Ermert v. Boca Dental Supply LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Falco Ermert
Defendant: Boca Dental Supply LLC
Case Number: 9:2018cv81666
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting 16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Alexander Charles Cohen withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alexander C. Cohen for / by Falco Ermert. Responses due by 5/17/2019 (Cohen, Alexander)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (pcs)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLANTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting 13 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of Falco Ermert against Boca Dental Supply LLC. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: 13 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Falco Ermert. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment by Falco Ermert. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Falco Ermert and Exhibits)(Cohen, Alexander)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER. On January 22, 2019, Plaintiff sought a Clerk's Entry of Default for Defendant's failure to timely respond to the Complaint. (DE 6 ). The Clerk entered default on January 23, 2019. Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to move for a default judgment against Defendant, any such motion must be filed on or before March 11, 2019. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 7.1(a)(2), motions for default judgment must be "accompanied by a proposed order that is filed and submitted via e-mail to the Court as prescribed by Section 3I(6) of the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures." In filing any Motion for Default Judgment, Plaintiff must send a proposed Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment to the Court's e-mail (middlebrooks@flsd.uscourts.gov) in accordance with Local Rule 7.1(a)(2). The proposed order must contain legal analysis as to the claims on which Plaintiff is seeking default final judgment and how the pled facts, taken as true, justify awarding Plaintiff default judgment. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/27/2019. (kal)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2019., Discovery due by 7/22/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 3/25/2019., In Limine Motions due by 8/12/2019., Motions due by 8/12/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/23/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 2/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/1/2019. Appearances: None. Pretrial and scheduling matters discussed. Scheduling Order to follow. (Total Time in Court: 1 min. | Digital: 14:15:34) (jrz)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 2/01/2019 at 2:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the telephonic scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets three cases per 30-minute time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/23/2019. (spe)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Entry of Default as to Boca Dental Supply LLC - Motions Terminated: 6 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/23/2019. (ls)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Jury Trial set for 10/21/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 10/16/2019 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for the purpose of setting pre-trial deadline dates, for determining possible consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge for trial, and for the purpose of setting any settlement conferences. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Boca Dental Supply LLC by Falco Ermert. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander C. Cohen in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Cohen, Alexander)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Falco Ermert. Boca Dental Supply LLC served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Cohen, Alexander)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (pcs)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Boca Dental Supply LLC. (pcs)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Boca Dental Supply LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11214610, filed by Falco Ermert. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summon(s))(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ermert v. Boca Dental Supply LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boca Dental Supply LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falco Ermert
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Alexander Charles Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?