Wilson v. The Fresh Market, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wilson and Jeffrey Wilson
Defendant: Fairway Harbor, LLC and The Fresh Market, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv81037
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Setting Hearing on Defendant's Motion #19 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Compulsory Medical Examination of Plaintiff : Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 02:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of the representations made in #26 Defendant's Response, the Court hereby denies as moot #22 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order as to Discovery Served by The Fresh Market in Violation of Rule. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman (erz)
September 6, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order filed by The Fresh Market, Inc.. Replies due by 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garcia, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by The Fresh Market, Inc. of Filing Documnets in Support of Defendant's Response in Opposition to Motion for Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Garcia, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING #19 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Compulsory Medical Examination of Plaintiff filed by The Fresh Market, Inc.. Motions referred to Judge William Matthewman. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING #22 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order filed by Cynthia Wilson. Motions referred to Judge William Matthewman. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order by Cynthia Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Urbanek, Sharon)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney Fees filed by Cynthia Wilson. (Urbanek, Sharon)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Fresh Market, Inc. (Garcia, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Compulsory Medical Examination of Plaintiff by The Fresh Market, Inc.. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Garcia, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fairway Harbor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FAIRWAY INVESTMENTS, LLC for Fairway Harbor, LLC (Fernandez, George)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney Fees and Incororated Memorandum of Law filed by The Fresh Market, Inc.. Replies due by 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garcia, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 8/23/2019. per DE 16 (cbr)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the Motion to Remand #9 is due August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/12/2019. (vty)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by The Fresh Market, Inc.. Responses due by 8/26/2019 (Garcia, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's REPLY to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement & Incorporated Memorandum of Law by The Fresh Market, Inc.. (Garcia, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL re #12 Stipulation filed by Fairway Harbor, LLC, Attorney Dayra J. Morales is relieved of any further responsibility for representation of Defendant, Fairway Harbor, LLC. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Dayra Morales. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Fairway Harbor, LLC (Fernandez, George)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hector Ralph Rivera on behalf of Fairway Harbor, LLC. Attorney Hector Ralph Rivera added to party Fairway Harbor, LLC(pty:dft). (Rivera, Hector)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Louis Fernandez on behalf of Fairway Harbor, LLC. Attorney George Louis Fernandez added to party Fairway Harbor, LLC(pty:dft). (Fernandez, George)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Request for Attorney Fees by Cynthia Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Urbanek, Sharon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or Alternatively for More Definite Statement and Incorpo filed by Cynthia Wilson. Replies due by 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Urbanek, Sharon)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTAND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Dayra J. Morales, mailing date July 22, 2019, (pt)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or Alternatively for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by The Fresh Market, Inc.. Responses due by 8/5/2019 (Garcia, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mee)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - First Amended Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11829677, filed by The Fresh Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - D's Correspondence to Plaintiff and Mtn for Ext, #4 Exhibit 3 - RFAs and Response to RFAs, #5 Exhibit 4 - P's Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - all pleadings)(Garcia, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. The Fresh Market, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Harbor, LLC
Represented By: Michael Alexandar Garcia
Represented By: Dayra J. Morales
Represented By: Hector Ralph Rivera
Represented By: Gerard Di Popolo
Represented By: George Louis Fernandez
Represented By: Alexander M. Rattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fresh Market, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Alexandar Garcia
Represented By: Gerard Di Popolo
Represented By: Alexander M. Rattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wilson
Represented By: Theodore Stanley Forman
Represented By: Sharon L. Urbanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wilson
Represented By: Theodore Stanley Forman
Represented By: Sharon L. Urbanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?