Johnson v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Johnson
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80671
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2611
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 12/17/2019 02:30 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: Discovery due by 1/27/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2020. Mediation Deadline 3/27/2020. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cula, Steven)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donald Johnson (Storch, Noah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard David Guadagnolo, II on behalf of Donald Johnson. Attorney Richard David Guadagnolo, II added to party Donald Johnson(pty:pla). (Guadagnolo, Richard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Cula, Steven)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Donald Johnson. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Storch, Noah)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 5/20/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 4/8/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery.. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Patrick Hammon on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Christopher Patrick Hammon added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). (Hammon, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Steven S. Cula added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). (Cula, Steven)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (amb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11664046, filed by Donald Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storch, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Johnson
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Represented By: Richard David Guadagnolo, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Hammon
Represented By: Steven S. Cula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?