Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Fred DeFalco, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Fred DeFalco and Fred DeFalco, P.A.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80555
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothman, Joel)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 06/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 4/22/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 3/25/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 06/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/22/2019. (bkd)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Fred DeFalco, P.A.. (Baker, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Fred DeFalco. (Baker, Amy)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jura Christine Zibas on behalf of Fred DeFalco, Fred DeFalco, P.A.. Attorney Jura Christine Zibas added to party Fred DeFalco(pty:dft), Attorney Jura Christine Zibas added to party Fred DeFalco, P.A.(pty:dft). (Zibas, Jura)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Fred DeFalco, Fred DeFalco, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Amy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Leigh Baker on behalf of Fred DeFalco, Fred DeFalco, P.A.. Attorney Amy Leigh Baker added to party Fred DeFalco(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Leigh Baker added to party Fred DeFalco, P.A.(pty:dft). (Baker, Amy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Stuart Weiss on behalf of Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Attorney Jason Stuart Weiss added to party Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.(pty:pla). (Weiss, Jason)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Fred DeFalco, P.A. served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. Fred DeFalco served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. (Rothman, Joel)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits) (jao)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jao)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Fred DeFalco, Fred DeFalco, P.A.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11584099, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Fred DeFalco, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred DeFalco
Represented By: Jura Christine Zibas
Represented By: Amy Leigh Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred DeFalco, P.A.
Represented By: Jura Christine Zibas
Represented By: Amy Leigh Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Ana Paula Moretto
Represented By: Jason Stuart Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?