Stolfat v. Equifax Information Services, LLC. et al

Plaintiff: Jelena Stolfat
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC. and Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80428
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Setting Trial Date & Discovery Deadlines, Referring Case To Mediation & Referring Discovery Motions To United States Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 8/21/2020 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 28, 2019 Filing 38 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Transunion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Tifford, Alexandra)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE [DE 32]. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
June 21, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #32 Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, by Transunion, LLC.. (Tifford, Alexandra)
June 18, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #34 Plaintiff's Order on Motion for Sanctions. (Copy of Order Mailed to Plaintiff ) (vmz)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #33 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, Supporting Request for Entry of Default by Jelena Stolfat. (ail)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY [DE 20] AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO DEFENSE COUNSEL: denying #20 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel and Motion to Revoke the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Defendant's Counsel. Defendant's counsel, Ms. Tifford, Mr. Knight and Mr. Meran, shall show cause why such arguments were made and why sanctions should not be imposed upon all such counsel due to the improper, inaccurate, and misleading statements contained in Defendant's Response. (Show Cause Response due by 6/24/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 6/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza)
June 10, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Love, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.. Attorney John Anthony Love added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC.(pty:dft). (Love, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Equifax Information Services, LLC. served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (vmz)
June 10, 2019 Filing 28 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. - Motions Terminated: #27 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Reason: Answer deadline has NOT lapsed Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/10/2019. (vmz) Modified TEXT on 6/10/2019 (vmz).
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. by Jelena Stolfat. (vmz) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (vmz).
June 7, 2019 Filing 26 Plaintiff's Request for Interrogatories by Jelena Stolfat.(vmz)
May 31, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel MOTION refer the matter to the Grievance Committee of the Bar District in which the court is located, if applicable. Defendant Trans Union LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel and Revoke Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Transunion, LLC.. Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexandra L. Tifford, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Merar)(Tifford, Alexandra)
May 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents to Transunion, LLC. by Jelena Stolfat (ail)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #21 Order Referring Motion, ( copy of order mailed to Plaintiff ) (vmz)
May 20, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST for Production of Documents to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Jelena Stolfat. (vmz) Modified Text on 6/12/2019 (ra).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING #20 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel MOTION refer the matter to the Grievance Committee of the Bar District in which the court is located, if applicable. filed by Jelena Stolfat. Motions referred to Judge William Matthewman. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 Motion To Disqualify Defendant Counsels And Motion To Revoke The Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Defendant Counsel And MOTION to refer the matter to the Grievance Committee of the Bar District in which the court is located, if applicable. ( Responses due by 5/31/2019), by Jelena Stolfat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(vmz)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC. (vmz)
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (vmz)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Equifax Information Services, LLC.(vmz) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (vmz).
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Transunion, LLC. (vmz)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Michael Merar. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/10/2019. (mkz)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael Merar. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11631596 by Transunion, LLC.. Responses due by 5/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tifford, Alexandra)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transunion, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion for Transunion, LLC. (Tifford, Alexandra)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Transunion, LLC.. Attorney Alexandra Lyn Tifford added to party Transunion, LLC.(pty:dft). (Tifford, Alexandra)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #6 Clerks Receipt. US Mail returned for: Jelena Stolfat. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Whyte, Erika)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Whyte, Erika)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erika Stephanie Whyte on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Erika Stephanie Whyte added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). (Whyte, Erika)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report And Joint Discovery Report Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 4/11/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100184981. (vt)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #4 Mailed to the Plaintiff. (vmz)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filing Fee due by 4/12/2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jelena Stolfat. (ail)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Transunion, LLC.. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Jelena Stolfat.(ail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stolfat v. Equifax Information Services, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jelena Stolfat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Erika Stephanie Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion, LLC.
Represented By: Michael Merar
Represented By: Alexandra Lyn Tifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Represented By: John Anthony Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?