Reid v. Greenlane Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jamie Reid
Defendant: Greenlane Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80711
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF FINAL DISMISSAL. Plaintiff Jamie Reid's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. The claims of the putative class members are DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions not otherwise ruled upon are DENIED as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Jamie Reid (Gitkin, James)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman added. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, Judge Robin L. Rosenberg no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 6/3/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 4/22/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery.. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/13/2019. (kbs)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Greenlane Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lori P. Lustrin on behalf of Greenlane Holdings, Inc.. Attorney Lori P. Lustrin added to party Greenlane Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft). (Lustrin, Lori)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greenlane Holdings, Inc. (Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Cade Pallett-Vasquez on behalf of Greenlane Holdings, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Cade Pallett-Vasquez added to party Greenlane Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft). (Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Greenlane Holdings, Inc.. (amb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greenlane Holdings, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11688447, filed by Jamie Reid. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gitkin, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Greenlane Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenlane Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Lori P. Lustrin
Represented By: Melissa Cade Pallett-Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Reid
Represented By: James Paul Gitkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?