ZHONGYOU v. SAGRISTA et al
Plaintiff: WU ZHONGYOU
Defendant: Shengrong Sagrista, SHENGRONG ZHU SAGRISTA, Shengrong Zhu and JAIME MANUEL SAGRISTA
Case Number: 9:2019cv81203
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 First MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by WU ZHONGYOU. Replies due by 10/29/2019. (Barquist, Lisa)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 First MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JAIME MANUEL SAGRISTA, SHENGRONG ZHU SAGRISTA. Attorney Scott Alan Mager added to party JAIME MANUEL SAGRISTA(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Alan Mager added to party SHENGRONG ZHU SAGRISTA(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Mager, Scott)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service on Shengrong Zhu Sagrista, #10 Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service on Jaime Manuel Sagrista. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 12 , 13 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by WU ZHONGYOU. SHENGRONG ZHU SAGRISTA served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (For image see DE#11 ). (jas)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by WU ZHONGYOU. JAIME MANUEL SAGRISTA served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (For image see DE#10 .) (jas)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by WU ZHONGYOU of Filing Affidavit of Service on Shengrong Zhu Sagrista (Barquist, Lisa)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by WU ZHONGYOU of Filing Affidavit of Service on Jaime Manuel Sagrista (Barquist, Lisa)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to JAIME MANUEL SAGRISTA, SHENGRONG ZHU SAGRISTA. (jas)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (jas)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by WU ZHONGYOU (Barquist, Lisa)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by WU ZHONGYOU re #1 Complaint filed by WU ZHONGYOU (Barquist, Lisa)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JAIME MANUEL SAGRISTA, SHENGRONG ZHU SAGRISTA. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11937426, filed by WU ZHONGYOU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Summon(s) Summons)(Barquist, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZHONGYOU v. SAGRISTA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shengrong Sagrista
Represented By: Scott Alan Mager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHENGRONG ZHU SAGRISTA
Represented By: Scott Alan Mager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shengrong Zhu
Represented By: Scott Alan Mager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAIME MANUEL SAGRISTA
Represented By: Scott Alan Mager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WU ZHONGYOU
Represented By: Lisa Hu Barquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?