Alexander et al v. Avalon 850 Boca, LLC et al
Plaintiff: H.A., Nara Alexander and Richard Alexander
Defendant: Avalon 850 Boca, LLC, Greystar Management Services, L.P. and Grep Southeast, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv80826
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Avalon 850 Boca, LLC, Grep Southeast, LLC, Greystar Management Services, L.P.. Attorney Adam Craig Herman added to party Avalon 850 Boca, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Craig Herman added to party Grep Southeast, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Craig Herman added to party Greystar Management Services, L.P.(pty:dft). (Herman, Adam)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Avalon 850 Boca, LLC, Grep Southeast, LLC, filed by Richard Alexander, H.A., Nara Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Conner, Jessica)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Richard Alexander, H.A., Nara Alexander. Greystar Management Services, L.P. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Return of Service on Defendant Greystar Management Services, L.P.)(Conner, Jessica)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Richard Alexander, H.A., Nara Alexander. Avalon 850 Boca, LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Return of Service on Defendant Avalon 850 Boca, LLC)(Conner, Jessica)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 6/17/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 5/20/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Avalon 850 Boca, LLC, Greystar Management Services, L.P., filed by Richard Alexander, H.A., Nara Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Conner, Jessica)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Greystar Management Services, L.P.. (drz)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Avalon 850 Boca, LLC. (drz)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avalon 850 Boca, LLC, Greystar Management Services, L.P.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11753991, filed by Richard Alexander, H.A., Nara Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit A)(Conner, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v. Avalon 850 Boca, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.A.
Represented By: Jessica Christy Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nara Alexander
Represented By: Jessica Christy Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Alexander
Represented By: Jessica Christy Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon 850 Boca, LLC
Represented By: Adam Craig Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Represented By: Adam Craig Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grep Southeast, LLC
Represented By: Adam Craig Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?