Sherrill v. Florida Attorney General et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Sherrill
Defendant: Mark Inch and Florida Attorney General
Case Number: 9:2019cv80038
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Dale Surber on behalf of Florida Attorney General. Attorney Melanie Dale Surber added to party Florida Attorney General(pty:dft). (Surber, Melanie)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before April 1, 2019, the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 4/1/2019. Motions due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/REQUEST for Abeyance of Habeas Corpus Until the Resolution of State Post-Conviction Proceedings by Jeremy Sherrill. (ail)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ail)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt#: NOT PAID/DUE, filed by Jeremy Sherrill.(ail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherrill v. Florida Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Melanie Dale Surber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Sherrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?