Molinari v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Beth Molinari
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2018cv81287
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 26 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #17 Amended Complaint Counts I and III by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/30/2018 (Jacobson, Jeannine)
November 15, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kantor, Philip)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company shall file any response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (DE #17 ) by November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/26/2018. (kal)
October 25, 2018 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #17 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jeannine)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #11 , #13 Motions to Dismiss, in light of the filing of an Amended Complaint (DE #17 ). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/24/2018. (kal)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America's ("Prudential") Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant Prudential shall respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (DE #17 ) by November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/24/2018. (kal)
October 23, 2018 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #17 Amended Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kantor, Philip)
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Latanae L Parker on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Attorney Latanae L Parker added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Parker, Latanae)
October 19, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), , #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Count I of the Complaint filed by Beth Molinari. Replies due by 10/26/2018. (Labiner, Paul)
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed by Beth Molinari.(Labiner, Paul)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added ROBERT DULBERG. (Jacobson, Jeannine)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION JOINT RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN by Beth Molinari (Labiner, Paul)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED TRIAL ORDER. Defendant's Mootion to Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order DE #10 is GRANTED. The previously set trial and calendar/status conference are CANCELLED. Calendar Call reset for 7/3/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Jury Trial reset for 7/8/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Status Conference reset for 7/3/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 8, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Kantor, Philip)
October 8, 2018 Filing 12 Statement of: Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #8 Scheduling Order,, Order Referring Case to Mediation, (Jacobson, Jeannine)
October 8, 2018 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Count I of the Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Def M to Dismiss)(Jacobson, Jeannine)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Scheduling Order,, Order Referring Case to Mediation, to Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jeannine)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Def MetLife's Joinder in Notice of Removal (Jacobson, Jeannine)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2018., Discovery due by 4/8/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2018., In Limine Motions due by 4/22/2019., Motions due by 4/22/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/27/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, and granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. The deadline for the Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to October 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/26/2018. (kal)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Jury Trial set for 6/24/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/19/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jeannine)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kantor, Philip)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11013599, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Kantor, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molinari v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Philip J. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeannine Cline Jacobson
Represented By: Latanae L Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Molinari
Represented By: Paul Steven Labiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?