Cohan v. APPLE TEN HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT INC
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: APPLE TEN HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT INC
Case Number: 9:2018cv81245
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Clerks Entry of Default as to Apple Ten Hospitality Management Inc., d/b/a Hilton Garden Inn Boca Raton - Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/16/2018. (pes)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to APPLE TEN HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT INC by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Docket Report)(Sconzo, Gregory)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Howard Cohan. APPLE TEN HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT INC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Sconzo, Gregory)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to APPLE TEN HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT INC. (pes)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pes)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APPLE TEN HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT INC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10996337, filed by Howard Cohan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Sconzo, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. APPLE TEN HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Gregory Steven Sconzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE TEN HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?