M22 Fund, LLC v. Gallon et al

Plaintiff: M22 Fund, LLC
Defendant: Line Martin, Royal Palm Improvement Association and Stuart Bryan Gallon
Case Number: 9:2019cv80587
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (jc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by the Clerk of Circuit and County Courts of the 15th Judicial Circuits of Florida as to #6 Transmittal Letter Sent (mee)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order of Remand to: 15th Judicial Circuit, Palm Beach County. State Court Case Number: 50-02019-CA-000194-MB (pcs)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REMANDING CASE Closing Case. Motions terminated: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by M22 Fund, LLC. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON JURISDICTIONAL DEFECTS, Defendants SHALL FILE an amended notice of removal on or by May 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by M22 Fund, LLC. (Kopelowitz, Brian)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00, filed by Stuart Bryan Gallon (Trustee of the Stuart Bryan Gallon Revocable Trust dated February 3, 2016, A Florida Trust), Line Martin. NOT PAID/NO IFP FILED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint/State Court Record)(kpe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M22 Fund, LLC v. Gallon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Line Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Palm Improvement Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Bryan Gallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M22 Fund, LLC
Represented By: Brian Roger Kopelowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?