Leach v. Azar
Plaintiff: John P. Leach
Defendant: Secretary of Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 9:2019cv81264
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have an enlargement of time, up to and including January 10, 2020, within which to file a Response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Alex Azar. Attorney Suzette A. Smikle added to party Alex Azar(pty:dft). (Smikle, Suzette)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 9/9/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 8/12/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,. Incorrect District Judge Selected; Corrected by the Clerk. (asl)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alex Azar. (drz)
September 12, 2019 Judge Robin L. Rosenberg added. Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum no longer assigned to case. Clerk initially added wrong judge in error. (drz)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against Secretary of Department of Health and Human Services. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11979402, filed by John P. Leach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Hayden, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leach v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Leach
Represented By: Eric Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?