Blake v. LEGEND SECURITIES, INC., et al
Petitioner: Frederick Blake
Respondent: LEGEND SECURITIES, INC.,, BRIAN KEITH DECKER, STEVEN JOHN MEYER and BERNARDO MISSERI
Case Number: 9:2019cv80891
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to LEGEND SECURITIES, INC.,. (ail)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Amended Alias Summons on Legends Securities, Inc., by Frederick Blake re #8 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) filed by Frederick Blake (Solomon, Neil)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Alias Summons for Legends Securities Inc., by Frederick Blake re #4 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Frederick Blake (Solomon, Neil)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Defendants in this action to file their responses and motions jointly, unless there are clear conflicts of position. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Frederick Blake. BERNARDO MISSERI served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Solomon, Neil)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Frederick Blake. STEVEN JOHN MEYER served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Solomon, Neil)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Frederick Blake as to LEGEND SECURITIES, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Return of Service Executed)(Solomon, Neil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BRIAN KEITH DECKER, LEGEND SECURITIES, INC.,, STEVEN JOHN MEYER, BERNARDO MISSERI. (amb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD WITH RESPECT TO ONLY CERTAIN ARBITRATION RESPONDENTS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW against BRIAN KEITH DECKER, LEGEND SECURITIES, INC.,, STEVEN JOHN MEYER, BERNARDO MISSERI. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11792203, filed by Frederick Blake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Legends Securities Inc.,, #3 Summon(s) Brian Keith Decker, #4 Summon(s) Steven John Meyer, #5 Summon(s) Bernardo Misseri, #6 Exhibit Arbitration Award)(Solomon, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake v. LEGEND SECURITIES, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LEGEND SECURITIES, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BRIAN KEITH DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEVEN JOHN MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BERNARDO MISSERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick Blake
Represented By: Neil Barry Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?