King v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Antonio Carlos King
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv80788
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pretrial Scheduling Order And Order Referring Case To Mediation: ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2019., Discovery due by 12/16/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 8/26/2019., In Limine Motions due by 1/13/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 1/13/2020., Motions due by 1/13/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/18/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 3/11/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 8/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Referring Case And Setting Trial Date: ( Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 3/11/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Cula, Steven)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11732978, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Hammon, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Carlos King
Represented By: Rainier Regueiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Hammon
Represented By: Steven S. Cula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?