Martin v. Kaplan
Plaintiff: James F. Martin
Defendant: Eric Plotkin and Brian Kaplan
In Re: SpinLabel Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv81470
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff discovery responses and to overrule plaintiff's objections by Brian Kaplan. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Levine, Justin)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Consolidating Cases. Case numbers No. 19-cv-81470-RKA and 19-cv-81471-RKA are CONSOLIDATED. Case number 19-cv-81471-RKA shall be administratively CLOSED, and all future filings in this matter shall be made under Martin v. Kaplan, No. 19-cv-81470-RKA. The Clerk is directed to docket this Order in the following two cases: Martin v. Kaplan, No. 19-cv-81470-RKA; and Martin v. Plotkin, No. 19-cv-81471-RKA. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Filing of Motion to Withdraw Reference Pursuant to 28 USC 157(d) with District Court (jc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) to Withdraw Reference filed by Brian Kaplan (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Response ECF 23, #3 Joint Reply ECF 34)(mon)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 Defendant Eric Plotkin's MOTION (COMPLAINT) to Withdraw Reference Bankruptcy Court case number 19-01295-ADV-EPK., filed by Brian Kaplan.(mon) Modified text on 10/28/2019 (jc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Plotkin
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Biard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kaplan
Represented By: Justin B. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F. Martin
Represented By: Gregory Matthew Garno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: SpinLabel Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?