POMONA v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Defendant: ROCHELLE POMONA and Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 9:2019cv81267
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ROCHELLE POMONA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Answer to Plaintiff's Interrogatory, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Rochelle Pomona)(Miller, Ian)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Golani, Marta)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Golani, Marta)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion to Reinstate/Substitute originally identified Defendant, Juan Marrero, as proper party in interest to relate back to original timely filing of Complaint against him filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Replies due by 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Golani, Marta)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by ROCHELLE POMONA. (Miller, Ian)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marta R. Golani on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Golani, Marta)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ian Brent Miller on behalf of ROCHELLE POMONA. Attorney Ian Brent Miller added to party ROCHELLE POMONA(pty:pla). (Miller, Ian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): JUAN DOE. (Golani, Marta)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Wal-Mart Stores East, LP's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Golani, Marta)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jennifer Lettman, mailing date September 16, 2019, (pt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jao)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11983584, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A, #3 Exhibit Ex B, #4 Exhibit Ex C, #5 Exhibit Ex D, #6 Exhibit Ex E, #7 Exhibit Ex F)(Edwards, William) Modified on 9/16/2019 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POMONA v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCHELLE POMONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: William Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?