Cantin v. Rusty Norvell Concrete Pumping Service, Inc.

Appellee: Rusty Norvell Concrete Pumping Service, Inc., Janice Norvell, Adam G Wasch, Norman L Schroeder and John Norvell
Appellant: Rene Cantin and Donald N Jacobson
Case Number: 9:2019cv80735
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 Second Supplemental Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Rene Cantin (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Joint Amended NOA DE 235)(mon)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Granting (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 9:19-cv-80735-RAR. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 19-CIV-80776-RAR for administrative purposes only. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 19-CIV-80776-RAR for administrative purposes only. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #13 Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals Pursuant to FRAP 8003(b)(2) pursuant to #17 Amended Motion to Consolidate Appeals Pursuant to FRAP 8003(b)(2). Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/22/2019. (mhn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED MOTION to Consolidate Appeals Pursuant to FRAP 8003(b)(2) by Rene Cantin. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (jao)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 APPENDIX for Appellants' Brief #15 by Rene Cantin (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Supplement, #8 Supplement, #9 Supplement, #10 Supplement)(jao) Modified on 7/11/2019 (mr1).
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF for Appellants by Rene Cantin. (jao)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 8/9/2019. (jc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Appeals Pursuant to FRAP 8003(b)(2) by Rene Cantin. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (jao)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Rene Cantin to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: rene10044@gmail.com (jao)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #10 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court, (Exhibit Register and Exhibits from 10/11/2018 Evidentiary Hearing as part of Designated Record) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 25, #23 Exhibit 26)(mon)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Third Supplemental Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Rene Cantin (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant designations, #3 Appellant designated items, #4 Cantin Statements of Issues DE 211 214 and 216, #5 Appellee Designation, #6 Appellee Designated Items)(mon)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Gruder Wasch on behalf of Rusty Norvell Concrete Pumping Service, Inc.. Attorney Adam Gruder Wasch added to party Rusty Norvell Concrete Pumping Service, Inc.(pty:e). (Wasch, Adam)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Supplemental Transmittal and Copy of Docket Sheet re #7 Bankruptcy Filing of Notice of Appeal with District Court (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (jc).
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Second Amended Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT - Pursuant to 28 USC 158 with District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Rene Cantin (mon) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (jc).
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Supplemental Transmittal and Copy of Docket Sheet re #5 Bankruptcy Amended Notice of Appeal with District Court (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (jc).
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT - Pursuant to 28 USC 158 with District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Rene Cantin (mon) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (jc).
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Rene Cantin (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 15-28505-BKC-MAM, filed by Rene Cantin.(mon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantin v. Rusty Norvell Concrete Pumping Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rusty Norvell Concrete Pumping Service, Inc.
Represented By: Norman Lorraine Schroeder, II.
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Janice Norvell
Represented By: Norman Lorraine Schroeder, II.
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Adam G Wasch
Represented By: Norman Lorraine Schroeder, II.
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Norman L Schroeder
Represented By: Norman Lorraine Schroeder, II.
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Norvell
Represented By: Norman Lorraine Schroeder, II.
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rene Cantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald N Jacobson
Represented By: Donald Nathan Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?