KK-PB Financial, LLC v. 160 Royal Palm, LLC
Appellant: KK-PB Financial, LLC
Appellee: 160 Royal Palm, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv81270
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. The deadline for Appellant to file a brief is tolled pending the Court's resolution of #6 Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. If such Motion is not granted, the Court will set briefing deadlines at that time. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/24/2019. (hhn)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Briefing Schedule re 15 Notice 8018 and Notice to Attorney,, by KK-PB Financial, LLC. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, James)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 11/12/2019. (bb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 8/15/2019 before Judge Erik P. Kimball, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-12 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette & Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2020. (mon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 09/12/2019 before Judge Erik P. Kimball, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-41 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette & Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2019. (mon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 08/22/2019 before Judge Erik P. Kimball, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-16 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette & Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2019. (mon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/25/2019 before Judge Erik P. Kimball, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-63 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette & Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2019. (mon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by KK-PB Financial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant Designation and Designated Docs, #3 Appellees Designation and Desig Docs Part 1, #4 Appellees Desiginated Docs Part 2, #5 Appellees Desiginated Docs Part 3)(mon)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal /KK-PB Financial, LLC's Response to Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by KK-PB Financial, LLC. Replies due by 9/30/2019. (Robinson, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KK-PB Financial, LLC (Robinson, James)
September 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 7 re #6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal . Responses due by 9/23/2019 (lk)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER. Appellant has filed this appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8003, which governs appeals as of right. The order below, approving the employment of a professional, was not a final judgment. See, e.g., In re Turner, 85 B.R. 910, 912 (Bankr. N.D. Ga. 1988). Accordingly, leave of the Court is required to appeal. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8004(a)(2) (stating that a party must file a motion for leave to appeal an interlocutory order). The Court construes the notice of appeal as a motion for leave to appeal the order. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8004(d) (stating that, when a party fails to file a motion for leave to appeal, the district court may order the party to do so or may construe the notice of appeal as a motion for leave to appeal and either grant or deny the motion). Appellant is ORDERED to file a response to Appellees Motion to Dismiss #6 by 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/18/2019. (hhn)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by 160 Royal Palm, LLC. Responses due by 10/1/2019 (Landau, Philip)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 160 Royal Palm, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Palm House, LLC for 160 Royal Palm, LLC (Pendergraft, Eric)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by KK-PB Financial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(mon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-19441-BKC-EPK, filed by KK-PB Financial, LLC.(mon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KK-PB Financial, LLC v. 160 Royal Palm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KK-PB Financial, LLC
Represented By: James Nial Robinson, II
Represented By: John Kennedy Cunningham
Represented By: Fan B He
Represented By: Robbie Thames Boone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 160 Royal Palm, LLC
Represented By: Philip Joseph Landau
Represented By: Bernice Cindy Lee
Represented By: Eric Scott Pendergraft
Represented By: Max James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?