Tracy v. Bethel
Plaintiff: James Tracy
Defendant: Rickey Leon Bethel, Jr.
Consolidated Defendant: Amy Grande, Gia Shaw and Tracy Clark Haynie
Case Number: 9:2019cv81189
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Court's Ruling on the Motion to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law To d filed by James Tracy. Replies due by 10/28/2019. (Leo, Louis)
October 20, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #17 Amended Complaint filed by James Tracy. Replies due by 10/28/2019. (Leo, Louis)
October 16, 2019 Filing 25 Initial Disclosure(s) Pursuant Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 26(a)(1) by James Tracy (Leo, Louis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Court's Ruling on the Motion to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law To d by Rickey Leon Bethel, Jr, Amy Grande, Tracy Clark Haynie, Gia Shaw. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitelock, Christopher)
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #17 Amended Complaint by Rickey Leon Bethel, Jr, Amy Grande, Tracy Clark Haynie, Gia Shaw. Attorney Christopher John Whitelock added to party Gia Shaw(pty:condft). Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Whitelock, Christopher)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2019., Discovery due by 3/23/2020., Expert Discovery due by 3/23/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 11/18/2019., Mediation Deadline 3/31/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/25/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 4/6/2020., Motions due by 4/6/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/25/2020., Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 7/14/2020 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon For Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Rickey Leon Bethel, Jr Associated Cases: 9:19-cv-81189-RKA, 9:19-cv-81191-RKA(Whitelock, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by James Tracy (Leo, Louis)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by James Tracy (Leo, Louis)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rickey Leon Bethel, Jr, Amy Grande, Tracy Clark Haynie, Gia Shaw, filed by James Tracy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (DAVID Report))Associated Cases: 9:19-cv-81189-RKA, 9:19-cv-81191-RKA(Leo, Louis)
September 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE PLAINTIFFS OR DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/4/2019 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Case numbers No. 19-cv-81189-RKA and 19-cv-81190-RKA are CONSOLIDATED. Case number 19-cv-81190-RKA shall be administratively CLOSED. All future filings in this matter shall be made under Tracy v. Bethel, No. 19-cv-81189-RKA. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/20/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 9:19-cv-81189-RKA, 9:19-cv-81190-RKA (ar2)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. Case number No. 19-cv-81191-RKA is hereby CONSOLIDATED with Tracy v. Bethel, No. 19-cv-81189-RKA. Case number 19-cv-81191-RKA shall beadministratively CLOSED. All future filings in this matter shall be made in Tracy v.Bethel, No. 19-cv-81189-RKA. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Gia Shaw. (mc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to Rickey Leon Bethel, Jr. (mc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Defendant Gia Shaw by James Tracy re #8 Amended Complaint filed by James Tracy (Leo, Louis)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Defendant Rickey Leon Bethel, Jr. by James Tracy re #8 Amended Complaint filed by James Tracy (Leo, Louis)
September 8, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rickey Leon Bethel, Jr, Gia Shaw, filed by James Tracy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (DAVID Report))(Leo, Louis)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by James Tracy (Leo, Louis)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 9:19-cv-81189-RKA, 9:19-cv-81193-RKA (cds)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Order to Show Cause by James Tracy. (Leo, Louis)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rickey Leon Bethel, Jr. (cds)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rickey Leo Bethel, Jr. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11927205, filed by James Tracy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (DAVID Report), #2 Summon(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leo, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracy v. Bethel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey Leon Bethel, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher John Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tracy
Represented By: Louis Frank Leo, IV
Represented By: Joel D Medgebow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Amy Grande
Represented By: Christopher John Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Gia Shaw
Represented By: Christopher John Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Tracy Clark Haynie
Represented By: Christopher John Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?