Collins v. SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC.

Plaintiff: Ronald J. Collins
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80422
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 24 PAPERLESS NOTICE RESETTING Hearing on Motion #3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing reset for 7/31/2019 at 2:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 207A before Judge Roy K. Altman. (tas)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Robert Dulberg. Mediation Hearing set for 11/5/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #19 the Defendant's Motion to Continue the June 13, 2019 Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/22/2019. (jz00)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC., Robert Dulberg. Mediation Hearing set for 11/15/2019 AT 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Agnello, Nicholas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 SECOND PAPERLESS NOTICE RESETTING Hearing on Motion #3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing reset for 6/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 207A before Judge Roy K. Altman. (tas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing of June 13, 2019 re 18 Notice of Hearing on Motion, by SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC.. Responses due by 6/4/2019 (Agnello, Nicholas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing reset for 6/13/2019 at 03:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 207A before Judge Roy K. Altman. (tas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's REPLY to #13 Response to Motion, to Dismiss and Response in Opposition to the Motion for Leave to Amend by SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC.. (Agnello, Nicholas)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for Friday, 6/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in the Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 207A before Judge Roy K. Altman. The appearance of all parties is required. (tas)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #14 , the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply. The Defendant's Reply to its Motion to Dismiss #3 shall be due by May 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/9/2019. (jz00)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 Response to Motion, by SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC.. (Agnello, Nicholas)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ronald J. Collins. Replies due by 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Botsford, Bruce)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER EQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION re #3 Motion to Dismiss.( Responses due by 4/30/2019) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2019., Discovery due by 11/19/2019., Expert Discovery due by 11/19/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 6/11/2019., Mediation Deadline 12/3/2019., In Limine Motions due by 3/2/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2019., Motions due by 12/11/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/2/2020., Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 3/10/2020 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman.) ( Mediation Deadline 12/3/2019.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC. (Agnello, Nicholas)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon added. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Roy Altman for all further proceedings, Judge Beth Bloom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion by April 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ronald J. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Botsford, Bruce)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/17/2019), SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC. response due 4/16/2019, Motions due by 4/25/2019.). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC.. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Agnello, Nicholas)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11505839, filed by SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Agnello, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Collins
Represented By: Bruce Craig Botsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: Nicholas Steven Agnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?