Martinez v. Bakst

Appellant: Erik Martinez
Appellee: Michael R Bakst
Case Number: 9:2019cv80086
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Appellant's Initial Brief in this bankruptcy appeal was due on March 18, 2019. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018(a)(1). To date, Appellant has not filed an Initial Brief. Accordingly, by no later than March 25, 2019, Appellant shall show cause, in writing, why he has failed to file an Initial Brief and why this appeal should not be dismissed. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order to Show Cause may result in the dismissal of this appeal without further notice. Show Cause Response due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/20/2019. (sk01)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Wrong Filer Name(s) Selected and Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - The wrong filer name was selected. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morris Gary Miller on behalf of Morris Gary Morris. Attorney Morris Gary Miller added to party Morris Gary Morris(pty:e). (Miller, Morris)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 3/18/2019. (jc)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Erik Martinez (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant Designation, #3 Appellant Designated Items, #4 Appellee Designation, #5 Appellee Designated Items)(mon)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (bb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Erik Martinez (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-10307-BKC-MAM, filed by Erik Martinez.(mon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Bakst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Erik Martinez
Represented By: Bart Alan Houston
Represented By: Owei Belleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael R Bakst
Represented By: Michael Richard Bakst
Represented By: Morris Gary Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?