Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al v. CLS, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. and Shell Vacations, LLC
Defendant: Mary Clapp, Esq., Bart Bowe, Dan Chudy, Jason Levi Hemingway, 417 MRC LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, The Mid-West Transfer, LLC, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC, Matthew Tucker, Brian Scroggs, Allied Solution Group, LLC, VCS Communications, LLC, CLS, Inc., Vacation Consulting Services, LLC, Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC, Clapp Business Law, LLC, Josh Ungaro, Donnelly Snellen, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, Transfer For You LLC and Real Travel, LLC
Case Number: 9:2018cv81250
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #61 Motion for Clarification. Defendant Clapp need not file a response to the original Complaint and can wait to respond to Plaintiffs amended complaint. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/07/2018. (mkz)
November 7, 2018 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for clarification #58 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, Order on Motion for More Definite Statement,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq.. Responses due by 11/21/2018 (Slater, J.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 60 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Dan Chudy served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
November 6, 2018 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. Jason Levi Hemingway waiver sent on 10/22/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OMNIBUS ORDER granting in part #36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 11/19/2018.); Denying as moot #52 Motion for More Definite Statement; Denying as moot #53 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot #54 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot #55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 11/19/2018.); denying as moot #56 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 11/19/2018.); denying as moot #57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Amended Complaint due by 11/19/2018.). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/5/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
November 2, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bart Bowe, Brian Scroggs. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Zetrouer, Shannon)
November 2, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Real Travel, LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Zetrouer, Shannon)
November 2, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Zetrouer, Shannon)
November 2, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Strike #52 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Rubin, Glennys)
November 2, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to Strike #51 Response/Reply (Other) Defendant, Catalyst Consulting Firm, LLC's, Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (Rubin, Glennys)
November 2, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC. (Steinfeld, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 51 REPLY to #40 Response in Opposition to Motion, and Motion for More Definite Statement by Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC. (Steinfeld, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Anthony Wilson on behalf of Allied Solution Group, LLC, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, The Mid-West Transfer, LLC, Transfer For You LLC, Josh Ungaro (Wilson, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Striking #41 Notice of Attorney Appearance,,, filed by The Transfer Group, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, Allied Solution Group, LLC, Transfer For You LLC, Josh Ungaro, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC by Allied Solution Group, LLC, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, The Mid-West Transfer, LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC, Transfer For You LLC, Josh Ungaro (Wilson, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 48 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Josh Ungaro. (Wilson, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 47 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Mid-West Transfer, LLC. Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party The Mid-West Transfer, LLC(pty:dft). (Wilson, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 46 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Transfer For You LLC. (Wilson, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Midwest Transfers LLC. (Wilson, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 44 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by JJ&C Marketing, LLC. (Wilson, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 43 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by JJ Midwest Marketing LLC. (Wilson, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 42 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allied Solution Group, LLC. (Wilson, David)
October 30, 2018 Filing 41 (Stricken)NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Anthony Wilson on behalf of Allied Solution Group, LLC, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC, Transfer For You LLC, Josh Ungaro. Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party Allied Solution Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party JJ Midwest Marketing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party JJ&C Marketing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party Midwest Transfers LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party The Transfer Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party Transfer For You LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Anthony Wilson added to party Josh Ungaro(pty:dft). (Wilson, David) Modified text as per DE #49 on 10/31/2018 (lk).
October 30, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (re: Defendant, Catalyst Consulting Firm, LLC) filed by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Replies due by 11/6/2018. (Bennington, Alfred)
October 29, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Midwest Transfers LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 26, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Clapp Business Law, LLC response due 11/9/2018; Mary Clapp, Esq. response due 11/9/2018. per DE 38 (cbr)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants, Clapp Business Law, LLC, and Mary Clapp, Esq. shall file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/26/2018. (mkz)
October 25, 2018 Filing 37 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Complaint by Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq.. Attorney J. Scott Slater added to party Clapp Business Law, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney J. Scott Slater added to party Mary Clapp, Esq.(pty:dft). (Slater, J.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC. Responses due by 10/30/2018 (Steinfeld, David)
October 16, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Steinfeld on behalf of Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC. Attorney David Steinfeld added to party Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC(pty:dft). (Steinfeld, David)
October 12, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE 34 : Bart Bowe response due 11/2/2018; Real Travel, LLC response due 11/2/2018; Brian Scroggs response due 11/2/2018; The Transfer Group, LLC response due 11/2/2018; VCS Communications, LLC response due 11/2/2018; Vacation Consulting Services, LLC response due 11/2/2018. (lk)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants THE TRANSFER GROUP, LLC, VACATION CONSULTING SERVICES, LLC, VCS COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, BRIAN SCROGGS, REAL TRAVEL, LLC, and BART BOWE shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 2, 2018 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/12/2018. (mkz)
October 11, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. 417 MRC LLC served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 11, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Bart Bowe, Real Travel, LLC, Brian Scroggs, The Transfer Group, LLC, VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. (Zetrouer, Shannon)
October 11, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Real Travel, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 11, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Bart Bowe served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. VCS Communications, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Matthew Tucker served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Donnelly Snellen served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Allied Solution Group, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Transfer For You LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Vacation Consulting Services, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. The Mid-West Transfer, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. JJ&C Marketing, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. JJ Midwest Marketing LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Brian Scroggs served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Clapp Business Law, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Josh Ungaro served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. Mary Clapp, Esq. served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. The Transfer Group, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. CLS, Inc. served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Rubin, Glennys)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon L. Zetrouer on behalf of Bart Bowe, Real Travel, LLC, Brian Scroggs, The Transfer Group, LLC, VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party Bart Bowe(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party Real Travel, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party Brian Scroggs(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party The Transfer Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party VCS Communications, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party Vacation Consulting Services, LLC(pty:dft). (Zetrouer, Shannon)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 7 Summons Issued restricted due to image issues. >Correction: Summonses redocketed as DE 11 as per DE 10 Notice of filing Proposed summonses (lk)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lk)
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #3 Summons Issued restricted due to image issues. >Correction: Summonses redocketed as DE #7 as per DE #6 Notice of filing Proposed summonses Other. (lk)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring counsel to meet and file Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/18/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attorney information does not match initiating document. The name of the attorney submitting the complaint does not match the signature on the pdf document. The attorneys' listed on the initiating document has been added. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (lk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (lk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s), #13 Summon(s), #14 Summon(s), #15 Summon(s), #16 Summon(s), #17 Summon(s), #18 Summon(s), #19 Summon(s), #20 Summon(s))(lk) (Attachment 18 replaced on 9/17/2018) (lk).
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lk)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against 417 MRC LLC, Allied Solution Group, LLC, Bart Bowe, CLS, Inc., Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC, Dan Chudy, Clapp Business Law, LLC, Mary Clapp, Esq., Jason Levi Hemingway, JJ Midwest Marketing LLC, JJ&C Marketing, LLC, Midwest Transfers LLC, Real Travel, LLC, Brian Scroggs, Donnelly Snellen, The Mid-West Transfer, LLC, The Transfer Group, LLC, Transfer For You LLC, Matthew Tucker, Josh Ungaro, VCS Communications, LLC, Vacation Consulting Services, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10997604, filed by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Shell Vacations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 27, #29 Summon(s) Summons - CLS, Inc. d/b/a Atlas Vacation Remedies d/b/a Principal Transfer Group, #30 Summon(s) Summons - Donnelly Snellen, #31 Summon(s) Summons - Jason Levi Hemingway, #32 Summon(s) Summons - Clapp Business Law, LLC, #33 Summon(s) Summons - Mary Clapp, Esq., #34 Summon(s) Summons - The Transfer Group, LLC, #35 Summon(s) Summons - Vacation Consulting Services, LLC, #36 Summon(s) VCS Communications, LLC, #37 Summon(s) Summons - Brian Scroggs, #38 Summon(s) Summons - Transfer for You, LLC, #39 Summon(s) Summons - Allied Solution Group, LLC, #40 Summon(s) Summons - JJ Midwest Marketing, LLC, #41 Summon(s) Summons - JJ&C Marketing, LLC, #42 Summon(s) Summons - The Mid-West Tranfer, LLC, #43 Summon(s) Summons - Midwest Transfers, LLC, #44 Summon(s) Summons - Josh Ungaro, #45 Summon(s) Summons - Mutual Release Corporation a/k/a 417 MRC LLC, #46 Summon(s) Summons - Dan Chudy, #47 Summon(s) Summons - Matthew Tucker, #48 Summon(s) Summons - Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC, #49 Summon(s) Summons - Real Travel, LLC, #50 Summon(s) Summons - Bart Bowe)(Bennington, Alfred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al v. CLS, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Clapp, Esq.
Represented By: J. Scott Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Bowe
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Chudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Levi Hemingway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 417 MRC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Transfer Group, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Transfers LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mid-West Transfer, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJ Midwest Marketing LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Scroggs
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Solution Group, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VCS Communications, LLC
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacation Consulting Services, LLC
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalyst Consulting Firm LLC
Represented By: David Steinfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clapp Business Law, LLC
Represented By: J. Scott Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Ungaro
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnelly Snellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJ&C Marketing, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transfer For You LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Travel, LLC
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shell Vacations, LLC
Represented By: Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?