Paris v. Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: George Chester Paris
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Case Number: 9:2019cv80412
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before forty-five days from the date of this order the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #7 Motion to Compel; denying #7 Motion for Default Judgment. The petitioner's motion to compel is denied, however the respondent shall be required to file an response to the motion. The court previously issued an order to show cause, however the docket was not updated with the Attorney General's electronic mail address so the order to show cause was not transmitted. An amended order to show cause will be issued today.The motion for default is denied as the respondent was not on notice that it was required to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/10/2019. (jb01)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel State's Response or Issue a Default Judgment ( Responses due by 7/23/2019) by George Chester Paris. (kpe)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before forty-five days from the date of this order the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/26/2019. (jb01)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Chester Paris. (kpe)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (kpe)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by George Chester Paris.(kpe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paris v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Chester Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?