277 Order, to District Court DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE ORDER DEEMING CERTAIN FACTS ESTABLISHED AND STRIKING CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rivero, Andres)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 PAPERLESS ORDER: Presently pending before this Court is the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Extend the Time Limit for Defendant's Deposition and to Appoint a Special Master, ECF No. #307 . This Order does not address the merits of the Motion at this time. However, the Court notes that the discovery cutoff in this action is set for January 3, 2020, ECF No. #286 . Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the parties shall file a Joint Notice indicating the agreed upon dates set for the Defendant's Deposition to be taken no later than November 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Clerks Notice to Filer re #307 Motion for Leave to Extend the Time Limit for Defendant's Deposition and to Appoint a Special Master Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. AND Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Defendant's expedited response by November 26, 2019, to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Extend the Time Limits for Defendant's Deposition and to Appoint a Special Master, ECF No. #307 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant's Deposition by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin) Modified Relief on 11/22/2019 (ls). Added MOTION to Appoint Counsel/Special Master on 11/22/2019 (ls).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER REFERRING #303 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Motions referred to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #304 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DR. WRIGHT'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL PAGES TO OBJECT TO MAGISTRATE REINHART'S ORDER by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Freedman, Devin)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing held on 11/20/2019. Total time in court: 55 minutes. (Digital 15:29:54) (hk02)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #298 Defendant's Motion for Discovery. As discussed at the hearing, Plaintiff's counsel has requested Dave Kleiman's tax documents and bank records and is awaiting production of those documents from the IRS and banks, so no expedited responses will be ordered. The Court denied without prejudice Plaintiff's motion for Defendant to search the NAS device, but Defendant will produce a list of filenames as discussed at the hearing. The Court will address the remaining discovery issues at a Discovery Hearing set for 12/4/2019 at 3:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel may appear telephonically using the conference call instructions previously provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/20/2019. (hk02)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE by Craig Wright re #298 MOTION for Discovery DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Rivero, Andres)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re #298 MOTION for Discovery DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM of Filing Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Discovery Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Freedman, Devin)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MOTION for Discovery DR. CRAIG WRIGHT'S DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM by Craig Wright. Responses due by 12/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rivero, Andres)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 PAPERLESS Order setting a Discovery Hearing for 11/20/2019 at 3:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel may appear by telephone using the following conference call instructions: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/18/2019. (hk02)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated address and/or email information for PHV attorney Kyle Roche re #294 Notice of Change of Address. (pt)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #290 Expedited Motion for out of state deposition. Plaintiffs are permitted to take the deposition of Mr. Wilson on November 8, 2019 in Washington D.C.. The Plaintiffs shall provide Defendant's counsel with the ability to attend the deposition via videolink. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 NOTICE of Change of Address by Devin Freedman (Freedman, Devin)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 REPLY to Response to Motion re #290 EXPEDITED MOTION for out of state deposition in sooner than 14 days filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 RESPONSE to Motion re #290 EXPEDITED MOTION for out of state deposition in sooner than 14 days filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 11/12/2019. (Rivero, Andres)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #290 EXPEDITED MOTION for out of state deposition in sooner than 14 days . Responses due by 11/4/2019 Replies due by 11/5/2019. (ls)(per DE #291)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring the Defendant's expedited response to Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION, ECF No. #290 . Defendant shall respond to the Motion, ECF No. #290 , no later than November 4, 2019. If Plaintiffs intend to file a reply, it shall be field no later than November 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 EXPEDITED MOTION for out of state deposition in sooner than 14 days by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #287 Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline ; granting in part and denying in part #287 Motion to Continue Trial. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Clerks Notice to Filer re #287 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time FOR AN ADDITIONAL 30-DAY EXTENSION OF ALL DISCOVERY AND CASE DEADLINES, AND TRIAL SETTING re #286 Order on Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline,, Order on Motion to Continue,. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. AND Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Joint Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline and Case Deadlines by Craig Wright. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Rivero, Andres) Modified Relief on 10/8/2019 (ls). Added MOTION to Continue Trial Setting on 10/8/2019 (ls).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #284 Joint Motion for Extension of Time of All Discovery and Case Deadlines ( Discovery due by 1/3/2020.); denying #284 Motion for Extension of Extend Trial Setting. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Clerks Notice to Filer re #284 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time OF ALL DISCOVERY AND CASE DEADLINES, AND TRIAL SETTING . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Joint Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline by Craig Wright. Responses due by 10/1/2019 (Rivero, Andres) Modified Relief on 9/18/2019 (ls). Added MOTION to Continue Trial Setting on 9/18/2019 (ls).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #282 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Maxwell Pritt. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Maxwell Pritt. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11960730 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 9/20/2019 (Brenner, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #280 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Joseph M. Delich. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Velvel (Devin) Freedman. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11960152 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 9/19/2019 (Freedman, Devin)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #278 Motion for Extension of Time to File Challenge to Magistrate Judge's Order, ECF No. #277 , by September 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO CHALLENGE MAGISTRATE REINHARTS ORDER DEEMING CERTAIN FACTS AS ESTABLISHED AND STRIKING CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #277 Order, by Craig Wright. Responses due by 9/13/2019 (Rivero, Andres)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER re #210 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Defendant to Comply with this Court's Orders Directing him to Produce a List of the Bitcoins he held as of December 31, 2013 and GRANTING Rule 37 Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (hk02) Modified on 8/28/2019: main document restricted per Chambers (wc).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on 08/26/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-105 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2019. (sf)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Scott Brenner on behalf of Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Attorney Andrew Scott Brenner added to party Ira Kleiman(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Scott Brenner added to party W&K Info Defense Research, LLC(pty:pla). (Brenner, Andrew)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions/Contempt on Order Compelling Discovery (DE 210, 217) held on 8/26/2019. Total time in court: 2 hours : 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hk02)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE of Compliance by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Freedman, Devin)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #262 Motion to Seal in light of #270 Notice (Other). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (BER)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Clerks Notice to Filer re #270 Notice (Other),. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (ls)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE of Filing the Designated Portions of Craig Wright's Deposition Transcript, its Corresponding Exhibits, and Exhibits 8, 9, 10, and 11 of the Jonathan Warren Deposition by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re 258 Evidentiary Hearing,, Terminate Hearings, (Attachments: #1 Transcripts Designated portions of Craig Wright deposition (4/4/19), #2 Transcripts Designated portions of Craig Wright deposition (6/28/19), #3 Exhibit to Craig Wright depositions, #4 Exhibit 8, 9, 10, and 11 to Jonathan Warren deposition) (Freedman, Devin) Modified Text on 8/22/2019 (ls).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 PAPERLESS ORDER directing counsel to comply with the Court's Order at 176 that Defendant's deposition transcript be publicly filed on the docket without page 370. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/20/2019. (hk02)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits used at June 28, 2019 Show Cause Hearing by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re #264 Transcript,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26, #4 Exhibit 27, #5 Exhibit 28, #6 Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit 30, #8 Exhibit 31, #9 Exhibit 32, #10 Exhibit 33, #11 Exhibit 34, #12 Exhibit 35, #13 Exhibit 36, #14 Exhibit 37, #15 Exhibit 38, #16 Exhibit 39, #17 Exhibit 40, #18 Exhibit 41, #19 Exhibit 42, #20 Exhibit 43, #21 Exhibit 44, #22 Exhibit 45, #23 Exhibit 46, #24 Demonstrative 1, #25 Demonstrative 2) (Freedman, Devin) Modified Text on 8/19/2019 (ls).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence by Andres Rivero on behalf of Craig Wright (Rivero, Andres)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Exhibit Introduced by Dr. Wright at the August 5, 2019 Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-2) (Rivero, Andres) Modified Text on 8/16/2019 (ls).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER denying #144 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 TRANSCRIPT of Continuation of Evidentiary Hearing held on 08/05/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-285 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2019. (sf)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Deposition and Exhibits per Order authorizing the submission of this document under seal by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing the Deposition of Jonathan Warren (Attachments: #1 Deposition Deposition of Jonathan Warren, #2 Exhibit Jonathan Warren Deposition Exhibits) (Freedman, Devin) Modified Text on 8/14/2019 (ls).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 263 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC Notice of Change of Firm for Kyle Roche (Freedman, Devin)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC Notice of Change of Firm (Freedman, Devin)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt (DE 210) held on 8/5/2019. Total time in court: 6 hours. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hk02)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 PAPERLESS ORDER continuing counsel's closing arguments on the Evidentiary Hearing for Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt (DE 210) until 8/26/2019 at 1:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/5/2019. (hk02)
August 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 07/10/2019 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 109 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2019. (yhz)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #254 Order on Sealed Motion (dj)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Letter Rogatory to Subpoena Foreign Third Parties 250 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (tmn)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE to the Court Re: Bitcoin by Deso Jungen Etienne Guido (ar2)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #249 Plaintiff's Motion to temporarily seal its Motion for Letters Rogatory (DE 250). By July 25, 2019, Defendant shall provide the Court with proposed redactions for the motion and exhibits along with a justification for each redaction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/19/2019. (hk02)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION to Seal Motion for Letters Rogatory by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 250 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Redacted Transcript of Hearing held on 6/11/19 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-39 pages, re: #221 Transcript, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. (hh)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 PAPERLESS ORDER #244 Granting Defendant's request to redact certain portions of the transcript from the court proceedings on June 11, 2019 (DE 221). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/16/2019. (hk02)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Freedman, Devin)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2019 re #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by Craig Wright. Total time in court: 3 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): Kyle Roche, Devin Freedman, Andres Rivero, Amanda Marie McGovern, Bryan Lee Paschal. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (laa)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Transcript Redaction Request re #221 Transcript,, by attorney Andres Rivero (Rivero, Andres)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #242 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Supplement Record. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Supplement Record by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Freedman, Devin)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #239 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record. As the Defendant is mounting a factual attack on the Court's diversity jurisdiction, the Court will consider the testimony and document, ECF No. #239 , as part of that challenge. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 RESPONSE in Opposition re #239 MOTION Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Freedman, Devin)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rivero, Andres)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Filing Exhibit introduced by Dr. Wright at the June 28, 2019 Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Rivero, Andres) Modified Text on 7/8/2019 (ls).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits used at June 28, 2019 Show Cause Hearing by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re #236 Transcript,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23) (Freedman, Devin) Modified Text on 7/8/2019 (ls).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on 06/28/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-238 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2019. (sf)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 PAPERLESS ORDER Cancelling the Evidentiary Hearing on 8/7/19 and RESETTING it for 8/5/2019 at 9:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/2/2019. (hk02)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 PAPERLESS Order setting the Continuation of the Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions/Contempt (DE 210) for 8/7/2019 at 9:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/1/2019. (hk02)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart who presided over the deposition of Defendant Craig Wright held on 6/28/2019 (deposition held off the record/not recorded on DAR; parties brought private stenographer).Total time in court: 2 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Other, 305-523-5635. (hk02)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions/Contempt (DE 210) held on 6/28/2019. Witness Dr. Craig Wright testified. Total time in court: 4 hours : 50 minutes. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hk02)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 PAPERLESS ORDER. After sua sponte reconsidering its ruling from the bench on 6/28/19, the Court finds that Plaintiffs are entitled to the immediate production of all the documents containing positive hits from the search terms agreed upon by the parties, without waiting for defense counsel to conduct a relevance review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/1/2019. (hk02)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #229 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to close the courtroom during Dr. Wright's deposition on 6/28/19. The courtroom will be re-opened to the public for the evidentiary hearing, which will commence shortly thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/27/2019. (hk02)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Unopposed MOTION to Close the Courtroom During the June 28 Deposition by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE by Craig Wright of Intention to Call Witnesses at the June 28, 2019 Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Rivero, Andres) Modified Text on 6/27/2019 (ls).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Schneur Zalman Kass on behalf of Craig Wright. Attorney Schneur Zalman Kass added to party Craig Wright(pty:dft). (Kass, Schneur)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC of Plaintiff's Intention to Call Dr. Matthew J. Edman at June 28, 2019 Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Dr. Edman's CV)) (Freedman, Devin)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #224 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom and for Prior Access to the Courtroom to Set Up Such Equipment by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 PAPERLESS ORDER The parties have complied with the Court's Order to submit proposed redactions to Dr. Wight's Declaration dated May 8, 2019. See DE 217, n. 6. The parties agreed on some redactions proposed by the Defendant, but not others. The Court has conducted an independent review of the Declaration. The Court adopts some of the Defendant's additional proposed redactions, but not all of them. A redacted version of the Declaration is attached to this Order. The unredacted Declaration shall be filed under seal by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (BER)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 223 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (dj)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 6/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-39 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2019. (apz)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Harry R. Schafer. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Schafer, Harry)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 219 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (514773)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court previously deferred ruling on Plaintiffs' request to reopen Dr. Wright's deposition #173 . Pursuant to the rulings rendered from the bench during the 6/11/19 hearing, the Court will preside over a second deposition of Dr. Wright on June 28, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. in the federal courthouse in West Palm Beach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/14/2019. (hk02)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER GRANTING #210 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Defendant to Comply with this Court's Orders Directing him to Produce a List of the Bitcoins he held as of December 31, 2013 and setting a Show Cause Hearing for 6/28/2019 at 9:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Clerks Notice to Filer re #214 Notice (Other). Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (ls)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE of Filing under Seal per Ore Tenus Order by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Freedman, Devin) Modified Text on 6/13/2019 (ls).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 215 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (DE 210) held on 6/11/2019. Total time in court: 46 minutes. (Digital 14:05:53) (hk02)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #210 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel to the extent it seeks an order directing Defendant to produce a list of the public addresses of the all the bitcoin Defendant mined before 12/31/13, in accordance with the Court's prior orders. In the event Defendant fails to produce this list by June 17, 2019, the Court will conduct a Show Cause evidentiary hearing (on one of the four dates offered by the Court) where Defendant will be ordered to testify and explain his non-compliance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/11/2019. (hk02)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 RESPONSE in Opposition re #210 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Comply with this Court's Orders Directing him to Produce a List of the Bitcoins he held as of December 31, 2013 filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 6/18/2019. (Rivero, Andres) Modified Text on 6/12/2019 (ls).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Comply with this Court's Orders Directing him to Produce a List of the Bitcoins he held as of December 31, 2013 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 6/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER denying #196 Motion to Seal ; denying as moot 197 Sealed Motion ; denying #202 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying #200 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom. See attached document for full details. (ak03)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re #200 MOTION to Continue Mediation or Permit Attendance by Video-conference filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Freedman, Devin)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction: Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division, 400 N. Miami Ave, Courtroom 10-2, Miami, Florida 33128, before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/7/2019. (laa)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Notice of Filing Email sent to the Court from Zalman Kass (ego)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Clerks Notice to Filer re #202 Motion to Seal. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The Event was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (nc)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION To File Under Seal by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres) Modified Event on 6/7/2019 (nc).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 204 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (514773)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Plaintiff's expedited response by June 10, 2019, to Defendant's Motion to Continue Mediation or Permit Attendance by Video Conference by Craig Wright, ECF No. #200 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION to Continue Mediation or Permit Attendance by Video-conference by Craig Wright. Responses due by 6/19/2019 (Rivero, Andres)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines Per DE#201. Responses due by 6/10/2019 (cqs)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 PAPERLESS ORDER taking under advisement #196 Motion to Seal. Re: 197 SEALED MOTION filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. On or before June 7, 2019, at 12:00 noon, Defendant shall show cause why the underlying pleading should not be filed in the public record. If Defendant believes that a redacted version of the pleading can be filed in the public record, Defendant shall confer with opposing counsel and then propose appropriate redactions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (BER)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 PAPERLESS ORDER taking under advisement Plaintiff's Sealed Motion to Compel (DE 197) and setting a Discovery Hearing for 6/11/2019 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Defendant shall file his response to the motion by 6/7/2019 at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/3/2019. (hk02)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Freedman, Devin)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 197 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 TRANSCRIPT of telephonic motion hearing held on 5-6-2019 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-16 pages, Court Reporter: Dawn Savino (Whitmarsh), 305-523-5598 / Dawn_Savino@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2019. (dwh)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #191 Motion to Seal. This is a duplicate filing and see the Court's Order at ECF No. 193 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #190 Motion to Seal until further Court order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Freedman, Devin)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Freedman, Devin)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 192 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REDACTION of ECF No. 161 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Freedman, Devin)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting 180 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION for Protective Order by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #179 Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rivero, Andres)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION Regarding Production of a List of the Public Addresses of his Bitcoin as of December 31, 2013 filed under Seal by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 REDACTION of ECF No. 162 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Freedman, Devin)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re 181 Order. (jmd)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 PAPERLESS ORDER for the Clerk of Court to immediately seal re 178 MOTION Redacted Motion Regarding Production of a List of the Public Addresses of Dr. Wright's Bitcoin as of December 31, 2013 filed by Craig Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/8/2019. (hk02)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 178 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (jmd)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re #157 Memorandum, of Filing Exhibit 1 to ECF No. 157 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Freedman, Devin)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 PAPERLESS ORDER re #175 Notice (Other) filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. The Court adopts the parties' proposed redaction to Defendant's deposition transcript. Plaintiffs are directed to file the transcript without page 370. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/7/2019. (hk02)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC as to its Position Statement on Exhibit 1 (Freedman, Devin)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO RE-DEPOSE DEFENDANT [DE 157] Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 174 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (dj)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 180 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/6/2019. Defendant's sworn declaration providing details of the blind trust accounts as ordered in DE 166 Paragraph (a) is due by 5:00 p.m. on 5/8/19. The document production set forth in Paragraph (b) of the Order is due by 5:00 p.m. on 5/13/19. Defendant shall comply with Paragraph (c) of the Order by 5/25/19. Total time in court: 24 minutes. (Digital 17:01:06) (hk02)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPLY to Response to Motion re #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rivero, Andres)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE by Craig Wright re 165 Order,,,,, Dr. Wright's Position Statement on the Status of Exhibit 1 to D.E. 157 (Rivero, Andres)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 5/6/2019 at 5:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall use the following conference call instructions: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/6/2019. (hk02)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #167 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time on the Court-ordered deadlines in DE 166. The Court hereby extends the three deadlines by 48 hours. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/6/2019. (hk02)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Judge Reinhart's Order D.E. 166 re #166 Order, by Craig Wright. Responses due by 5/20/2019 (Rivero, Andres)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER DENYING 155 MOTION REGARDING PRODUCTION OF A LIST OF PUBLIC ADDRESSES OF BITCOIN AS OF DECEMBER 31, 2013, AND ORDERING PRODUCTION BY DEFENDANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart See attached document for full details. (BER)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 PAPERLESS ORDER re #157 Memorandum. The Court has received and reviewed Plaintiffs brief regarding testimony about his former and current wives. DE 157. The brief incorporates by reference as Exhibit 1 the transcript of Defendants deposition, but no deposition transcript has been filed in the docket. The brief states that Defendants counsel designated the deposition transcript as Confidential under the agreed confidentiality order [DE 105-1]. DE 157 at 1, n.2. This designation is not binding on the Court. The Defendant has not moved to strike Exhibit 1. Neither party has asked to file the transcript under seal. The Confidentiality Order permits a party to designate materials as Confidential if it contains or reflects (a) trade secrets (b) non-public commercial financial information; (c) private corporate information; (d) materials subject to a confidentiality or non-disclosure agreement with a non-party; (e) personal financial information; (f) communications that contain romantically or sexually intimate statements; or (g) information that, pursuant to state, federal, or foreign law, is entitled to confidential treatment. DE 105-1 at 3-4. On or before 5:00 p.m. on May 7, each party shall file a notice explaining its position on the status of Exhibit 1, including whether an unsealed copy of any or all of the deposition transcript should be filed in the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (BER)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #163 Motion for Leave to file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss that that does not exceed 15 pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivero, Andres)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #157 Memorandum, Dr. Wright's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Re-Open His Initial Limited Deposition by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 161 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 162 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1428742)
April 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Freedman, Devin)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING the Discovery Status Conference previously scheduled for 5/7/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/23/2019. (hk02)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM in Support of their Request to Re-Depose Craig Wright on the Involvement of his Former and Current Wife in the Subject Matter of the Pleadings by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Freedman, Devin)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE by Craig Wright re #144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction Notice of Withdrawing Exhibit (Rivero, Andres)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #151 Defendant's Motion to Seal. The motion shall remained sealed until further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/18/2019. (hk02)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 155 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (514773)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 156 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (514773)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #150 Motion to File Protective Order under Seal. Defendant's Motion for Protective Order will remain under seal until further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION to Seal REGARDING PRODUCTION OF A LIST OF THE PUBLIC ADDRESSES OF BITCOIN AS OF DECEMBER 31, 2013 per Local Rule 5.4 by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 A) (Rivero, Andres)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION to Seal MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER per Local Rule 5.4 by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 A) (Rivero, Andres)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #145 MOTION to Continue Trail Schedule filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle no longer assigned as referral judge(s) in case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #145 Motion to Continue.: (Discovery due by 12/3/2019., Expert Discovery due by 12/3/2019., Mediation Deadline 12/17/2019., In Limine Motions due by 12/26/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2019., Motions due by 12/26/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/16/2020., Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 3/24/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart no longer assigned as referral judge(s) in case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Errata by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re #145 MOTION to Continue Trial Schedule (Attachments: #1 Errata Proposed Order Amending Trial and Pretrial Schedule) (Freedman, Devin) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (pes). Modified Text on 4/17/2019 (ls).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 4/11/19 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-68 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie J. Lewis, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2019. (hh) (Main Document 146 replaced on 4/16/2019) (hh).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION to Continue Trial Schedule by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 4/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5)(Freedman, Devin)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Rivero, Andres)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denying #95 Motion to Strike ; Adopting 130 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Status Conference held on 4/11/2019. Legal briefs on the issues raised by the Court are due by 4/19/19 at 3:00 p.m. and responses are due by 4/29/19. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 21 minutes. (Digital 15:14:29) (hk02)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 MOTION Dr. Craig Wright's Discovery Memorandum in Advance of the April 11 Discovery Conference filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Freedman, Devin)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Clerks Notice to Filer re #138 MOTION Dr. Craig Wright's Discovery Memorandum in Advance of the April 11 Discovery Conference . Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#139]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM of Law by Craig Wright. (ls)(See Image at DE #138)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION Dr. Craig Wright's Discovery Memorandum in Advance of the April 11 Discovery Conference by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Memorializing Rulings from Craig Wright deposition Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart See attached document for full details. (BER)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Lee Paschal on behalf of Craig Wright. Attorney Bryan Lee Paschal added to party Craig Wright(pty:dft). (Paschal, Bryan)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #133 Defendant's Motion for document production and a discovery status conference. Plaintiff's response to the motion (DE 134) states that Plaintiff will produce the 2,136 documents belonging to Dave Kleiman on 4/2/19. With regard to Defendant's request that the Court resolve the parties' privilege disputes in advance of Ira Kleiman's deposition on 4/8/19, the Court declines to make advance rulings. Particularly in light of the Court's ruling that defense counsel may depose Ira Kleiman a second time, counsel can seek a ruling on any privilege objections asserted at the deposition afterward when the Court will have the benefit of a deposition transcript. Defendant's motion for a discovery status conference before 4/8/19 is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/1/2019. (hk02)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 MOTION Dr. Wright's Request for Specific Relief on Plaintiffs' Document Production and for a Discovery Status Conference Before Ira Kleiman's Deposition on April 8, 2019 filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Replies due by 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Freedman, Devin)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION Dr. Wright's Request for Specific Relief on Plaintiffs' Document Production and for a Discovery Status Conference Before Ira Kleiman's Deposition on April 8, 2019 by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #131 Defendant's Motion for an Urgent Discovery Status Conference without prejudice to renew. Defendant has not identified the specific relief sought that would necessitate an urgent status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/29/2019. (hk02)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION Dr. Wright's Request for a Discovery Status Conference by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rivero, Andres)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 PAPERLESS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Court DENY #95 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Strike #87 Affirmative Defenses. Motions to strike are generally disfavored as courts consider them a drastic remedy to be resorted to only when required for the purposes of justice that should only be granted when allegations have no possible relation to the controversy. Augustus v. Bd. of Pub. Instruction, 306 F.2d 862, 868 (5th Cir. 1962). This Court's recommendation is without prejudice for Plaintiffs to renew in their motion for summary judgment. Objections to R&R due by 4/11/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/28/2019. (hk02)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Status Conference held on 3/26/2019. The issues raised in the joint discovery memorandum (DE 127) are resolved in accordance with the Court's rulings during the hearing. Another Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters is set for 4/11/2019 at 3:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, unless counsel advise that it is unnecessary. Counsel may appear by phone using the conference call instructions previously provided. Total time in court: 2 hours : 3 minutes. (Digital 14:41:44) (hk02)
March 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #126 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/24/2019. (hk02)
March 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Memorandum by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Freedman, Devin)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO MAGISTRATE #95 MOTION to Strike #87 Answer to Complaint filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Motions referred to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Status Conference (Transcribred from the Digital Audio Recording) held on March 14, 2019, before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-89 pages, Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards, 305-439-7168 / reporterlisaedwards@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019. (le)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 2/20/19 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-139 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019. (hh)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 3/7/19 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-64 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019. (hh)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #120 the parties' Motion to Continue the Discovery Status Conference. The Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters previously scheduled for 3/21/19 is hereby RESET for 3/26/2019 at 2:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel may appear telephonically using the conference call instructions previously provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/15/2019. (hk02)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery Hearing Set for March 21 to March 25 or 26 re 118 Status Conference,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 3/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PAPERLESS ORDER advising that counsel may appear telephonically at the 3/21/19 discovery status conference using the conference call instructions previously provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/14/2019. (hk02)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Status Conference held on 3/14/2019 regarding DE 114. Another Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters is hereby scheduled for 3/21/2019 at 3:45 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart so that the Court can rule on the deferred issues. Total time in court: 1 hour : 30 minutes. (Digital 16:06:36) (hk02)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #115 the Parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order. In accordance with ruling during the hearing on 3/14/19, the Court hereby adopts Defendant's proposed confidentiality stipulation over the stipulation proposed by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Clerks Notice to Filer re #115 Joint MOTION submitting alternate confidentiality orders related to the images of Dave Kleiman's electronic devices by Craig Wright and. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Joint Motion for Protective Order/Submitting Alternate Confidentiality Orders related to the Images of Dave Kleiman's Electronic Devices by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Freedman, Devin) Modified Relief on 3/14/2019 (ls).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Memorandum by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Freedman, Devin)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #112 Motion for Extension of Time to file a Joint Discovery Memorandum; counsel shall file it by 4:00 p.m. on 3/13/19. The motion to extend the page limit is also granted. The memorandum may no longer than 10 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/12/2019. (hk02)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Discovery Memorandum re #102 Order by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 3/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Plaintiff's REPLY to #108 Response in Opposition to Motion, #95 MOTION to Strike #87 Answer to Complaint by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Freedman, Devin)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Status Conference held on 3/6/2019. Another Telephone Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters is hereby set for 3/14/2019 at 4:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall use the following conference call instructions: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 13 minutes. (Digital 14:55:52) (hk02)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Freedman, Devin)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #95 MOTION to Strike #87 Answer to Complaint filed by Craig Wright. Replies due by 3/7/2019. (Rivero, Andres)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 2/20/19 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-139 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2019. (hh)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #105 the parties' Joint Motion for approval of their confidentiality stipulation. The proposed stipulation is hereby approved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/25/2019. (hk02)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Joint MOTION Submitting Stipulated Confidentiality Order by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Freedman, Devin)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PAPERLESS ORDER setting a Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters on 3/6/2019 at 2:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel may appear by telephone using the following conference call instructions: Dial 1-888-557-8511; Enter access code 4098267#; and Enter security code 1234#. Counsel shall file their joint discovery status report on 3/4/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/21/2019. (hk02)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing held on 2/20/2019. The discovery disputes memorialized in DE 91, 92, 96 and 97 were resolved pursuant to the Court's rulings issued during the hearing. Total time in court: 3 hours : 5 minutes. (Digital 15:02:59) (hk02) Modified on 2/21/2019 (tmn).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REVISED STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #100 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Referenced in Dr. Wright's Discovery Memorandum. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Referenced in Dr. Wright's Discovery Memorandum by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rivero, Andres)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #98 Motion for Leave to File for failing to comply with Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Referenced in his Discovery Memorandum [D.E. 91] by Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G)(Rivero, Andres)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 RESPONSE to 93 Memorandum by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Freedman, Devin)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE to #91 Memorandum, DR. CRAIG WRIGHTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Strike #87 Answer to Complaint by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Clerks Notice to Filer re #92 Notice (Other),. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#93]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Discovery MEMORANDUM of Law re 90 Order, Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings by Craig Wright. (ls)(See Image at DE #92)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE by Craig Wright re 90 Order, Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Dr. Craig Wrights Discovery Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Rivero, Andres) Modified text on 2/14/2019 (pes).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM of Law re 90 Order, Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Freedman, Devin)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PAPERLESS ORDER setting Discovery Hearing on 2/20/2019 at 3:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/13/2019. (hk02)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Marie McGovern on behalf of Craig Wright. Attorney Amanda Marie McGovern added to party Craig Wright(pty:dft). (McGovern, Amanda)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION re #78 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, Stipulated Discovery Plan for Electronically Stored Information by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC (Freedman, Devin)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres) Modified Text on 1/29/2019 (ls).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Harry Schafer Mediation Deadline 6/21/2019. Mediation Hearing set for 6/18/2019 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC re #84 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Freedman, Devin)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Harry Schaffer. Mediation Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. (Rivero, Andres)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33)(Freedman, Devin) Modified Text to read against Defendant not All Plaintiffs on 1/15/2019 (ls).
January 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #81 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by Ira Kleiman, W&K Info Defense Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Freedman, Devin)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Craig Wright. (Rivero, Andres)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PAPERLESS ORDER RESETTING the Discovery Status Conference. In light of the new discovery deadline issued by the District Court, the Discovery Status Conference (previously scheduled for 3/11/19) is hereby RESET for 5/7/2019 at 3:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. The parties' joint discovery status report is due on 4/30/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/3/2019. (hk02)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Discovery due by 6/10/2019., Fact Discovery due by 6/10/2019., Expert Discovery due by 6/10/2019., Mediation Deadline 6/24/2019., In Limine Motions due by 7/2/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2019., Motions due by 7/2/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/22/2019., Jury Trial set for 9/30/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 9/24/2019 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for discovery matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #76 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Craig Wright. Responses due by 1/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Markoe, Zaharah)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #70 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue the Discovery Status Conference previously scheduled for 1/8/19 and RESETTING it for 3/11/2019 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. The parties' discovery status report is due on 3/4/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/2/2019. (hk02)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE by Craig Wright Attorney Appearance. Attorney Zaharah R. Markoe added to party Craig Wright(pty:dft). (Markoe, Zaharah)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order