Metro Worldwide, LLC v. ZYP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Metro Worldwide, LLC
Defendant: Joseph Porat, ZYP Financial Group, LLC, ZYP Technologies, LLC, ZYP, LLC and Tomar Porat
Case Number: 9:2019cv81502
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. A single response to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint on behalf of all Defendants shall be filed on or before 1/15/2020. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/19/2019. (hhn)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Tomar Porat. Responses due by 1/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT)(Topolski, Scott)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 12 Waiver of Service Executed, 13 Waiver of Service Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metro Worldwide, LLC. Joseph Porat waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. See DE #11 for image. (kpe)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metro Worldwide, LLC. ZYP Financial Group, LLC waiver sent on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020; ZYP Technologies, LLC waiver sent on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020; ZYP, LLC waiver sent on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020. See DE #11 for image. (kpe)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Metro Worldwide, LLC re #3 Summons Issued of Filing Waivers of Service of Summons (Domark, Jason)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Tomer Porat shall file a responsive pleading or responsive motion to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint by 5:00 pm on 12/26/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/10/2019. (hhn)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Tomar Porat. Attorney Scott John Topolski added to party Tomar Porat(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT)(Topolski, Scott)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 11/4/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 10/7/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Miguel Alexander Pozo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/7/2019. (hk02)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Miguel Alexander Pozo. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12125734 by Metro Worldwide, LLC. Responses due by 11/20/2019 (Domark, Jason)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Metro Worldwide, LLC Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Domark, Jason)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joseph Porat, Tomar Porat, ZYP Financial Group, LLC, ZYP Technologies, LLC, ZYP, LLC. (jao)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 2 against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12124184, filed by Metro Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s) ZYP, LLC, #6 Summon(s) ZYP Technologies, LLC, #7 Summon(s) ZYP Financial Group, LLC, #8 Summon(s) Joseph Porat, #9 Summon(s) Tomar Porat)(Domark, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metro Worldwide, LLC v. ZYP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Porat
Represented By: Scott John Topolski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYP Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Scott John Topolski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYP Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Scott John Topolski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYP, LLC
Represented By: Scott John Topolski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomar Porat
Represented By: Scott John Topolski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Jason Ryan Domark
Represented By: Miguel Alexander Pozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?