WOERNER et al v. TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC

Plaintiff: ROGER L. WOERNER and WOERNER AGRIBUSINESS, LLC
Defendant: TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv80541
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
2 Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by ROGER L. WOERNER, WOERNER AGRIBUSINESS, LLC and Templeton & Company, LLP of their Joint Notice of New Deadline to Furnish Initial Disclosures (Gaal, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC. (Carlos, Efrain)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/11/2019. (btr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unopposed Order)(Carlos, Efrain)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by ROGER L. WOERNER, WOERNER AGRIBUSINESS, LLC (Gaal, Richard)
May 28, 2019 ***Hearing(s)set before Judge Rosenberg terminated. (jmd)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg recused. Case reassigned to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Efrain Carlos on behalf of TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC. Attorney Efrain Carlos added to party TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC(pty:dft). (Carlos, Efrain)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ROGER L. WOERNER, WOERNER AGRIBUSINESS, LLC. TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Gaal, Richard)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 5/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE,CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OFREQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Trial set for 4/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 4/22/2020 at 9:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC. (amb)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11571487, filed by ROGER L. WOERNER, WOERNER AGRIBUSINESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gaal, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOERNER et al v. TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER L. WOERNER
Represented By: Richard M Gaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WOERNER AGRIBUSINESS, LLC
Represented By: Richard M Gaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLETON & COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Walden Lee
Represented By: Efrain Carlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?