Beaulieu v. Vallery Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dr. Bruce S. Beaulieu
Defendant: Vallery Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80252
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #14 Transmittal Letter Sent, #13 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, (kpe)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order Remanding Case to State Court to: 15th Judicial Circuit Court. State Court Case Number: 2019 CA 000783XXXMB (kpe)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand. This case is REMANDED to the Fifteenth Judicial Circuit Court in and for Palm Beach County, Florida. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE this case, terminating all deadlines and denying all pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Vallery Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 proposed Scheduling Order)(Rothman, Robin)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bruce S. Beaulieu. (Solages, Sorraya)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Vallery Industries, Inc.. Replies due by 3/28/2019. (Rothman, Robin)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OFREQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 2/26/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 1/29/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bruce S. Beaulieu. Attorney Sorraya Solages added to party Bruce S. Beaulieu (pty:pla). (Solages, Sorraya)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Vallery Industries, Inc. (Rothman, Robin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Vallery Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State court filings)(Rothman, Robin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Vallery Industries, Inc.. (Rothman, Robin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - DR. BRUCE S. BEAULIEU v. VALLERY INDUSTRIES, INC, a Florida Corporation, d/b/a ARMSTRONG NAUTICAL PRODUCTS) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11416968, filed by VALLERY INDUSTRIES, INC, d/b/a ARMSTRONG NAUTICAL PRODUCTS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Certification of Removal to Clerk)(Rothman, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaulieu v. Vallery Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallery Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Robin Beth Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Bruce S. Beaulieu
Represented By: William Sterling Williams
Represented By: Sorraya Solages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?