Kryshtopenka v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Uladzimir Kryshtopenka
Defendant: Esq. William P. Barr, USCIS, Acting Director Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Act. Sec. Dept. DHS Kevin K McAleenan, Michael Borgen, Director Christopher Wray, Wendy Wilcox, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa District
Case Number: 9:2019cv81540
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Uladzimir Kryshtopenka (Devore, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Trial set for 7/20/2020 at 9:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 7/15/2020 at 1:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Sievert on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa District, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Jessica Sievert added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Sievert added to party U.S. Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Sievert added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Sievert added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa District(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Sievert added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Sievert added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Sievert, Jessica)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa District, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney (ail)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12140479, filed by Uladzimir Kryshtopenka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) USCIS, #3 Summon(s) Acting Secretary DHS, #4 Summon(s) Attorney General, #5 Summon(s) Acting Director USCIS, #6 Summon(s) District Director Tampa, #7 Summon(s) Field Office Director WPB, #8 Summon(s) FBI, #9 Summon(s) USA SDFL)(Devore, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kryshtopenka v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uladzimir Kryshtopenka
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act. Sec. Dept. DHS Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Borgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Jessica Sievert
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Jessica Sievert
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jessica Sievert
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director
Represented By: Jessica Sievert
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Jessica Sievert
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tampa District
Represented By: Jessica Sievert
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?