Biddle v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Plaintiff: Yvette Helen Biddle
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv81251
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 29 Transmittal Letter Sent with Docket Sheet and Order to: 15th Judicial Circuit in and for Palm Beach County, FL. State Court Case Number: 50-2019-CC-011405-XXXX-MB (amb)
October 31, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #28 . Closing Case. (amb)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand. The Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction over this case. The case is therefore REMANDED to the County Court of the 15th Judicial Circuit in and for Palm Beach County, Florida. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Any other pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 27 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Calvar, Cristina)
October 30, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Monsanto Company, Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Calvar, Cristina)
October 30, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Yvette Helen Biddle (Zbrzeznj, Lydia)
October 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christine D. Tillema. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12107832 by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2019 (Calvar, Cristina)
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patrick E. Hogan. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12107821 by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2019 (Calvar, Cristina)
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeff Wilkerson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12107812 by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2019 (Calvar, Cristina)
October 30, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John J. Rosenthal. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12107772 by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2019 (Calvar, Cristina)
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report by Yvette Helen Biddle. Responses due by 11/13/2019 (Zbrzeznj, Lydia)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #17 the Plaintiff's Motion for Extension and/or Motion for Leave of Court to file an out-of-time reply to its Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/29/2019. (jz00)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #16 the Plaintiff's Motion for Extension and/or Motion for Leave of Court to file an out-of-time reply to its Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/29/2019. (jz00)
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion , MOTION for Leave to File by Yvette Helen Biddle. (Zbrzeznj, Lydia)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion , MOTION for Leave to File by Yvette Helen Biddle. (Zbrzeznj, Lydia)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Replies due by 10/24/2019. (Calvar, Cristina)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES: Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/30/2019 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Calvar, Cristina)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Yvette Helen Biddle. (Zbrzeznj, Lydia)
September 23, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Lowe's Home Centers LLC response due 10/4/2019. SEE DE 10 ORDER (ail)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. The parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, as required by Local Rule 16.1, by 10/11/2019 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 the Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. The Defendant's response shall be due by October 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/23/2019. (jz00)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Responses due by 10/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calvar, Cristina) Modified Relief/Link on 9/23/2019 (ls).
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT - Removal Status Report Pursuant to Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases by Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Calvar, Cristina)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES - (Status Report due by 9/20/2019.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that attorney Howard Weil Rubinstein has not been added to this case re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,,. For further information, please contact Attorney Admissions at 305-523-5265. (pt)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Yvette Helen Biddle (Zbrzeznj, Lydia)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lydia Sturgis Zbrzeznj on behalf of Yvette Helen Biddle. Attorney Lydia Sturgis Zbrzeznj added to party Yvette Helen Biddle(pty:pla). (Zbrzeznj, Lydia)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Yvette Helen Biddle v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11967611, filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and other state court filings, #3 Declaration of John J. Rosenthal in support of notice of removal, #4 Exhibit A - Trends in glyphosate herbicide use, #5 Exhibit B - EPA Label Review Manual, #6 Exhibit C - EPA glyphosate issue paper, #7 Exhibit D - 1993 glyphosate RED, #8 Exhibit E - EPA Reg. No. 071995-00033, #9 Exhibit F - Fee petition in Moore, #10 Exhibit G - Fee petition in Hydroxycut, #11 Exhibit H - Fee petition in Fishbein, #12 Exhibit I - Fee petition in Weeks, #13 Exhibit J - Lowe's website with price of product)(Calvar, Cristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biddle v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Helen Biddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Cristina Isabel Calvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?