Urlacher v. Glenn M. Charles, D.O., P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Urlacher
Defendant: Glenn M. Charles, D.O., P.A. and NKP Medical Marketing, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80319
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2019., Discovery due by 11/4/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2019., In Limine Motions due by 11/18/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2019., Motions due by 11/18/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/23/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/15/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon For Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Text Modified on 4/23/2019 (cds).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David A. Rammelt. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/17/2019. (sfr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David A. Rammelt. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11562282 by Brian Urlacher. Responses due by 4/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of David A. Rammelt, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Secco, Nicholas)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Stephen Ostrow on behalf of Glenn M. Charles, D.O., P.A., NKP Medical Marketing, Inc.. Attorney Gary Stephen Ostrow added to party Glenn M. Charles, D.O., P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Stephen Ostrow added to party NKP Medical Marketing, Inc.(pty:dft). (Ostrow, Gary)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Glenn M. Charles, D.O., P.A.. Attorney Michael Ingrassi Santucci added to party Glenn M. Charles, D.O., P.A.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order by state court limiting claim, #2 Exhibit Order by state court dismissing case)(Santucci, Michael)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Brian Urlacher. NKP Medical Marketing, Inc. served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Secco, Nicholas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Glenn M. Charles, D.O., P.A., NKP Medical Marketing, Inc.. (cds)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glenn M. Charles, D.O., P.A., NKP Medical Marketing, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11451376, filed by Brian Urlacher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit 1-4)(Secco, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urlacher v. Glenn M. Charles, D.O., P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn M. Charles, D.O., P.A.
Represented By: Gary Stephen Ostrow
Represented By: Michael Ingrassi Santucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NKP Medical Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Stephen Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Urlacher
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Secco
Represented By: David A. Rammelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?