Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC

Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv80816
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Harry Schafer. (Sanks, Terry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Harry Schafer. (Sanks, Terry)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Attorney Jessica Neer McDonald added to party Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC(pty:dft). (McDonald, Jessica)
July 31, 2019 Attorney Dale Paul DiMaggio terminated per #21 Order. (asl) Modified Date Filed and link text on 7/31/2019 (asl).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (DE 20), granting #20 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Mark David Bowen and Gregory G. Olsen terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION/STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendez, Meredith) Modified to convert document to a motion on 7/31/2019 (mc).
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. re #8 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Joint Notice regarding Pretrial Deadlines (Sanks, Terry)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines. Per the Court's Trial Order #8 , the parties may mutually agree to extend any pretrial deadline prior to the deadline to file pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/26/2019. (sk01)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend pretrial deadlines re #8 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, by Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Responses due by 8/9/2019 (Olsen, Gregory)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading or a responsive motion by August 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/23/2019. (sk01)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, by Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. (Olsen, Gregory)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading or a responsive motion by July 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/15/2019. (sk01)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. (Olsen, Gregory)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dale Paul DiMaggio on behalf of Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Attorney Dale Paul DiMaggio added to party Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC(pty:dft). (DiMaggio, Dale)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark David Bowen on behalf of Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Attorney Mark David Bowen added to party Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC(pty:dft). (Bowen, Mark)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 11/14/2019 02:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, ANDTRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 12/13/2019., Expert Discovery due by 12/27/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2020., Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 4/8/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 3/11/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory G. Olsen on behalf of Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Attorney Gregory G. Olsen added to party Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC(pty:dft). (Olsen, Gregory)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. (ls)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Sanks, Terry)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed. (pes)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (pes)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11752314, filed by Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Sanks, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. v. Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worth Avenue Yachts, LLC
Represented By: Meredith Frank Mendez
Represented By: Mark David Bowen
Represented By: Gregory G. Olsen
Represented By: Jessica Neer McDonald
Represented By: Dale Paul DiMaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Terry Marcus Sanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?