Serrano v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ada Serrano
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC and Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv81257
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION. Scheduling Mediation before Ronald Alvarez. Mediation Hearing set for 3/11/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC re #12 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Merwin, Kathleen)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 10/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2019., Discovery due by 4/6/2020., Fact Discovery due by 4/6/2020., Expert Discovery due by 4/6/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 11/8/2019., Mediation Deadline 4/13/2020., In Limine Motions due by 7/7/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 4/24/2020., Motions due by 4/24/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/7/2020., Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 7/28/2020 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 4/13/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for all pretrial non-dispositive and discovery matters.. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The Defendants shall file, on or before October 4, 2019, a declaration identifying the citizenship of each of Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC's members. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC (Merwin, Kathleen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Ada Serrano (Naparstek, Matthew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Ada Serrano (Naparstek, Matthew)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC (Merwin, Kathleen)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. ( Removal Status Report due by 9/23/2019.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE PLAINTIFFS OR DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/25/2019 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC. (Merwin, Kathleen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Merwin, Kathleen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11972713, filed by Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC, Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., d/b/a Family Dollar.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Case Docket Documents, #4 Exhibit List of Removal Documents)(Merwin, Kathleen) Text Modified on 9/11/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serrano v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Merwin
Represented By: Mark Fereg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Merwin
Represented By: Mark Fereg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Serrano
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Naparstek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?