Mustakas et al v. Integon National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Merribeth Mustakas and Paul Mustakas
Defendant: Integon National Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv80911
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 10 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ail)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Eric Kleinman. SEE DE #9 IMAGE (ail)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Integon National Insurance Company re #5 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, of Selection of Mediator (Oltchick, Brian)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE. ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 10/23/2019 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Removal by Integon National Insurance Company (Oltchick, Brian)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION. SCHEDULING ORDER: (Fact Discovery due by 11/18/2019., Expert Discovery due by 12/2/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2019., Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 3/11/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 1/29/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery.., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 1/17/2020.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Integon National Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff Request for Production to Defendant, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff Request for Admissions to Defendant, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant, #7 Exhibit Plaintiffs NOD DT of Defendants CR, #8 Exhibit Plaintiffs NOD DT of FA, Jackson, #9 Exhibit Defendants State Court Notice of Removal) (Oltchick, Brian)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11803115, filed by Integon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit WPB Property Appraiser - Plaintiff's Residence, #2 Exhibit FL Dept of State - Div. of Corp, #3 Exhibit Integon Policy, #4 Exhibit Copy of SRL Repair Estimate, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oltchick, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mustakas et al v. Integon National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integon National Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Adam Oltchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merribeth Mustakas
Represented By: Pritpal Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Mustakas
Represented By: Pritpal Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?