US Bank National Association v. Scott et al

Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Defendant: Town of Lake Park, Florida, Unknown Person(s) in Possession of the Subject Propertyas to 236 Palmetto Drive, Jacqueline Scott, Unknown Person(s) in Possession of the Subject Property as to 238 Palmetto Drive, Norman Scott and Trevor Bowes
Case Number: 9:2019cv80563
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of Remand & Acknowledgment of receipt to: Fifteeth Judicial Circuit Court. State Court Case Number: 502019CA003897XXXXMB (ebz)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Remanding Case to State Court Closing Case. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Motions terminated: #8 MOTION for Default Judgment MOTION to Deposit Funds MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by US Bank National Association. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION (Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2019., Discovery due by 11/25/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 7/22/2019., Miscellaneous Deadline (Discovery Plan) 7/8/2019., In Limine Motions due by 12/16/2019., Pre-Trial Motions due by 12/16/2019., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/21/2020., Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 2/12/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 6/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/14/2019. Gregg Ahrens, Esq. appeared for Plaintiff. No appearance(s) made for Defendants. Court discusses scheduling and other pretrial matters. Scheduling Order to follow. (Total Time in Court: 3 mins. | Digital: 14:43:05) (js03)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 MOTION for Default Judgment MOTION to Deposit Funds MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (jas)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE OF FEE NOT PAID. As of this date a replacement filing fee plus $53 processing fee has not been paid re #5 CLERK'S NOTICE re 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint to Foreclose Mortgage) Filing fee $400.00 Receipt#: FLS900006326. Non-sufficient funds via Financial NSF. Fee Not Paid Due to Insufficient Funds. CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must pay required filing fee plus $53 fee, pursuant to 4 CFR 101-108, for payment returned due to lack of funds. Payment must be made within five (5) days by manner of cash, credit card, certified check or money order. (jua)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for June 14, 2019 at 2:30 P.M. in West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. At that time, the parties shall call (888) 808-6929 and enter access code 2036573. Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the telephonic scheduling conference. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets three cases per 30-minute time slot.
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. ( Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 2/12/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by US Bank National Association. Attorney Gregg Scott Ahrens added to party US Bank National Association(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit 1-B, #3 Exhibit 2-A, #4 Exhibit 2-B, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Ahrens, Gregg) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (jas).
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Norman Scott.(mc)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORRECTED ORDER ON JURISDICTIONAL DEFECTS. ( Amended Notice of Removal due by 5/13/2019.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint to Foreclose Mortgage) Filing fee $400.00 Receipt#: FLS900006326. Non-sufficient funds via Financial NSF. Fee Not Paid Due to Insufficient Funds. CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must pay required filing fee plus $53 fee, pursuant to 4 CFR 101-108, for payment returned due to lack of funds. Payment must be made within five (5) days by manner of cash, credit card, certified check or money order. (jua)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON JURISDICTIONAL DEFECTS, ( Amended Notice of Removal due by 5/13/2019.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 4/25/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006326 (pcs)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint to Foreclose Mortgage) Filing fee $400.00 Receipt#: FLS900006326, filed by Norman Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents)(pcs) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Text Modified on 4/25/2019 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Bank National Association v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Lake Park, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Person(s) in Possession of the Subject Propertyas to 236 Palmetto Drive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Person(s) in Possession of the Subject Property as to 238 Palmetto Drive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Bowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Lea Wendy Vandergriff
Represented By: Robert Scott Kahane
Represented By: Sheree Edwards
Represented By: Gregg Scott Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?