Cassidy et al v. PR Local Electric, Inc.
Plaintiff: Roger T. Moore, Carl Tirone, Jeff Meldrim, I.B.E.W. Local Union No. 728 Family Healthcare Fund, Justin MCINTOSH, I.B.E.W. Local Union No. 728 Pension Trust Fund, Vincent Fortune, James STUBBLEFIELD,, Florida East Coast Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, The, Zac Cassidy, I.B.E.W. Local Union No. 728 Annuity Trust Fund, William Barrow, Rick Shawbell, Jonathan BORDEN, The Florida East Coast Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee and James Boylan
Defendant: PR Local Electric, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80400
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for failure to serve. All deadlines are TERMINATED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for failure to Serve. Closing Case. All deadlines are TERMINATED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER. This case was filed on March 22, 2019. Therefore, service must be effectuated by June 20, 2019 (90 days post-filing), pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). To date, there is no proof of service indicated in the court record as required by Rule 4(l). Accordingly, Plaintiffs are ordered to file the appropriate proof of service by no later than June 21, 2019. Failure to timely file proof of service may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/13/2019. (kbs)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OFREQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 3/25/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 2/26/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PR Local Electric, Inc. (ar2)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Delinquent Contributions and to Compel Audit against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11499383, filed by Roger T. Moore, I.B.E.W. Local Union No. 728 Pension Trust Fund, Rick Shawbell, James STUBBLEFIELD,, William Barrow, Justin MCINTOSH, I.B.E.W. Local Union No. 728 Annuity Trust Fund, Florida East Coast Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, The, Carl Tirone, Zac Cassidy, Vincent Fortune, Jeff Meldrim, I.B.E.W. Local Union No. 728 Family Healthcare Fund, Jonathan BORDEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Collective Bargaining Agreement), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Braswell, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassidy et al v. PR Local Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger T. Moore
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Tirone
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Meldrim
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.B.E.W. Local Union No. 728 Family Healthcare Fund
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin MCINTOSH
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.B.E.W. Local Union No. 728 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Fortune
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James STUBBLEFIELD,
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida East Coast Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, The
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zac Cassidy
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.B.E.W. Local Union No. 728 Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Barrow
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Shawbell
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan BORDEN
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Florida East Coast Electrical Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Boylan
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PR Local Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?