Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Modern Living Real Estate, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Modern Living Real Estate, LLC and Compass Florida, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv80488
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion by 7/17/2019. Re: #27 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Compass Florida, LLC. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #27 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lomnitzer, Lorri)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Compass Florida, LLC. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Soles, Maureen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Modern Living Real Estate, LLC. (Lovelady, Allison)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Deborah A. Wilcox. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2019., Discovery due by 3/24/2020., Expert Discovery due by 3/24/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/26/2019., Mediation Deadline 4/7/2020., In Limine Motions due by 4/15/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020., Motions due by 4/15/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/6/2020., Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 7/14/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart For Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Deborah A. Wilcox. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11764590 by Compass Florida, LLC. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Soles, Maureen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Compass Florida, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Softbank Group Corp., Corporate Parent SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1) L.P., Other Affiliate Urban Compass, Inc., Other Affiliate Robert Reffkin for Compass Florida, LLC (Soles, Maureen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. (Krebsbach, Spensyr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krebsbach, Spensyr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Modern Living Real Estate, LLC (Lovelady, Allison)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Modern Living Real Estate, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Affordable Aerial Photography Inc., Other Affiliate Lorri Lomnitzer, Other Affiliate Spensyr Krebsbach, Other Affiliate Shullman Fugate PLLC, Other Affiliate Compass Florida, LLC, Other Affiliate Allison S. Lovelady, Other Affiliate Deanna K. Shullman, Other Affiliate Kendall O. Pfeifer, Other Affiliate Lomnitzer Law Firm, Other Affiliate Maureen Soles, Other Affiliate Robert Stevens, Other Affiliate Baker & Hostetler, LLP, Other Affiliate Patrick Lafferty for Modern Living Real Estate, LLC (Lovelady, Allison)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Defendant Modern Living Real Estate LLC's Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorneys added: Deanna Kendall Shullman and Kendall Obreza Pfeifer for Modern Living Real Estate, LLC. Attorney Guy Elliot Quattlebaum terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/17/2019. (hk02)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Deanna Shullman, Allison Lovelady and Kendall Pfeifer for Guy Quattlebaum by Modern Living Real Estate, LLC. Attorney Allison Sinclair Lovelady added to party Modern Living Real Estate, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lovelady, Allison)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Lomnitzer, Lorri)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by Modern Living Real Estate, LLC. by 6/26/2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Modern Living Real Estate, LLC. Attorney Guy Elliot Quattlebaum added to party Modern Living Real Estate, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quattlebaum, Guy)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document by June 26, 2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Complaint by Compass Florida, LLC. (Soles, Maureen)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maureen Berard Soles on behalf of Compass Florida, LLC. Attorney Maureen Berard Soles added to party Compass Florida, LLC(pty:dft). (Soles, Maureen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Compass Florida, LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Lomnitzer, Lorri)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Modern Living Real Estate, LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Lomnitzer, Lorri)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER To File Proof of Service Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates of Interested Parties Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Civil Cover Sheet. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Compass Florida, LLC, Modern Living Real Estate, LLC. (vmz)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (vmz)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Compass Florida, LLC, Modern Living Real Estate, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11545208, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s))(Lomnitzer, Lorri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Modern Living Real Estate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Living Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Allison Sinclair Lovelady
Represented By: Guy Elliot Quattlebaum
Represented By: Deanna Kendall Shullman
Represented By: Kendall Obreza Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Florida, LLC
Represented By: Maureen Berard Soles
Represented By: Deborah A. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Lorri Lomnitzer
Represented By: Spensyr Ann Krebsbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?