City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
Plaintiff: City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida
Defendant: Acting Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency and Federal Emergency Management Agency
Case Number: 9:2019cv81140
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Zaltsberg, Michelle)
September 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 14 : Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/1/2019 (lk)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties shall submit a Joint Scheduling Report as required by Local Rule 16.1 by November 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 9/13/2019. (btr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to file a joint scheduling report re #12 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida. Responses due by 9/27/2019 (Zaltsberg, Michelle)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (btr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida. (Zaltsberg, Michelle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida. (Zaltsberg, Michelle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida. Acting Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency served on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Zaltsberg, Michelle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida. Federal Emergency Management Agency served on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Zaltsberg, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Wendy Huff Ellard. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/13/2019. (btr)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Ernest B. Abbott. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 8/13/2019. (btr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Wendy Huff Ellard. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11894219 by City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida. Responses due by 8/26/2019 (Zaltsberg, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ernest B. Abbott. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11893947 by City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida. Responses due by 8/26/2019 (Zaltsberg, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency, Federal Emergency Management Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ar2)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11893618, filed by City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Zaltsberg, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Lake Worth Beach, Florida
Represented By: Michelle F Zaltsberg
Represented By: Carolyn Stroud Ansay
Represented By: Ernest B. Abbott
Represented By: Wendy Huff Ellard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?