Natural Lands, LLC v. City of Boca Raton et al
Plaintiff: Natural Lands, LLC
Defendant: City of Boca Raton and Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District
Case Number: 9:2019cv81407
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #16 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its Response to #15 Defendant Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District's Motion to Dismiss by no later than December 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/5/2019. (dco)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Natural Lands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kipnis, Alan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Striking Docket Entry No. 16 by Natural Lands, LLC (Kipnis, Alan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Natural Lands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kipnis, Alan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District. Responses due by 12/17/2019 (Hochman, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its Response to the #12 Motion to Dismiss by no later than December 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/2/2019. (dco)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #12 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Natural Lands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kipnis, Alan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Boca Raton. Responses due by 12/9/2019 (Abbott, Daniel)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant City of Boca Raton shall respond to the #1 Complaint by no later than November 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/12/2019. (dco)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, Defendant, City of Boca Raton's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Boca Raton. Attorney Daniel Lawrence Abbott added to party City of Boca Raton(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Reilly Flanigan on behalf of City of Boca Raton. Attorney Anne Reilly Flanigan added to party City of Boca Raton(pty:dft). (Flanigan, Anne)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District shall respond to the #1 Complaint by no later than December 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/7/2019. (dco)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hochman, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Lawrence Hochman on behalf of Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District. Attorney Jeffrey Lawrence Hochman added to party Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District(pty:dft). (Hochman, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Natural Lands, LLC. Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Kipnis, Alan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Natural Lands, LLC. City of Boca Raton served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Kipnis, Alan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Boca Raton, Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District. (mee)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12068455, filed by Natural Lands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Summon(s) to City of Boca Raton, #18 Summon(s) to Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District)(Kipnis, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Lands, LLC v. City of Boca Raton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boca Raton
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Represented By: Anne Reilly Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Boca Raton Beach and Park District
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Lands, LLC
Represented By: Alan Gary Kipnis
Represented By: Steven Manes Dickstein
Represented By: Keith Michael Poliakoff
Represented By: Keith Lenard Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?