DeFeo v. Breitling U.S.A. Inc.
Plaintiff: Anna Marie DeFeo
Defendant: Breitling U.S.A. Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80305
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Entry of the Proposed Final Consent Decree and Order; To the extent not otherwise disposed of, all deadlines are TERMINATED, case remains closed. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 04/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Entry of the Proposed Final consent Decree and Order by Breitling U.S.A. Inc.. Responses due by 5/3/2019 (Harvey, David)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Anna Marie DeFeo (Leal, Alberto)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by Breitling U.S.A. Inc. by 4/12/2019. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Anna Marie DeFeo. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Breitling U.S.A. Inc.. Attorney David Sydney Harvey, Jr added to party Breitling U.S.A. Inc.(pty:dft). (Harvey, David)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 First RESPONSE To order requiring certificate of counsel regarding any prior filings made under the ADA by Anna Marie DeFeo. (Leal, Alberto)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Anna Marie DeFeo. Breitling U.S.A. Inc. served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Leal, Alberto)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL, SCHEDULING REPORT, AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES; Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a verified statement on or before March 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 03/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Breitling U.S.A. Inc.. (jao)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Breitling U.S.A. Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11447854, filed by Anna Marie DeFeo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Leal, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeFeo v. Breitling U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breitling U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: David Sydney Harvey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Marie DeFeo
Represented By: Alberto R. Leal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?