Apple Inc. v. Corellium, LLC
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: Corellium, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv81160
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. (Mediation Deadline 4/30/2020.) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE,PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 10/6/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2019., Expert Discovery due by 4/13/2020., Fact Discovery due by 4/13/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 11/22/2019., Mediation Deadline 4/30/2020., In Limine Motions due by 8/17/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2020., Motions due by 8/17/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/11/2020.) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 10/6/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2019., Expert Discovery due by 4/13/2020., Fact Discovery due by 4/13/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 11/22/2019., Mediation Deadline 4/30/2020., In Limine Motions due by 8/17/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2020., Motions due by 8/17/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/11/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 30, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S. Jonathan Vine on behalf of Corellium, LLC. Attorney S. Jonathan Vine added to party Corellium, LLC(pty:dft). (Vine, S.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lizza Carola Constantine on behalf of Corellium, LLC. Attorney Lizza Carola Constantine added to party Corellium, LLC(pty:dft). (Constantine, Lizza)
September 30, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin B. Levine on behalf of Corellium, LLC. Attorney Justin B. Levine added to party Corellium, LLC(pty:dft). (Levine, Justin)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing; Granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing; Granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Defendant's Response/Answer is due no later than October 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/26/2019. (lbn)
September 26, 2019 Filing 24 Clerks Notice to Filer re #23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Corellium, LLC. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaukroger, Gavin) Modified Relief on 9/26/2019 (ls).
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jacqueline G. Baker. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12014979 by Corellium, LLC. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion Pro Hac Vice)(Gaukroger, Gavin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert Greeson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12014973 by Corellium, LLC. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion Pro Hac Vice)(Gaukroger, Gavin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brett C. Govett. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12014965 by Corellium, LLC. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Gaukroger, Gavin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Apple Inc. (Goldberg, Martin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Apple Inc. (Goldberg, Martin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Martin)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Corellium, LLC's Response/Answer to the Complaint is due no later than September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/30/2019. (lbn)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Corellium, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Gaukroger, Gavin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Corellium, LLC (Gaukroger, Gavin)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing; Granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing; Granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing; Granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing; Granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elana Nightingale Dawson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11931854 by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Martin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sarang Vijay Damle. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11931843 by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Martin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kathryn H. Ruemmler. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11931815 by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Martin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrew M. Gass. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11931810 by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Martin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jessica Stebbins Bina. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11931672 by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Martin)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/20/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Apple Inc.. Corellium, LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Goldberg, Martin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (ar2)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (Goldberg, Martin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Corellium, LLC. (ar2)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Corellium, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11906008, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summon(s))(Goldberg, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Corellium, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Martin B. Goldberg
Represented By: Kathryn H. Ruemmler
Represented By: Andrew M. Gass
Represented By: Jessica Stebbins Bina
Represented By: Elana Nightingale Dawson
Represented By: Sarang Vijay Damle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corellium, LLC
Represented By: Justin B. Levine
Represented By: Lizza Carola Constantine
Represented By: Gavin Cunningham Gaukroger
Represented By: Brett C. Govett
Represented By: Jacqueline G. Baker
Represented By: S. Jonathan Vine
Represented By: Robert Greeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?