Korecky v. Discover Bank et al
Plaintiff: Taylre Korecky
Defendant: Discover Bank, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and USAA Federal Savings Bank
Case Number: 9:2019cv80442
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 51 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #50 Judgment by Taylre Korecky (Mize, Joshua)
October 21, 2019 Filing 50 Stipulated Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. Order granting #48 Motion for Entry if Final Judgment. Upon the Clerk of Court's entry of Final Judgment, the Clerk of Court shall immediately CLOSE THIS CASE. All pending motions shall be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 7, 2019 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment (Final Judgment) by Taylre Korecky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mize, Joshua)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER. On October 3, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment, indicating the Parties' have settled this matter. (DE #46 ). The Parties shall file appropriate closing documents by October 10, 2019. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Parties' settlement agreement if requested to do so before closing the case. The Parties are advised that their pending settlement does not stay this litigation. Therefore, until a joint stipulation of dismissal is filed, the court will expect compliance with all pretrial deadlines. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/4/2019. (kal)
October 3, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Taylre Korecky (Mize, Joshua)
September 9, 2019 Filing 45 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Taormina, Alisa)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #43 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. In the present Motion, Defendant seeks leave to amend its Answer and Affirmative Defenses. (DE #43 ). Although the deadline to amend pleadings has expired, Rule 15(a) provides that leave to amend should be freely granted "when justice so requires." Defendant's request is narrow; specifically, it requests "leave to amend its Answer in order to withdraw its tenth affirmative defense (and Chase will not make any other substantive amendments to the Answer)." (DE #43 at 1). According to Defendant, Plaintiff does not oppose the requested relief. (DE #43 at 2). Based on the foregoing, the motion is GRANTED. Defendant is advised that pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, the amended pleading must be separately filed. The deadline for Defendant to file the Amended Answer is September 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/9/2019. (kal)
September 6, 2019 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Taormina, Alisa)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting #36 Motion for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Setting Discovery Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS. Motion #36 referred to Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 20, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Taormina, Alisa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order filed by Taylre Korecky. Replies due by 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Plaintiff's Proposed Protective Order), #2 Exhibit B (Redline of Protective Order))(Mize, Joshua)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER. Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A., moves for entry of a protective order to govern the production of confidential information in this matter. (DE 36). Defendant's Motion indicates that Plaintiff opposes Defendant's Proposed Confidentiality and Protective Order. (DE 36-1). The Court observes that the issuance of protective orders is a routine component of modern discovery practice and that the issuance of such orders is expressly authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c). In order to prevent delays in the conduct of discovery in this matter, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to Defendant's Motion on or before August 14, 2019, stating the basis of her opposition. Plaintiff's Response must contain her own proposed order, and Plaintiff must enumerate the ways in which her proposal differs from Defendant's. If Plaintiff wishes to withdraw her opposition, she is directed to file such notice on or before August 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/12/2019. (mbt)
August 9, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Taormina, Alisa)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mark Elliot Steiner withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 25, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE/Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Discover Bank re #32 Order Dismissing Party of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice (Steiner, Mark) Modified to convert document into a Motion on 6/26/2019 (kpe).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #25 MOTION TO SEVER. The Clerk of Court shall TERMINATE Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank as a defendant in this matter. USAA Federal Savings Bank terminated. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Dismissing Party Discover Bank. Defendant Discover Bank is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 17, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 30 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, by Taylre Korecky. (Mize, Joshua)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's response to Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank's Motion to Sever(DE #25 ) was due on June 13, 2019. No response appears in the court file. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, (1) why the motion should not be granted and (2) why Plaintiff failed to respond by June 13, 2019. Plaintiff's failure to respond to this order to show cause may result in the motion being granted by default pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/17/2019. (mbt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Discover Bank Only by Taylre Korecky (Mize, Joshua)
June 13, 2019 Filing 28 Statement of: Consistent With Local Rule 7.1 as to USAA Federal Savings Bank's Motion to Sever by USAA Federal Savings Bank re #25 MOTION to Sever (King, S. Elizabeth)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Dismissing Defendant Discover Bank re #26 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal; Dismissing Discover Bank without prejudice. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
May 30, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Discover Bank Only by Taylre Korecky (Mize, Joshua)
May 30, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Sever by USAA Federal Savings Bank. Responses due by 6/13/2019 (King, S. Elizabeth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (King, S. Elizabeth)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER. Defendant Discover Bank has filed a Notice of Settlement. (DE #21 ). Plaintiff and Defendant Discover Bank are congratulated on their amicable resolution of this matter. Pursuant to the instructions set forth in the Pretrial Scheduling Order, Plaintiff and Defendant Discover Bank must submit appropriate dismissal documents within 10 days. (DE #10 ). Accordingly, Plaintiff and Defendant Discover Bank are directed to file dismissal documents on or before May 28, 2019. These Parties may move the Court to retain jurisdiction if necessary to enforce the terms of their settlement agreement. Defendant Discover Bank is further advised that until dismissal documents are filed, the Court will expect compliance with all deadlines presently set in this case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/20/2019. (mbt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Taylre Korecky (Mize, Joshua)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement by Discover Bank (Steiner, Mark)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING ASIDE CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Order granting DE #18 Motion to Set Aside Clerks Default. (USAA Federal Savings Bank response due 5/30/2019. ) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 9, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Federal Savings Bank identifying Corporate Parent USAA Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate United States Automobile Association (USAA) for USAA Federal Savings Bank (King, S. Elizabeth)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Set Aside Default by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(King, S. Elizabeth)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 VACATED Clerks Entry of Default as to USAA Federal Savings Bank. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 5/9/2019. (kpe) Modified on 5/14/2019 per DE #20 Order (kpe).
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Christopher Reinert on behalf of USAA Federal Savings Bank. Attorney Ryan Christopher Reinert added to party USAA Federal Savings Bank(pty:dft). (Reinert, Ryan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S. Elizabeth King on behalf of USAA Federal Savings Bank. Attorney S. Elizabeth King added to party USAA Federal Savings Bank(pty:dft). (King, S. Elizabeth)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to USAA Federal Savings Bank by Taylre Korecky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mize, Joshua)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Taylre Korecky. USAA Federal Savings Bank served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Mize, Joshua)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate Chase Bank USA, N.A. for JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Taormina, Alisa)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Taormina, Alisa)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019., Discovery due by 11/4/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2019., In Limine Motions due by 12/2/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2019., Motions due by 12/2/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/6/2020., Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/29/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/3/2019. Attorney Appearances: Joshua Mize, Esq. for Plaintiff | Mark Steiner, Esq. for Defendant Discover Bank; Alisa Taormina, Esq. for Defendant Chase Bank. No appearance on behalf of Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank. Pretrial and scheduling matters discussed. Scheduling Order to follow. (Total Time in Court: 11 mins. | Digital: 14:29:00) (jrz)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for May 3, 2019 at 2:30 P.M. in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the telephonic scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets three cases per 30-minute time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/26/2019. (spe)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CA SE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Calendar Call set for 1/29/2020 at 1:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A., (which is named in the Complaint as "JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.,") to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (DE #1 ) is extended to May 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/23/2019. (mbt)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. Attorney Alisa M Taormina added to party JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taormina, Alisa)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Elliot Steiner on behalf of Discover Bank. Attorney Mark Elliot Steiner added to party Discover Bank(pty:dft). (Steiner, Mark)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Discover Bank, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., USAA Federal Savings Bank. (kpe)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Discover Bank, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., USAA Federal Savings Bank. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11514506, filed by Taylre Korecky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Discover Bank, #3 Summon(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., #4 Summon(s) USAA Federal Savings Bank)(Mize, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korecky v. Discover Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylre Korecky
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Mark Elliot Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa M Taormina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Reinert
Represented By: S. Elizabeth King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?