Desert Rose FL, L.L.C. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Desert Rose FL, L.L.C.
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv81159
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE, ( Status Conference Re: Final Discovery Matters set for 1/22/2020 03:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 16 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Robert Dulberg. (Jacobson, Jeannine)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Defendant's Representative to Appear Telephonically at Mediation. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/3/2019. (sk01)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION Unopposed Motion for Defendant's Representative to Attend the Court-Ordered Mediation Telephonically by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 Clerks Notice to Filer re #15 Notice of Mediator Selection. Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties, the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator. (cqs)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added United Healthcare Insurance Company. Mediation Hearing set for 11/08/19 at 1:30 p.m.. (Jacobson, Jeannine)
September 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Discovery due by 2/21/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by United Healthcare Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jeannine)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Unitedhealth Group Incorporated for United Healthcare Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/12/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 7/15/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart For Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading or a responsive motion by August 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/22/2019. (sk01)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Amended Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jeannine) Modified Relief on 8/22/2019 (ls).
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by United Healthcare Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Simon E. Pineres, mailing date August 16, 2019, (cco)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11905858, filed by UNITEDHEALTCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Jacobson, Jeannine) Text Modified on 8/15/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desert Rose FL, L.L.C. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Latanae L Parker
Represented By: Jeannine Cline Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Rose FL, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicholas Albert Zacharewski
Represented By: Simon E. Pineres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?