Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company et al v. Whirlpool Corporation
Plaintiff: Interested Underwriters Subscribing to Policy No.: B1383ACN01210415 a/s/o Boca Raton Associates VI, LLLP and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 9:2019cv80172
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Whirlpool Corporation (Fender, Loren)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Joseph S. Kashi. (Fender, Loren)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand The Action to the 15th Judicial Circuit in and For Palm Beach, County filed by Whirlpool Corporation. Replies due by 3/12/2019. (Fender, Loren)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2019., Discovery due by 9/16/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2019., In Limine Motions due by 10/7/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 10/7/2019., Motions due by 10/7/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/12/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company for dates of 3/21/2019-4/8/2019 (Goodman, Joshua)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. ( Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 12/4/2019 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand The Action to the 15th Judicial Circuit in and For Palm Beach, County by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Goodman, Joshua)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand The Action to the 15th Judicial Circuit in and For Palm Beach, County by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Goodman, Joshua)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Whirlpool Corporation's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Whirlpool Corporation. (Fender, Loren)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re #3 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (kpe)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whirlpool Corporation (Fender, Loren)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11373578, filed by Whirlpool Corporation. No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Correspondence establishing amount in controversy, #3 Complaint)(Fender, Loren) Modified on 2/6/2019 (kpe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company et al v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interested Underwriters Subscribing to Policy No.: B1383ACN01210415 a/s/o Boca Raton Associates VI, LLLP
Represented By: Joshua Ross Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Ross Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Loren William Fender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?