Dixon et al v. Green Tree Servicing,LLC
Plaintiff: Blanche L Dixon and Jr. Roy J. Dixon
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing,LLC, Ditech Financial LLC, Bank Of America, N.A. and Fannie Mae
Case Number: 9:2019cv80022
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Amended Complaint re #4 Amended Complaint by Bank Of America, N.A.. Responses due by 3/22/2019 (Okcular, Baris)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Baris John Okcular on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A.. Attorney Baris John Okcular added to party Bank Of America, N.A.(pty:dft). (Okcular, Baris)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Green Tree Servicing,LLC of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay. Attorney Erik Tyler Samsing added to party Green Tree Servicing,LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Samsing, Erik)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 DUPLICATE MOTION to Strike #7 FANNIE MAE'S MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Roy J. Dixon, Blanche L Dixon. Responses due by 3/22/2019 (drz)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Bank Of America, N.A. filed by Roy J. Dixon, Blanche L Dixon. (drz)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Bank Of America, N.A.. Reason: Answer deadline has NOT lapsed Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/8/2019. (drz)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Green Tree Servicing,LLC also known asDitech Financial LLC. Reason: Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed OR Waiver of Service Executed - has NOT been entered on docket Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/8/2019. (drz)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Bank Of America, N.A. served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (drz)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 9 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default,. Document Restricted Due to Error; (drz) Modified text on 3/8/2019 (asl).
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Roy J. Dixon, Blanche L Dixon. Responses due by 3/22/2019. (ir)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Bank Of America, N.A. by Bank Of America, N.A.. (drz)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Fannie Mae. Attorney Erik Tyler Samsing added to party Fannie Mae(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Samsing, Erik)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bank Of America, N.A., Fannie Mae. (kpe)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Verified AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank Of America, N.A., Fannie Mae, Green Tree Servicing,LLC, filed by Roy J. Dixon, Blanche L Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(kpe)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 1/8/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006122 (mee)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra and Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Green Tree Servicing, LLC. no motion to dismiss/no answer filed. Filing fees $ 400.00 Receipt#: FLS900006122, filed by Roy J. Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mee)Text Modified on 1/8/2019 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon et al v. Green Tree Servicing,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanche L Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jr. Roy J. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing,LLC
Represented By: Erik Tyler Samsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Erik Tyler Samsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Baris John Okcular
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Erik Tyler Samsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?