Doe v. Town of Jupiter Police Department et al

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Town of Jupiter Police Department, Andrew Sharp, David Aronberg and Town of Jupiter
Case Number: 9:2019cv80513
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
2 Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
3 Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Calendar Call set for 6/16/2020 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation due by 7/23/2019., Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2019., All Discovery due by 2/24/2020., Mediation Deadline 3/2/2020., Pretrial Motions due by 3/10/2020., In Limine Motions due by 4/7/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/7/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all discovery matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (mhn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 3, 2019 Filing 56 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Town of Jupiter identifying Other Affiliate Preferred Governmental Insurance Trust (PGIT) for Town of Jupiter (Reynolds, Lyman)
July 3, 2019 Filing 55 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Andrew Sharp identifying Other Affiliate Preferred Governmental Insurance Trust (PGIT) for Andrew Sharp (Janousek, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 54 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by David Aronberg (Weaver, Shane)
July 2, 2019 Filing 53 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by John Doe (Sox, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 52 Clerks Notice to Filer re #51 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (jas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Andrew Sharp (Janousek, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 50 Clerks Notice to Filer re #49 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (jas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Town of Jupiter (Reynolds, Lyman)
July 2, 2019 Filing 48 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Town of Jupiter (Reynolds, Lyman)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #41 Defendant David Aronberg's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss pursuant to #42 Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint and #43 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Written Consent. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/28/2019. (mhn)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #38 Defendant David Aronberg's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint pursuant to #42 Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint and #43 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Written Consent Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/28/2019. (mhn)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #35 Defendant Town of Jupiter's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Motion to Strike Claim for Punitive Damages pursuant to #42 Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint and #43 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Written Consent. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/28/2019. (mhn)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #34 Defendant Andrew Sharp's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Complaint pursuant to #42 Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint and #43 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Written Consent. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/28/2019. (mhn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE by John Doe of Filing Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Written Consent of Parties (Mullins, Edward)
June 28, 2019 Filing 42 Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Doe.(Mullins, Edward)
June 14, 2019 Filing 41 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss by David Aronberg. Responses due by 6/28/2019 (Weaver, Shane)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificate of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/2/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #36 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to the following: #34 Defendant Andrew Sharp's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice #24 Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint; #35 Defendant Town of Jupiter's Motion to Dismiss #24 Plaintiff's Third Amended Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Strike Claim for Punitive Damages; and #38 Defendant Aronberg's Motion to Dismiss #24 Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff must respond to the above-mentioned Motions on or before July 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/31/2019. (mhn)
May 29, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION TO DISMISS #24 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by David Aronberg. Responses due by 6/12/2019 (Weaver, Shane)
May 29, 2019 Filing 37 Clerks Notice to Filer re #36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
May 29, 2019 Filing 36 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #34 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, #35 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #24 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Strike Claim for Punitive Damages and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by John Doe. Responses due by 6/12/2019 (Sox, Daniel) Modified Relief on 5/29/2019 (ls).
May 28, 2019 Filing 35 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #24 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Strike Claim for Punitive Damages and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ( Responses due by 6/11/2019) by Town of Jupiter. Attorney Lyman Hawley Reynolds, Jr added to party Town of Jupiter(pty:dft). (Reynolds, Lyman)
May 16, 2019 Filing 34 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens by Andrew Sharp. Responses due by 5/30/2019 (Janousek, John)
May 16, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Morgan Janousek on behalf of Andrew Sharp. Attorney John Morgan Janousek added to party Andrew Sharp(pty:dft). (Janousek, John)
May 16, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Roper on behalf of Andrew Sharp. Attorney Michael J. Roper added to party Andrew Sharp(pty:dft). (Roper, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Aronberg to File Response/Answer to #24 Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed. Response/Answer due on or before 5/29/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/15/2019. (mhn)
May 14, 2019 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #24 Amended Complaint by David Aronberg. Attorney Shane Weaver added to party David Aronberg(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, Shane)
May 13, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #24 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by John Doe. Town of Jupiter served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Mullins, Edward)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart added. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
May 8, 2019 Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING HEARING: In light of the Order of Reassignment to U.S. District Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, DE #26 , the telephonic scheduling conference set for May 10, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 5/8/2019. (js03)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz for all further proceedings, Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
May 3, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Town of Jupiter. (jas)
May 1, 2019 Filing 24 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against David Aronberg, Andrew Sharp, Town of Jupiter filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Mullins, Edward)
May 1, 2019 Filing 23 Clerks Notice to Filer re #19 Summons Returned Executed,. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (jas)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff is advised that pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, the amended pleading must be separately filed. Plaintiff shall file the third amended complaint on or by May 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/1/2019. (sfr)
April 30, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #13 Amended Complaint with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by John Doe. David Aronberg served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (See DE# [19-2] for image). (jas)
April 30, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint to Correct Party Name and Amend Caption by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mullins, Edward)
April 30, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, #13 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by John Doe. David Aronberg served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Andrew Sharp served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B)(Sox, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 18 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (jas)
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by John Doe (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Mullins, Edward)
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by John Doe as to Town of Jupiter Police Department. (Mullins, Edward)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for May 10, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the telephonic scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets three cases per 30-minute time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/25/2019. (spe)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David Lee Brannon for scheduling matters. ( Calendar Call set for 2/12/2020 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against David Aronberg, Andrew Sharp, Town of Jupiter Police Department filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by John Doe.(Mullins, Edward)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff is advised that pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, the amended pleading must be separately filed. Plaintiff shall file the second amended complaint on or by April 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/23/2019. (sfr)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C)(Mullins, Edward)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against All Defendants, filed by John Doe.(Mullins, Edward)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Emergency Motion to Intervene and for Protective Order in the Circuit Court of the 15th Judicial Circuit in and for Palm Beach County, Florida by John Doe of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mullins, Edward) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (jas).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jordan W. Siev. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/17/2019. (sfr)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Joseph Tacopina. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/17/2019. (sfr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph Tacopina. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11563992 by John Doe. Responses due by 4/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to David Aronberg, Andrew Sharp, Town of Jupiter Police Department. (jas)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jordan W. Siev. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11562788 by John Doe. Responses due by 4/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by John Doe re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by John Doe (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s)) (Sox, Daniel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against David Aronberg, Andrew Sharp, Town of Jupiter Police Department. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11558299, filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mullins, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Town of Jupiter Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Jupiter Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Sharp
Represented By: John Morgan Janousek
Represented By: Michael J. Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Aronberg
Represented By: Shane Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Jupiter
Represented By: Lyman Hawley Reynolds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Daniel Alvarez Sox
Represented By: Joseph Tacopina
Represented By: Jordan W. Siev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?